Shelor Motor Mile v. Meade
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 7:17-cv-00144

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 1:10 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order of Remand Case to Montgomery County General District Court. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/18/17. (sas)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order Transferring Case to Another Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?