J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Herriman
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-11155

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 12, 2019 at 4:42 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Appear*
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Appear*
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cruisin1, Inc., only. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Withdraw Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Alternate Service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?