Elizondo v. SA Family Help and Hope LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00013
District Judge Xavier Rodriguez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2018 at 6:31 PM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Crystal Roberts-Farris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Denia Bradley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Gina Gomez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Jo Kolar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Latrice McNeil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Latsiha Molett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Lupe Elizondo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Maria Gonzalez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Cristobal Bonifaz +1 413 369 4263 +1 413 369 0076 cbonifaz@comcast.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter L. Nisson +1 888 999 4313 +1 888 999 5764 peternisson@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alvarez | Gonzalez, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Carlos Fernando Gonzalez +1 305 760 9770 +1 305 397 1097 cfg@algofirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Matthew L. Berman +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 mberman@vkvlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Oscar Edmund Marrero +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 oem@marrerolegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Julius Lerma +1 956 546 1910 +1 956 546 4013 bobby@bobbylerma.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Thomas Edward Butler +1 212 408 5283 +1 212 408 5369 tbutler@chadbourne.com
, , , Jerome C. Katz +1 212 408 5100

Toggle Switch Represented by Community Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Pamela Marie Bridge +1 602 258 3434 +1 602 258 4628 PBridge@clsaz.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , George Holl McKay +1 602 258 3434 +1 602 253 1536 GMcKay@clsaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Craig P Fagan Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Craig P Fagan +1 619 528 9600 +1 619 528 9675 cpfagan@faganlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Creed & Gowdy, P.A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY +1 904 350 0075 +1 904 350 0086 bgowdy@appellate-firm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Diaz Reus & Targ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gary Edward Davidson +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 gdavidson@diazreus.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Diaz, Jr. +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 mdiaz@diazreus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Diaz Reus & Targ, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brant Collin Hadaway +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 bhadaway@diazreus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Diaz Reus Rolff & Targ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gerardo J. Rodriguez-Albizu +1 305 375 8220 +1 305 375 8050 grodriguez@diazreus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farmworker Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Virginia Elizabeth Ruiz +1 202 293 5420 +1 202 293 5427 vruiz@farmworkerjustice.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marni Willenson , +1 312 546 4137 +1 312 261 9977 mwillenson@nclr.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE Frank Joseph Mazzaferro +1 315 225 6330 +1 212 481 1333 fmazzaferro@fslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Giuffre Law Offices, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shunyi Joonho Hong +1 516 358 5300 +1 516 358 0400 sjhong@yourlawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Richard W Epstein +1 954 491 1120 +1 954 343 6958 richard.epstein@gmlaw.com
, , , , , , , Myrna L. Maysonet +1 407 425 6559 +1 407 422 6583 myrna.maysonet@gmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jacqueline Scott Corley +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 corley@kerrwagstaffe.com
, , , , , , , Michael John von Loewenfeldt +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 mvl@kerrwagstaffe.com
, , , , , , , Daniel Amon Zaheer +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 8500 zaheer@kerrwagstaffe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Craig R. Zobel, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Craig Randall Zobel +1 561 277 1819 +1 561 630 9666 czobel@zobellawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maria Gonzalez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Gonzalez

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , EDWARD A. MOSS +1 305 358 5171 +1 305 358 7470 emoss@shb.com
, , , , , , , Eileen Tilghman Moss +1 305 358 5171 +1 305 358 7470 elmoss@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SM Law Group, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kian Mottahedeh +1 818 855 5950 +1 818 855 5952

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Watanabe Spivak & Moss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hope Allison Pordy +1 212 765 2100 +1 212 541 5429 hpordy@spivaklipton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State Bar Information

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Kent Livesay +1 956 686 5776

Toggle Switch Represented by Steele Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Howard Lynn Steele, Jr. +1 713 659 2600 +1 713 659 2601 hsteele@steelesturm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Sarah Michelle Block +1 202 833 8855 smb@wmlaborlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Brandon J. Hill +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 bhill@wfclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Holzman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lawrence Roger Holzman +1 301 876 4393 +1 301 859 4886 lholzman@theholzmanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara Wyn Kane +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 skane@vkvlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Vagnini +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 jvagnini@vkvlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert John Valli, Jr. +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 rvalli@vkvlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory Keith McGillivary +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 gkm@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Ricksecker +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 dr@wmlaborlaw.com
No Logo Mark Cervantes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DE NOVO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin A Yrungaray +1 951 801 5570 +1 877 932 6223 byrungaray@denovofirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Michelle Koberstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Miriam Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Patricia Soriano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Rhonda Polk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Shetney Roberts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
No Logo Tamika Collins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com
v.
No Logo SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morales Fletcher Law, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Morales Fletcher +1 210 225 0811 +1 210 225 0821 melissa@themoralesfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Morales Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Sarah Hartry +1 210 225 0811 +1 210 225 0821 ahartry@themoralesfirm.com
No Logo Shawn Sullivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morales Fletcher Law, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Morales Fletcher +1 210 225 0811 +1 210 225 0821 melissa@themoralesfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 717

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official and individual capacity as State Budget Director James R. Korth +1 308 284 4001 +1 308 284 8319 jrk@rkslawoffice.com
in his official and individual capacity as State Budget Director Brock J. Pohlmeier +1 308 284 4001 +1 308 284 8319 bjp@rkslawoffice.com
in his official and individual capacity as State Budget Director Robert Bernard Reynolds +1 308 284 4001 +1 308 284 8319 rbr@rkslawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Morales Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Sarah Hartry +1 210 225 0811 +1 210 225 0821 ahartry@themoralesfirm.com
No Logo Veronica Castro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LemberLaw, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny A. DeFrancisco +1 203 653 2250 +1 203 653 3424 jdefrancisco@lemberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris R Miltenberger +1 817 416 5060 +1 817 416 5062 chris@crmlawpractice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Morales Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Sarah Hartry +1 210 225 0811 +1 210 225 0821 ahartry@themoralesfirm.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 207
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re 38 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Sealed Document filed (rf) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document) (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Receipt of Signatures by Lupe Elizondo re 35 Sealed Motion filed (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Sealed Joint Motion filed. (rg) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE, # 2 Proposed Order JOINT MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, # 3 Proposed Order JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE) (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION Withdrawal of Consent by Patricia Soriano, Miriam Thomas (Miltenberger, Chris) Modified on 10/16/2017 (rg). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Consent to be Party Plaintiff of Denia Bradley, Tamika Collins, Gina Gomez, Maria Gonzalez, Michelle Koberstein, Jo Kolar, Latrice McNeil, Latisiha Molett, Rhonda Polk, Crystal Robets, Shetney Roberts, Patrica Soriano, Miriam Thomas by Lupe Elizondo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ADR Report Filed - Jointly filed by Plaintiff and Noted Defendants by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan(Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Mailing Notice and Consent Forms by Lupe Elizondo (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Summons Issued as to Veronica Castro. (rf) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lupe Elizondo. (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion for conditional certification and Notice Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Agreed MOTION to Approve Form of Notice re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Lupe Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 4/13/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(rf) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan, re 23 Opposed MOTION for Conditional Certification and Notice filed by Plaintiff Lupe Elizondo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Opposed MOTION for Conditional Certification and Notice by Lupe Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    First Amended ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan.(Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Consent of Mark Cervantes to be Party Plaintiff by Lupe Elizondo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lupe Elizondo, re 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(c) filed by Defendant Shawn Sullivan, Defendant SA Family Help and Hope LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Sarah Hartry on behalf of SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan (Hartry, Allison) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Sarah Hartry on behalf of Veronica Castro, SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan. Attorney Allison Sarah Hartry added to party Veronica Castro(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Sarah Hartry added to party SA Family Help and Hope LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Sarah Hartry added to party Shawn Sullivan(pty:dft) (Hartry, Allison) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 4-13-17 at 10:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3-22-2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; Jury Trial set for 4-2-2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; ADR Report Deadline due by 6-22-17; Discovery due by 10-20-17; Dispositive Motions due by 12-11-17. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATUS REPORT JOINT FED R CIV P 26 REPORT BY SA FAMILY HELP AND HOPE, LLC, SHAWN SULLIVAN AND PLAINTIFF by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan. (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Scheduling Recommendations AGREED AND FILED BY PLAINTIFF, SA FAMILY HELP AND HOPE LLC AND SHAWN SULLIVAN by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan. (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Certificate of Conference by Lupe Elizondo (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Lupe Elizondo.(Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to 12(c) by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lupe Elizondo. (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Shawn Sullivan. (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by SA Family Help and Hope LLC. (Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court. (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due 3-24-17); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint . Attorney Melissa Morales Fletcher added to party SA Family Help and Hope LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Morales Fletcher added to party Shawn Sullivan(pty:dft) by SA Family Help and Hope LLC, Shawn Sullivan.(Fletcher, Melissa) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Completion of Application for Admission to Western District by Lupe Elizondo (Miltenberger, Chris) (Entered: 02/19/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Filing fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 500037793 (rg) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher R. Miltenberger by on behalf of Lupe Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rg) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Certificate of Interested Parties by Lupe Elizondo. (rg) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              COMPLAINT, filed by Lupe Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(rg) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?