United States v. Wilborn
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:17-cr-00049
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2019 at 11:22 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andre Jamar Wilborn, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Goetz & Eckland PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Frederick James Goetz +1 612 874 1552 +1 612 331 2473 fgoetz@goetzeckland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL DEFENDER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2017, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Katherian D Roe +1 612 664 5858 +1 612 664 5850 katherian_roe@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE OF SETTING CHANGE OF PLEA as to Andre Jamar Wilborn. Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (BJS) Modified text on 4/7/2017 (MKG). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 17 Motion for Discovery, 22 Motion to Suppress, 14 Motion to Produce, 21 Motion to Retain Rough Notes, 16 Motion for Release of Brady Materials, 18 Motion for Disclosure, 15 Motion for Counsel to Participate in Voir Dire, 19 Motion to Compel, 20 Motion for Discovery (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Andre Jamar Wilborn re 17 MOTION for Discovery of Expert Under Rule 16(a)(1)(G), 14 MOTION to Produce 404(b) Evidence, 16 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials , 19 MOTION to Compel Giglio, 22 MOTION to Suppress Evidence Obtained as a Result of Search and Seizure, 21 MOTION to Retain Rough Notes , 18 MOTION for Disclosure of Jencks Material, 15 MOTION for Counsel to Participate in Voir Dire , 20 MOTION for Discovery (Steinkamp, David) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Suppress Evidence Obtained as a Result of Search and Seizure by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Retain Rough Notes by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Discovery by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Compel Giglio by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Disclosure of Jencks Material by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Discovery of Expert Under Rule 16(a)(1)(G) by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Release of Brady Materials by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Counsel to Participate in Voir Dire by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Produce 404(b) Evidence by Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ARRAIGNMENT NOTICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER as to Andre Jamar Wilborn. Arraignment set for 4/24/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Disclosure due by 3/20/2017. Voir Dire/Jury Instructions deadline due by 5/12/2017. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Motions due by 4/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/13/17. (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2017: # 1 LR 12.1) (kt). (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Defendant Information Sheet as to Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Attachments: # 1 Original Signature Page) (MKG) Document QC'd by jdf. Modified text on 3/9/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau by USA David P. Steinkamp as to Andre Jamar Wilborn (1) counts 1, 2, and 3. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (MKG) Document QC'd by jdf. Modified text on 3/9/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Appearance Bond Entered as to Andre Jamar Wilborn in amount of $25,000 rpr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/9/2017. (ACH) Document QC'ed on 2/17/2017 (MMG). [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Andre Jamar Wilborn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/9/2017. (ACH) Document QC'ed on 2/17/2017 (MMG). [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing as to Andre Jamar Wilborn held on 2/9/2017. Counsel Present. Bond set at $25,000 rpr. Probable cause found. Deft bound over to District Court of Minnesota. Benjamin Scott Henrich testified. (ACH) [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Andre Jamar Wilborn. (Goetz, Frederick) [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER OF PRELIMINARY DETENTION as to Andre Jamar Wilborn. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 2/9/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/7/2017. (ACH) [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Appearance as to Andre Jamar Wilborn held on 2/7/2017. Counsel appointed. Government moves for detention. Motion is granted, temporary detention ordered. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Examination set for 2/9/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (ACH) [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Bench Warrant Issued as to Andre Jamar Wilborn by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (ACH) Document QC'ed on 2/17/2017 (MMG). [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                COMPLAINT by USA David P. Steinkamp with affidavit of Ben Henrich (DEA) as to Andre Jamar Wilborn (1) by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (ACH) Document QC'ed on 2/17/2017 (MMG). [0:17-mj-00101-KMM] (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?