HODGE v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02200

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 11:18 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Call for dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying 7 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/6/17. (sr, )(N/M)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/6/17. (sr, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?