Flores v. County of Benton, Arkansas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-05063

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 8:20 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Adrian Michael Flores, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by arkansaslawking.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Whitfield Hyman +4797821125 901 413 2625 +1 479 361 8093 hyman@arkansaslawking.com
v.
No Logo Andy J. Lee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and in his Official Capacity as a CAPTAIN with and for the COUNTY OF BENTON JaNan Arnold Davis +1 501 868 2500 +1 501 868 2505 davis@rainfirm.com
No Logo Balthazar Martinez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and in his Official Capacity as a DEPUTY with and for the COUNTY OF BENTON JaNan Arnold Davis +1 501 868 2500 +1 501 868 2505 davis@rainfirm.com
No Logo County of Benton, Arkansas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JaNan Arnold Davis +1 501 868 2500 +1 501 868 2505 davis@rainfirm.com
No Logo David Cordeiro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and in his Official Capacity as a DETECTIVE with and for the COUNTY OF BENTON JaNan Arnold Davis +1 501 868 2500 +1 501 868 2505 davis@rainfirm.com
No Logo James Chamberlin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDaniel, Richardson, & Calhoun, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and in his Official Capacity as a  DETECTIVE with and for the COUNTY OF BENTON Scott P. Richardson +1 501 235 8336 +1 501 588 2104 scott@mrcfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and in his Official Capacity as a  DETECTIVE with and for the COUNTY OF BENTON JaNan Arnold Davis +1 501 868 2500 +1 501 868 2505 davis@rainfirm.com
No Logo James Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Joel Berger +1 212 687 4911 +1 212 687 1406 JBerger1955@aol.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 W. Howard Gunn +1 601 369 8533 whgunn@bellsouth.net
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Brian J May +1 574 968 0049 +1 574 234 8411 nucpromay@aol.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Terry August Rice +1 914 357 4000 +1 845 357 0765 tr0823@msn.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Eugene Steingold +1 312 726 1060 steingoldlaw@mac.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 William R. Stewart +1 314 968 7988 +1 314 968 4898 william_stewart@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERSON2X, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Austin W Anderson +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 austin@a2xlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Michael A Evans +1 314 531 1054 +1 314 531 1131 mevans@hghllc.net
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Jo Ann Fields +1 404 758 9111 joannfields@fbjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barkan Meizlish Handelman Goodin DeRose Wentz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Robert E. DeRose, II +1 614 221 4221 +1 614 744 2300 bderose@barkanmeizlish.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Katherine Stone +1 614 221 4221 +1 614 744 2300 kstone@barkanmeizlish.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Johnston, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 George E Barrett +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 gbarrett@barrettjohnston.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 David W. Garrison +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 dgarrison@barrettjohnston.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Seth Marcus Hyatt +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 shyatt@barrettjohnston.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Scott Patton Tift +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 stift@barrettjohnston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Williams & Skilling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Harris Dewey Butler, III +1 804 648 4848 +1 804 648 6814 hbutler@butlerwilliams.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Rebecca H. Royals +1 804 228 4801 +1 804 648 6814 rroyals@butlerwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Janet J. McGuiggan +1 508 799 1161 +1 508 799 1163

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Marlborough Legal Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Donald V. Rider, Jr. +1 508 460 3771 drider@marlborough-ma.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Worcester Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Wendy L. Quinn +1 508 799 1161 +1 508 799 1163 quinnwl@ci.worcester.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross Law Firm SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Danielle G Bailey +1 414 224 0000 +1 414 273 7055 dbailey@crosslawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Katherine M Gaumond +1 414 224 0000 +1 414 273 7055 kgaumond@crosslawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Nola J Hitchcock Cross +1 414 224 0000 +1 414 279 7055 njhcross@crosslawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Janice M Pintar +1 414 224 0000 +1 414 273 7055 jpintar@crosslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel M. Homolka, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Daniel M. Homolka +1 612 341 2433 +1 612 341 2423

Toggle Switch Represented by Daryl Allan Deutsch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Daryl Allan Deutsch

Toggle Switch Represented by Diaz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 G. Joseph Diaz, Jr. +1 601 607 3456 +1 601 607 3393 jdiazjr@msattorneys.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Allen M. Gressett +1 601 607 3456
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 James Russell Segars, III +1 601 607 3456 +1 601 607 3393 tripp@msattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elizabeth G McCulley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Elizabeth G McCulley

Toggle Switch Represented by Feeney, Kellett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 G. Gregory Schuetz +1 248 258 1580 +1 248 258 1580

Toggle Switch Represented by Greer Burns & Crain, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Patrick G. Burns +1 312 360 0080 pburns@gbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 RiKaleigh C. Johnson +1 312 360 0080 rjohnson@gbc.law
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Allyson M. Martin +1 312 360 0080 amartin@gbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 David R. Woodward +1 612 338 4605 +1 612 338 4692 dwoodward@heinsmills.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman, Herman, Katz & Cotlar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hhkc.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Russ M. Herman +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 rwestenfeld@hhkc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 PHILLIP TIMOTHY HOWARD +1 850 298 4455 +1 850 216 2537 tim@howardjustice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOWARD & ASSOCIATES PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Miguel Amador +1 954 332 3633 miguel@howardjustice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. Richard Aramburu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 J. Richard Aramburu

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey M Eustis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Jeffrey M Eustis

Toggle Switch Represented by Kayin Paige, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Michael J. Smith +1 586 254 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lawrence J. Fleming

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lawrence J. Fleming +1 314 584 4176 +1 314 644 4303

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Walter W. Green

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Walter W Green +1 301 927 3100 +1 301 927 3542 wgreen@GreensLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ilene A. Goodman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Ilene A. Goodman +1 618 482 9382

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lee R. Anderson +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 andersonL@swbell.net

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Douglas E. Whitney +1 312 372 2000 dwhitney@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Northern District of Indiana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Peter L Boyles - FCD +1 574 245 7393 +1 574 245 7394 peter_boyles@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Imani Chiphe +1 312 621 8300 imani_chiphe@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Jessica Sue Davis +1 717 783 6270 jdavis@attorneygeneral.gov
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lucy E. Fritz +1 717 787 7919 lfritz@attorneygeneral.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 FPD +1 802 862 6990 samantha_barrett@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Kevin Curran +1 314 241 1255 +1 314 421 3177 kevin_curran@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Melissa A. Day, AFPD +1 618 435 2552 Melissa_Day@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Federal Defender +1 334 834 2099 +8340 834 834 0353 ECFCMALM@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 St. Louis Fed Public Defender +1 314 241 1255 +1 314 421 3177 moe_ecfnote@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Ray Kent +1 616 742 7420 ECFPSI_MIW@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Travis Poindexter +1 816 471 8282 +1 816 471 8008 travis_poindexter@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lindsey A. Bierzonski +1 717 772 3561 +1 717 772 4526 lbierzonski@attorneygeneral.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul McInnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Richard M Paul, III +1 816 838 3624 paul@paulmcinnes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 James Byrnes Grenfell +1 601 366 1900 +1 601 366 1799 jgren2000@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Gary E. Friedman +1 601 352 2300 +1 601 360 9777 friedmag@phelps.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Jason T. Marsh +1 601 352 2300 +1 601 360 9777 marshj@phelps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Michael Lee McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 efile@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Garrett D. Blanchfield +1 651 287 2100 +1 651 287 2103 g.blanchfield@rwblawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Brant D Penney +1 651 287 2100 +1 651 287 2103 b.penney@rwblawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Steven Wayne Pepich +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 stevep@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Larry M. Roth +1 407 872 7300 +1 407 841 2133 lroth@rumberger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SBI #155123

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 James Johnson

Toggle Switch Represented by Slipakoff & Slomka, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Howard P. Slomka +1 678 732 0001 +1 888 259 6137

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strawberry Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Timothy Paul Keating +1 717 705 8580 +1 717 772 4526 tkeating@attorneygeneral.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by STUEVE AND SIEGEL, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Christopher David Dandurand +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 dandurand@stuevesiegel.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Bradley Wilders +1 816 714 7126 +1 816 714 7101 wilders@stuevesiegel.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Lauren A. Wolf +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 wolf@stuevesiegel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sud Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Anuj Sud +1 301 277 0304 +1 301 277 0305 anuj@sudlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Sarah Michelle Block +1 202 833 8855 smb@wmlaborlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Molly Ann Elkin +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 mae@wmlaborlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 130

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Joel J. Schwartz +1 314 862 4332 +1 314 862 8050 jschwartz@rsflawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Joel J. Schwartz +1 314 862 4332 srosenblum@rsflawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1650

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Joshua G. Herman +1 312 909 0434 jherman@joshhermanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 5,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Joseph A. George +1 210 410 3689 +1 210 910 6383 joseph@josephageorge.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SULLENGER LAW OFFICE, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 D. Wes Sullenger +1 270 443 9401 +1 270 443 3624 wes@sullengerfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WINEBRAKE LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Mark J. Gottesfeld +1 215 884 2491 mgottesfeld@winebrakelaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 R. ANDREW SANTILLO +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 asantillo@winebrakelaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Peter D. Winebrake +1 215 884 2491 +1 215 884 2492 pwinebrake@winebrakelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas & Solomon, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Nelson J. Thomas +1 585 272 0540 +1 585 272 0574 nthomas@theemploymentattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E Hornish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Thomas E Hornish

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas S. Stewart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Thomas S. Stewart

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Wigdor & Gilly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Matthew Richard Pisciotta +1 212 257 6800 mpisciotta@zarin-steinmetz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Traber & Voorhees

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Theresa M Traber +1 626 585 9611 +1 626 577 7079 tmt@tvlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw, Williams, Biggers, Beckham & Riddick (Jackson)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Patrick C. Malouf +1 601 944 0005

Toggle Switch Represented by Wasserman Comden Casselman & Esensten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Melissa Meeker Harnett +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 996 8266 mharnett@wccelaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Michael G Kline +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 996 8266 mkline@wccelaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Gregory B Scarlett +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 345 0612 gscarlett@wccelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yira Law Office, Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Markus C Yira +1 320 587 0305 +1 320 587 0557 myira@yiralaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zarin & Steinmetz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Jody Tamar Cross +1 914 682 7800
TERMINATED: 06/19/2018 Michael David Zarin +1 914 682 7800 +1 914 683 5490 mzarin@zarin-steinmettz.net
No Logo John and Jane Doe 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John and Jane Doe 1-10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John and Jane Doe 1-10
No Logo SCOTT SULLIVAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary William Bizal +1 504 525 1328 piblaw@bellsouth.net
Space Stephen J. Haedicke haedickelaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
Space Crystal G. LaFleur +1 225 663 2612 clafleur@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LOUISIANA CAPITAL ASSISTANCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Cumming +1 504 822 4455 ecumminglaw@gmail.com
No Logo Shawn Holloway, Defendant
No Logo Nathan Smith, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Boris Kogan +1 212 625 8910 +1 212 219 2728 bkoganesq@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ANAPOL, SCHWARTZ, WEISS, COHAN, FELDMAN & SMALLEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES R. RONCA jronca@anapolweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boris Kogan PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Illish +1 718 384 9111 +1 718 384 5999 marc@bkogan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Giuffre Law Offices, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shunyi Joonho Hong +1 516 358 5300 +1 516 358 0400 sjhong@yourlawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Thompson, III +1 843 216 9118 +1 843 216 9450 fthompson@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NastLaw LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dianne M Nast +1 215 923 9300 +1 717 892 1200 dnast@nastlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Thomas James +1 501 382 3658 +1 501 682 2591 Robert.James@ArkansasAG.gov
Space Robert Thomas James +1 501 382 3658 +1 501 682 2591 Robert.James@ArkansasAG.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. McCauley +1 516 466 6500 +1 516 466 6665 mmccauley@yourlawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diogenes P. Kekatos +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 594 0799 dkekatos@seegerweiss.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Settlement Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating motion 37 Motion for Discovery; terminating motion 38 Motion for Discovery; terminating motion 39 Motion for Discovery; terminating motion 40 Motion for Discovery; terminating motion 41 Motion for Discovery. Though styled on the docket as motions, these discovery-related filings do not actually appear to be requesting any court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1). Regardless, if a party seeks court intervention into a discovery dispute, then it must follow the procedures set forth in section 6(c) of the Case Management Order (Doc. 35) before filing any discovery motion. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 21, 2017. (jch) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
        First MOTION for Discovery for Requests for Admission Propounded to Defendant Benton County by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
          First MOTION for Discovery for Requests for Admission Propounded to David Cordeiro by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
            First MOTION for Discovery for Requests for Admission Propounded to Andy Lee by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
              First MOTION for Discovery for Requests for Admission Propounded to Balthazar Martinez by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                First MOTION for Discovery for Requests for Admission by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2018 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 3, 2017. (kht) Modified on 10/3/2017 to correct year in docket text (kht).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2018 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. JURY TRIAL set for 7/23/2018 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 2, 2017. (slc)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      TEXT ONLY ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation at the Case Management Hearing held earlier today, separate Defendants James Johnson and Scott Sullivan are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to remove Mr. Johnson and Mr. Sullivan from the style of the case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 28, 2017. (jch) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 9/28/2017. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (rg) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE by Adrian Michael Flores of JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, Schedule G Addendum (Hyman, William) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by James Chamberlin, David Cordeiro, County of Benton, Arkansas, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez. (Davis, JaNan) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss, pursuant to this Court's Order at Doc. 24 extending the deadline for service and the Affidavit at Doc. 26 showing timely service. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 24, 2017. (jch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by County of Benton, Arkansas.(Davis, JaNan) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Separate Defendant County of Benton by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William) (Entered: 08/13/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss by Separate Defendant County of Benton filed by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William) (Entered: 08/13/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. County of Benton, Arkansas served on 8/8/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Hyman, William) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to County of Benton, Arkansas and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (lw)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 19 Motion for Service. The deadline for Plaintiff to perfect service on Defendant Benton County is extended to August 11, 2017. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 4, 2017. (gg) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            TEXT ONLY ORDER striking 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Respondent Nathan Smith. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 4, 2017. (gg) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by James Chamberlin, David Cordeiro, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez.(Davis, JaNan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 20 First MOTION to Dismiss by County of Benton, Arkansas. (Davis, JaNan)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  First MOTION to Dismiss by County of Benton, Arkansas. (Davis, JaNan)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Second MOTION for Service, Enlargement of Time to Perfect Service on Benton County by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/28/2017 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/6/2017. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 2, 2017. (slc)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service of Process by Nathan Smith. (James, Robert)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          *** STRICKEN PER 8/4/17 TEXT ONLY ORDER *** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service of Process by Nathan Smith. (James, Robert) Modified on 8/4/2017 (gg).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. James on behalf of Nathan Smith. (James, Robert)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. Balthazar Martinez served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 First page of Balthazar Summons)(Hyman, William)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. David Cordeiro served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. (Hyman, William)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. Andy J. Lee served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. (Hyman, William)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. County of Benton, Arkansas served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. (Hyman, William)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. James Chamberlin served on 7/16/2017, answer due 8/7/2017. (Hyman, William)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to James Chamberlin and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. Modified on 7/31/2017 to correct text(rg).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to David Cordeiro, County of Benton, Arkansas, James Johnson, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez, Scott Sullivan and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (hnc)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to James Chamberlin, David Cordeiro, County of Benton, Arkansas, James Johnson, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez, Scott Sullivan and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (rg)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Obtain Proper Service on Defendants by Adrian Michael Flores. (Hyman, William)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to 1 Complaint, against James Chamberlin, David Cordeiro, County of Benton, Arkansas, John and Jane Doe 1-10, James Johnson, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez, Scott Sullivan, filed by Adrian Michael Flores. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Adrian Michael Flores.(Hyman, William)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (rg)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to Shawn Holloway and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (rg)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Adrian Michael Flores. (rg)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James Chamberlin, David Cordeiro, County of Benton, Arkansas, Shawn Holloway, John and Jane Doe 1-10, James Johnson, Andy J. Lee, Balthazar Martinez, Scott Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 2019232), filed by Adrian Michael Flores.(rg)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?