Graham v. UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06326
District Judge Andrea R. Wood, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 23, 2018 at 1:48 AM EDT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Robert E. Graham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Falk Boulton +1 312 343 3228 +1 773 697 7046 boultonlegal@gmail.com
v.
UBS Financial Services, Inc. UBS Financial Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard & Howard Attorneys, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Daehyun Lee +1 312 456 3677 mlee@howardandhoward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian Rowe Ross +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 ian.ross@kyl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) 11 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert E. Graham (Boulton, Stephen) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION regarding complaint 1 , stipulation 8 (Lee, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation 8 , the Court grants Defendant an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead until 8/19/2016. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STIPULATION regarding complaint 1 , summons issued Regarding Responsive Pleading (Taylor, Julie) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney applications to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant 4 and 5 are granted. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant UBS Financial Services, Inc. by Michael Daehyun Lee (Lee, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12091362. (Ross, Ian) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12089765. (Taylor, Julie) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 8/31/2016 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Boulton, Stephen) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT filed by Robert E. Graham; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12058212.(Boulton, Stephen) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 167 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?