UNITED STATES v. KUSHNER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-02372
District Judge Susan D. Wigenton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2018 at 10:28 AM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Application/Petition
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Application/Petition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Quash
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Substitution of Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery Plan
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      COMPLAINT against DAVID KUSHNER, NANCI KUSHNER, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(TOBIN, OLGA) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?