USA v. Amos et al
Criminal Case Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cr-00197

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 4:17 PM ST (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Felix Amos, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanszen Laporte Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Charley A Davidson +1 713 522 9444 +1 713 524 2580 cdavidson@hanszenlaporte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Houston Interpreter

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Initial Presentence Investigation Report (Sealed) - eDisclosure
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Resetting Sentencing and PSI Deadlines - FORM
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Continue - Cr
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Sealed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Notice Govt to Use Evidence
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Amend
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Continue - Cr
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Motion to Continue (Sealed)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Forfeiture of Property
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Order of Forfeiture
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Forfeiture of Property
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None PSI and Disclosure & Sentencing Dates (FORM)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Continue - Cr
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment (FORM,noticing) - Criminal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Counsel Determination Hearing
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Counsel Determination Hearing
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Exparte Motion (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Issuance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reciprocal Discovery
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Reciprocal Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify as Complex Case
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Certify as Complex Case
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Agents to Retain Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Jencks Act material
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Brady Materials
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Adopt Motions of Other Defendants
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Felix Amos. ETT:7-8 days: Speedy Trial Limits Waived? Yes: Motion Filing due by 5/3/2017. Responses due by 5/15/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon Proposed Voir Dire due by 6/2/2017. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified. (sjones, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Issuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER for Issuance of Summons as to Felix Amos. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson) Parties notified. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2017: # 1 Unredacted Document) (rosaldana, 4). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Felix Amos, Oluyemisi Amos, filed.(rosaldana, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Felix Amos (1) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8, Oluyemisi Amos (2) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8, filed. (rosaldana, 4) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant issued 3/17/2017 Returned Executed on 3/17/2017 in case as to Felix Amos, Oluyemisi Amos. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy, filed. (scastillo, 1) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Felix Amos (1) $200,000 bond with $10,000 cash deposit ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted attachment) Parties notified. (gkelner, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Felix Amos in amount of $ $200,000, with $10,000 cash deposit, filed. (gkelner, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2017: # 1 Unredacted attachment) (gkelner, 4). [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charley A Davidson appearing for Felix Amos Designation of Co-Counsel, Erin Kolodny, filed.(Davidson, Charley) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Felix Amos, Oluyemisi Amos held on 3/23/2017. Court finds probable cause. Bond set for defendant 1 with $10,000 deposit. Exhibits admitted as per record. Appearances:Phil Hilder/Tate Williams for Oluyemisi. Rodolfo Ramirez, Charley A Davidson.(ERO:M. Balboa) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(gkelner, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Felix Amos, filed. (pturner, ) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING as to Felix Amos ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) Parties notified. (kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/22/2017 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith as to Felix Amos. Defendant advises of retainment of counsel, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith Appearances: AUSA Rodolfo Ramirez f/USA; Charley Davidson (Retained) f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: D Hernandez) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING as to Felix Amos ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith) Parties notified. (kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/20/2017 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith as to Felix Amos, Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Deft informed of rights). Defendant appeared without counsel, Defendant advises of retainment of counsel. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Counsel Determination Hearing set for 3/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith Attorney Charley Davidson to be retained Appearances: AUSA Rodolfo Ramirez f/USA.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal as to Felix Amos (1), Oluyemisi Amos (2).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith.) Parties notified.(kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal by USA as to Felix Amos, Oluyemisi Amos, filed. (kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT as to Felix Amos (1), Oluyemisi Amos (2), filed. (kmurphy, 4) [4:17-mj-00359] (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 1,627 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?