Walker v. Village Court
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00390

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 9:44 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 241
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: The # 8 Report-Recommendations of Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles is accepted in whole. See U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). It is ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment and close the file. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail.] (mc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    DECISION AND ORDER: The # 8 Report-Recommendations of Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles is accepted in whole. See U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). It is ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/20/2017. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail.](mc)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is Recommended that the # 1 Complaint filed by Alfred Marion Walker be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2017 Case Review Deadline 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 8/4/2017. (Copy served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jmb)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Order directing administrative closure
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?