Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00134
District Judge Louis L. Stanton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2017 at 11:38 PM EDT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston, Plaintiff

Represented by Keller Rohrback L.L.P.(WA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Ko +1 206 623 1900 dko@kellerrohrback.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek W Loeser +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian J. Mensher imensher@kellerrohrback.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison E Chase +1 602 248 0088 +1 805 456 1497 achase@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. David Copley +1 206 623 3300 +1 206 623 3384 dcopley@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin B Gould +1 206 623 1900 bgould@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Noburu Kawamoto +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dkawamoto@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Leland +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 bleland@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Steven Preminger +1 212 878 8890 +1 212 878 8895 dpreminger@kellerrohrback.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret E Wetherald +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwetherald@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Williams-Derry +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 awilliams-derry@kellerrohrback.com

Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Gotto - PHV +1 602 248 0088 +1 602 248 2822 ggotto@krplc.com
v.
No Logo Ally Financial Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Ryan +1 617 856 8200

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com
No Logo Banc of America Funding Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
No Logo Bank of Amereica Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America National Association"
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Fink +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 sfink@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles John Ha +1 206 839 4343 charlesha@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anushila Shaw +1 212 506 3554 +1 212 506 5151 ashaw@orrick.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. Craner +1 212 848 5255 +1 212 506 5151 matthew.craner@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Fenton +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 christopher.fenton@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J Frank +1 212 848 5254 +1 646 848 5254 Joseph.Frank@shearman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Kahn +1 212 848 5303 +1 646 848 5303 daniel.kahn@shearman.com

Represented by The Law Office Of Ihsan Dogramaci

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ihsan Dogramaci +1 212 309 7580 idogramaci@idlawoffice.net
No Logo Barry J. O'Brien, Defendant
No Logo BCAP LLC, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Fink +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 sfink@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles John Ha +1 206 839 4343 charlesha@orrick.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anushila Shaw +1 212 506 3554 +1 212 506 5151 ashaw@orrick.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. Craner +1 212 848 5255 +1 212 506 5151 matthew.craner@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Fenton +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 christopher.fenton@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J Frank +1 212 848 5254 +1 646 848 5254 Joseph.Frank@shearman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Kahn +1 212 848 5303 +1 646 848 5303 daniel.kahn@shearman.com

Represented by The Law Office Of Ihsan Dogramaci

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ihsan Dogramaci +1 212 309 7580 idogramaci@idlawoffice.net
No Logo BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACKED SECURITIES I L.L.C., Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, JAMES E. DANIEL
Officer/Director, Vapotherm, Inc.
Officer/Director, Agile Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Maxcyte, Inc.

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin G. Kenneally +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 kevin.kenneally@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick T. Voke +1 617 502 8229 +1 617 502 8269 patrick.voke@leclairryan.com

Represented by Murphy & Mcgonigle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Murphy

Represented by MURPHY & MCGONIGLE, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Scott Matheson +1 804 762 5332 +1 804 762 5361 cmatheson@mmlawus.com

Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. DeMoura +1 617 535 7531 kdemoura@demourasmith.com
No Logo Capital One National Association, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin G. Kenneally +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 kevin.kenneally@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick T. Voke +1 617 502 8229 +1 617 502 8269 patrick.voke@leclairryan.com

Represented by Murphy & Mcgonigle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Murphy

Represented by MURPHY & MCGONIGLE, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Scott Matheson +1 804 762 5332 +1 804 762 5361 cmatheson@mmlawus.com

Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. DeMoura +1 617 535 7531 kdemoura@demourasmith.com
No Logo Chevy Chase Funding LLC, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin G. Kenneally +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 kevin.kenneally@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick T. Voke +1 617 502 8229 +1 617 502 8269 patrick.voke@leclairryan.com

Represented by Murphy & Mcgonigle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Murphy

Represented by MURPHY & MCGONIGLE, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Scott Matheson +1 804 762 5332 +1 804 762 5361 cmatheson@mmlawus.com

Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. DeMoura +1 617 535 7531 kdemoura@demourasmith.com
No Logo Christopher M. O'Meara, Defendant
No Logo Citicorp Mortgage Securities, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
Citigroup Financial Products Inc. Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
No Logo Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
No Logo Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
No Logo Citimortgage, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Morse +1 857 488 4235 remorse@duanemorris.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Young Fergus +1 978 296 3029 kfergus@sprucelawllc.com
No Logo Countrywide Financial Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Gueli +1 212 848 4744 +1 212 848 7179 jgueli@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Keith R. Palfin +1 202 508 8179 +1 202 508 8100 keith.palfin@shearman.com
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Gueli +1 212 848 4744 +1 212 848 7179 jgueli@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Keith R. Palfin +1 202 508 8179 +1 202 508 8100 keith.palfin@shearman.com
No Logo Countrywide Securities Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Gueli +1 212 848 4744 +1 212 848 7179 jgueli@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Keith R. Palfin +1 202 508 8179 +1 202 508 8100 keith.palfin@shearman.com
Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Carlson +1 212 474 1686 +1 212 474 3700 jcarlson@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Cooper
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Ann Moskowitz +1 212 474 1530 +1 212 474 3700 lmoskowitz@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Reynolds +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mreynolds@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. McLaughlin +1 617 345 6154 +1 617 440 6480 mmclaughlin@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Defendant

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Carlson +1 212 474 1686 +1 212 474 3700 jcarlson@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Cooper
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Ann Moskowitz +1 212 474 1530 +1 212 474 3700 lmoskowitz@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Reynolds +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mreynolds@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. McLaughlin +1 617 345 6154 +1 617 440 6480 mmclaughlin@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Credit Suisse Holdings (USA) Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Carlson +1 212 474 1686 +1 212 474 3700 jcarlson@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Cooper
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Ann Moskowitz +1 212 474 1530 +1 212 474 3700 lmoskowitz@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Reynolds +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mreynolds@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. McLaughlin +1 617 345 6154 +1 617 440 6480 mmclaughlin@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Carlson +1 212 474 1686 +1 212 474 3700 jcarlson@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Cooper
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Ann Moskowitz +1 212 474 1530 +1 212 474 3700 lmoskowitz@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Reynolds +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mreynolds@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. McLaughlin +1 617 345 6154 +1 617 440 6480 mmclaughlin@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo CWalt Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Gueli +1 212 848 4744 +1 212 848 7179 jgueli@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Keith R. Palfin +1 202 508 8179 +1 202 508 8100 keith.palfin@shearman.com
No Logo CWmbs, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Gueli +1 212 848 4744 +1 212 848 7179 jgueli@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013 Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Keith R. Palfin +1 202 508 8179 +1 202 508 8100 keith.palfin@shearman.com
No Logo DB Structured Products Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com
No Logo DB U.S. Financial Market Holding Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 John Michael Falzone, III +1 973 639 7099 +1 973 639 7298 john.falzone@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com
No Logo Defendants John Doe 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc.

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 John Michael Falzone, III +1 973 639 7099 +1 973 639 7298 john.falzone@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 John Michael Falzone, III +1 973 639 7099 +1 973 639 7298 john.falzone@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com
No Logo Dlj Mortgage Capital, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Carlson +1 212 474 1686 +1 212 474 3700 jcarlson@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Cooper
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Ann Moskowitz +1 212 474 1530 +1 212 474 3700 lmoskowitz@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Reynolds +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mreynolds@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T. McLaughlin +1 617 345 6154 +1 617 440 6480 mmclaughlin@nixonpeabody.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Edward Grieb, Defendant
No Logo EMC Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo Fitch, Inc., Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce E. Falby +1 617 406 6020 +1 617 406 6100 bruce.falby@dlapiper.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Hogan, III +1 617 573 4701 +1 617 573 4710 bill.hogan@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Paul Weiss (NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew James Ehrlich +1 212 373 3166 +1 212 373 0166 aehrlich@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L. Filburn +1 212 373 3300 cfilburn@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy James Holland +1 212 373 3373 tholland@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tobias Stern, PHV +1 212 373 3172 +1 212 373 0172 tstern@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Wood +1 212 373 3000 jwood@paulweiss.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Flumenbaum +1 212 373 3191 +1 212 492 0191 mflumenbaum@paulweiss.com
No Logo Gmac Mortgage Group, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Ryan +1 617 856 8200

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Kevin M. Bolan +1 781 492 8255 kmccbolan@gmail.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell P. Leino +1 617 573 1648 +1 617 573 1893 russell.leino@state.ma.us
Space Matthew Alex Martel +1 617 960 3939 mmartel@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph B. Sconyers +1 617 449 6901 +1 617 449 6999 jsconyers@jonesday.com

Represented by Lai, Kon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Edelman +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 edelmant@sullcrom.com

Represented by Law Offices of Elizabeth A Wolford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Tomaino +1 585 263 1520 +1 585 263 1600 mtomaino@wolfordfirm.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony A. Bongiorno +1 617 535 4000 +1 617 535 3800 abongiorno@mwe.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/18/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yavar Bathaee +1 212 558 3166 +1 212 291 9210 bathaeey@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Eden Cohen +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 291 9330 cohenja@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher James Dunne +1 212 558 4115 +1 212 558 3494 dunnec@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Howard Klapper +1 212 558 3555 +1 212 558 3588 klapperr@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lara Jean Loyd +1 212 558 4256 +1 212 558 3588 loydl@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Peller +1 212 558 4377 +1 212 558 3588 pellerm@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Quinn +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 quinnjc@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan Toumey Razza +1 212 558 3496 +1 212 558 1600 razzaj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kamil Elaine Redmond +1 212 558 4799 +1 212 558 3588 redmondk@sullcrom.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie G Wheeler +1 212 558 7384 +1 212 558 3588 wheelers@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 01/30/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Chen Yu Shih +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shihg@sullcrom.com
No Logo IMH Assets Corp., Defendant

Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Pearce Smith +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 tsmith@cm-p.com

Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Sandra Denise Hauser +1 212 768 6802 +1 212 768 6800 sandra.hauser@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Justin Nessim Kattan +1 212 768 6923 +1 212 768 6800 justin.kattan@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip A. O'Connell, Jr. +1 617 235 6802 +1 617 235 6899 philip.oconnelljr@dentons.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Patrick Edmund Fitzmaurice +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 patrick.fitzmaurice@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Impac Funding Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Pearce Smith +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 tsmith@cm-p.com

Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Sandra Denise Hauser +1 212 768 6802 +1 212 768 6800 sandra.hauser@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Justin Nessim Kattan +1 212 768 6923 +1 212 768 6800 justin.kattan@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip A. O'Connell, Jr. +1 617 235 6802 +1 617 235 6899 philip.oconnelljr@dentons.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Patrick Edmund Fitzmaurice +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 patrick.fitzmaurice@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Pearce Smith +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 tsmith@cm-p.com

Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Sandra Denise Hauser +1 212 768 6802 +1 212 768 6800 sandra.hauser@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Justin Nessim Kattan +1 212 768 6923 +1 212 768 6800 justin.kattan@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip A. O'Connell, Jr. +1 617 235 6802 +1 617 235 6899 philip.oconnelljr@dentons.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Patrick Edmund Fitzmaurice +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 patrick.fitzmaurice@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Impac Secured Assets Corp., Defendant

Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Pearce Smith +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 tsmith@cm-p.com

Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Sandra Denise Hauser +1 212 768 6802 +1 212 768 6800 sandra.hauser@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Justin Nessim Kattan +1 212 768 6923 +1 212 768 6800 justin.kattan@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip A. O'Connell, Jr. +1 617 235 6802 +1 617 235 6899 philip.oconnelljr@dentons.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2014 Patrick Edmund Fitzmaurice +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 patrick.fitzmaurice@troutmansanders.com
No Logo J.P Morgan Acceptance Corporation I, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo James J Sullivan, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
JPMorgan Securities Holdings LLC JPMorgan Securities Holdings LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo Kristine Smith, Defendant
No Logo Lana Franks, Defendant
No Logo Mark Zusy, Defendant
No Logo Mcgraw Hill Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Validus Holdings, Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mk Rail Corp
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ithaca Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bibb Co /de
Officer/Director, Digirad Corp
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, ML Hertz Co-Investor, L.P.
Officer/Director, GMI Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund II Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Utility Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pioneer Floating Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
No Logo Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc. Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
No Logo MIT Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com

Represented by MIT Holdings, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MIT Holdings, Inc.
No Logo Moody's Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Maroney +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 michael.maroney@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth M Mitchell +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 emitchell@hklaw.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Hogan, III +1 617 573 4701 +1 617 573 4710 bill.hogan@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Lurie +1 212 404 8782 dlurie@ssbb.com

Represented by Satterlee Stephens Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Coster +1 212 818 9200 +1 212 818 9606 jcoster@ssbb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Charles Edwards +1 212 818 9200 gedwards@ssbb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua M. Rubins - PHV +1 212 818 9200 +1 212 818 9606 jrubins@ssbb.com

Represented by Warner & Stackpole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph T. Lepore, III +1 617 951 9000
No Logo Moody's Investors Service, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Maroney +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 michael.maroney@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth M Mitchell +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 emitchell@hklaw.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Hogan, III +1 617 573 4701 +1 617 573 4710 bill.hogan@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Lurie +1 212 404 8782 dlurie@ssbb.com

Represented by Satterlee Stephens Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Coster +1 212 818 9200 +1 212 818 9606 jcoster@ssbb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua M. Rubins - PHV +1 212 818 9200 +1 212 818 9606 jrubins@ssbb.com

Represented by Warner & Stackpole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph T. Lepore, III +1 617 951 9000
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley & CO Inc"
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frances S Cohen +1 617 951 8872 +1 617 951 8736 frances.cohen@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE +1 617 951 8230 +1 617 951 8736 patrick.strawbridge@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 08/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frances S Cohen +1 617 951 8872 +1 617 951 8736 frances.cohen@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE +1 617 951 8230 +1 617 951 8736 patrick.strawbridge@bingham.com

Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Christopher Wilcox +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 swilcox@cohengresser.com
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Christopher Wilcox +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 swilcox@cohengresser.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund Polubinski, III +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3695 epolub@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Vanatko +1 212 450 4000 vanatko@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund Polubinski, III +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3695 epolub@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Vanatko +1 212 450 4000 vanatko@davispolk.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Burke +1 617 951 8620 +1 617 951 8736 timothy.burke@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie V. Silva Palmer +1 617 951 8417 julie.palmer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie V. Silva Palmer +1 617 951 8417 julie.palmer@morganlewis.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon L. Bigelow +1 617 946 4929 bbigelow@seyfarth.com
TERMINATED: 11/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon L. Bigelow +1 617 946 4929 bbigelow@seyfarth.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Moran +1 617 573 8931 +1 617 573 4590 moranmi@SEC.GOV
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Moran +1 617 573 8931 +1 617 573 4590 moranmi@SEC.GOV

Represented by Bigham Englar Jones & Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Burke +1 617 951 8620 +1 617 951 8736 timothy.burke@morganlewis.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc, Defendant

Represented by Bigham Englar Jones & Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Burke +1 617 951 8620 +1 617 951 8736 timothy.burke@morganlewis.com

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frances S Cohen +1 617 951 8872 +1 617 951 8736 frances.cohen@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE +1 617 951 8230 +1 617 951 8736 patrick.strawbridge@bingham.com

Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Christopher Wilcox +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 swilcox@cohengresser.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Davis +1 212 450 3219 +1 212 450 5535 peter.davis@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund Polubinski, III +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3695 epolub@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Anthony Ramos +1 213 880 1843 christopher.ramos@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Colen Robinson +1 212 450 4925 alexander.robinson@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Vanatko +1 212 450 4000 vanatko@davispolk.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie V. Silva Palmer +1 617 951 8417 julie.palmer@morganlewis.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon L. Bigelow +1 617 946 4929 bbigelow@seyfarth.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Moran +1 617 573 8931 +1 617 573 4590 moranmi@SEC.GOV
No Logo Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bigham Englar Jones & Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P. Burke +1 617 951 8620 +1 617 951 8736 timothy.burke@morganlewis.com

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frances S Cohen +1 617 951 8872 +1 617 951 8736 frances.cohen@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK N. STRAWBRIDGE +1 617 951 8230 +1 617 951 8736 patrick.strawbridge@bingham.com

Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Christopher Wilcox +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 swilcox@cohengresser.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Davis +1 212 450 3219 +1 212 450 5535 peter.davis@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund Polubinski, III +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3695 epolub@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Anthony Ramos +1 213 880 1843 christopher.ramos@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Colen Robinson +1 212 450 4925 alexander.robinson@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Vanatko +1 212 450 4000 vanatko@davispolk.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie V. Silva Palmer +1 617 951 8417 julie.palmer@morganlewis.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon L. Bigelow +1 617 946 4929 bbigelow@seyfarth.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Moran +1 617 573 8931 +1 617 573 4590 moranmi@SEC.GOV
No Logo Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. O'Brien +1 212 909 7000

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alexander Fumerton +1 212 735 3902 +1 212 777 3902 rfumerto@skadden.com
No Logo MortgageIT Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com

Represented by MortgageIT Holdings, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MortgageIT Holdings, Inc.
No Logo Mortgageit, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 John Michael Falzone, III +1 973 639 7099 +1 973 639 7298 john.falzone@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com

Represented by Mortgageit, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MortgageIT Inc
No Logo Mortgageit Securities Corp., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 Steven J. Pacini +1 617 570 1416 spacini@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 John Michael Falzone, III +1 973 639 7099 +1 973 639 7298 john.falzone@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/10/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Lynn Giordano +1 202 637 1013 +1 202 637 2201 jennifer.giordano@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jason C Hegt +1 212 906 1686 jason.hegt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fong Jaroff +1 212 906 4638 +1 212 751 4864 aaron.jaroff@lw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED VINCENT M. MEKLES +1 973 639 1234 vincent.mekles@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Richard David Owens +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 richard.owens@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Jessica D. Rostoker +1 212 906 1200 jessica.rostoker@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Paul Anthony Serritella +1 212 906 1632 +1 212 751 4864 paul.serritella@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016 William J. Trach +1 617 880 4514 william.trach@lw.com
TERMINATED: 04/29/2016, PRO HAC VICE Jamie L. Wine +1 213 485 1234 jamie.wine@lw.com

Represented by Mortgageit Securities Corp.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mortgageit Securities Corp.
No Logo Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Breslin Brady +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 wbrady@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Poss +1 617 570 1886 +1 617 523 1231 sposs@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Prugh Roeser +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 droeser@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Breslin Brady +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 wbrady@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Poss +1 617 570 1886 +1 617 523 1231 sposs@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Prugh Roeser +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 droeser@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Nomura Holding America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Breslin Brady +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 wbrady@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Poss +1 617 570 1886 +1 617 523 1231 sposs@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Prugh Roeser +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 droeser@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Nomura Securities International, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Nomura Holdings, Inc.

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Breslin Brady +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 wbrady@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Poss +1 617 570 1886 +1 617 523 1231 sposs@goodwinprocter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Prugh Roeser +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 droeser@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo RBS Acceptance Inc., Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Azure Marie Aronsson +1 617 371 1008 aaronsson@collorallp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy B. Weinman +1 617 371 1004 +1 617 371 1037 kweinman@collorallp.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Kibler +1 310 407 7515 +1 310 407 7502 mkibler@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linton Mann +1 212 455 2654 lmann@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R. Meltzer +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jmeltzer@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Turner +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 aturner@stblaw.com
No Logo Rbs Financial Products, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Azure Marie Aronsson +1 617 371 1008 aaronsson@collorallp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy B. Weinman +1 617 371 1004 +1 617 371 1037 kweinman@collorallp.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Kibler +1 310 407 7515 +1 310 407 7502 mkibler@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linton Mann +1 212 455 2654 lmann@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R. Meltzer +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jmeltzer@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Turner +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 aturner@stblaw.com
No Logo RBS Holdings USA Inc., Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Azure Marie Aronsson +1 617 371 1008 aaronsson@collorallp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy B. Weinman +1 617 371 1004 +1 617 371 1037 kweinman@collorallp.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Kibler +1 310 407 7515 +1 310 407 7502 mkibler@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linton Mann +1 212 455 2654 lmann@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R. Meltzer +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jmeltzer@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Turner +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 aturner@stblaw.com
No Logo Rbs Securities, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Collora LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Azure Marie Aronsson +1 617 371 1008 aaronsson@collorallp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy B. Weinman +1 617 371 1004 +1 617 371 1037 kweinman@collorallp.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Kibler +1 310 407 7515 +1 310 407 7502 mkibler@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linton Mann +1 212 455 2654 lmann@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/16/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R. Meltzer +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jmeltzer@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Turner +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 aturner@stblaw.com
No Logo Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Ryan +1 617 856 8200

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE James Matthew Goodin +1 312 443 0472 +1 312 896 6472 jmgoodin@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE P. Russell Perdew +1 312 443 0700 +1 312 443 0336 pperdew@lordbissell.com

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Briansky +1 617 449 6500 rbriansky@mccarter.comcom
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy B. Hackett +1 617 456 8000 ahackett@mccarter.com

Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Thomas Justin Cunningham +1 312 443 1731 +1 312 443 6731 tcunningham@lockelord.com
No Logo Residential Funding Company, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Ryan +1 617 856 8200

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Thomas Justin Cunningham +1 312 443 1731 +1 312 443 6731 tcunningham@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE James Matthew Goodin +1 312 443 0472 +1 312 896 6472 jmgoodin@lockelord.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE P. Russell Perdew +1 312 443 0700 +1 312 443 0336 pperdew@lordbissell.com

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Briansky +1 617 449 6500 rbriansky@mccarter.comcom
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy B. Hackett +1 617 456 8000 ahackett@mccarter.com
No Logo Richard McKinney, Defendant
No Logo Richard S. Fuld, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Samir Tabet, Defendant
No Logo Sandler O'neill & Partners, L.p., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Rosensweig +1 617 574 3588 +1 617 574 7505 rrosensweig@goulstonstorrs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall D. Senterfitt +1 617 574 7853 +1 617 574 7552 msenterfitt@goulstonstorrs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Zielinski +1 617 574 4029 +1 617 574 7664 rzielinski@goulstonstorrs.com
No Logo Standard & Poor's Financial Services LLC, Defendant

Represented by CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Buckley +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 sbuckley@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Linken +1 212 701 3715 +1 212 378 4137 plinken@cahill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Floyd Abrams, PHV +1 212 701 3621 +1 212 378 2137 fabrams@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sogol Davina Somekh +1 212 701 3054 +1 212 378 4454 ssomekh@cahill.com

Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Lynn Roy +1 212 701 3720 +1 212 269 5420 troy@cahill.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick T. Clendenen +1 617 573 4709 +1 617 573 4710 pat.clendenen@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Bennett +1 617 573 4773 heather.bennett@nelsonmullins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Hogan, III +1 617 573 4701 +1 617 573 4710 bill.hogan@nelsonmullins.com
No Logo Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo The Bear Stearns Companies LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
The McGraw-Hill Companies The McGraw-Hill Companies, Defendant
Officially listed as "The McGraw-Hill Companies Inc."

Represented by CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Buckley +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 sbuckley@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Linken +1 212 701 3715 +1 212 378 4137 plinken@cahill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Floyd Abrams, PHV +1 212 701 3621 +1 212 378 2137 fabrams@cahill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sogol Davina Somekh +1 212 701 3054 +1 212 378 4454 ssomekh@cahill.com

Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Lynn Roy +1 212 701 3720 +1 212 269 5420 troy@cahill.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick T. Clendenen +1 617 573 4709 +1 617 573 4710 pat.clendenen@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Bennett +1 617 573 4773 heather.bennett@nelsonmullins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Hogan, III +1 617 573 4701 +1 617 573 4710 bill.hogan@nelsonmullins.com
No Logo UBS Americas Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. O'Brien +1 212 909 7000

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Alexander Fumerton +1 212 735 3902 +1 212 777 3902 rfumerto@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
No Logo WAMU Capital Corp.,, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theo J. Robins +1 212 705 7961 +1 212 752 5378 theo.robins@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo Bank National Association"
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Louis Ward +1 617 310 6000 wardda@gtlaw.com
Space David Louis Ward +1 617 310 6000 wardda@gtlaw.com

Represented by Michaels, Ward & Rabinovitz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John K. Wells +1 617 350 4040 jkw@michaelsward.com
Space John K. Wells +1 617 350 4040 jkw@michaelsward.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Garvey +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 3702 george.garvey@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Mongan +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 644 6951 michael.mongan@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian K Wrede +1 415 512 4000 +1 213 683 5103 Christian.Wrede@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Garvey +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 3702 george.garvey@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Mongan +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 644 6951 michael.mongan@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian K Wrede +1 415 512 4000 +1 213 683 5103 Christian.Wrede@mto.com
No Logo Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Louis Ward +1 617 310 6000 wardda@gtlaw.com

Represented by Michaels, Ward & Rabinovitz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John K. Wells +1 617 350 4040 jkw@michaelsward.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Garvey +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 3702 george.garvey@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Mongan +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 644 6951 michael.mongan@mto.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian K Wrede +1 415 512 4000 +1 213 683 5103 Christian.Wrede@mto.com
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Miscellaneous

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina N. Davilas +1 617 951 8890 +1 617 428 6414 christina.davilas@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikki J. Fisher +1 617 951 8294 +1 617 951 8736 nikki.fisher@bingham.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT H. BARON +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 merck@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Belelieu +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 cbelelieu@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karin A. DeMasi +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 kdemasi@cravath.com
TERMINATED: 05/03/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Wesley Earnhardt +1 212 474 1138 wearnhardt@cravath.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013 Beth I. Z. Boland +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 bboland@foley.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary R. Greenberg +1 617 310 6013 +1 617 310 6001 greenbergg@gtlaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline S. Delbasty +1 617 951 8644 jacqueline.delbasty@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 10/07/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ian Schacter +1 212 705 7000 +1 212 752 5378 kenneth.schacter@morganlewis.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Gonzalez Barton +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 bartont@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Scott Cafasso +1 212 558 1674 +1 212 558 3588 cafassod@sullcrom.com
TERMINATED: 06/06/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Joan Cambria +1 212 558 7353 +1 212 291 9327 cambriaa@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suhana S. Han +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 hans@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Compton Hughes +1 212 558 4690 +1 212 291 9531 hughesw@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446nr
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (592) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glenn Charles Edwards on behalf of Moody's Corporation. (Edwards, Glenn) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steven Preminger on behalf of Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Preminger, David) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:11-cv-10952. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2017) (mj). (Entered: 02/13/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/30/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery to be completed by 3/17/2017 (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/30/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting in part 534 Motion ; granting in part 553 Motion for Discovery; granting 569 Motion for Discovery; granting 601 Motion for Modification (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/30/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 511 Motion to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 14, 2016, before Judge George A. OToole. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com Redaction Request due 1/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS REPORT --Updated Status Report-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Bonds in Litigation, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Defendants in Litigation)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston, 542 MOTION Enlarge Deposition Time, 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston, 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. The court takes the motions under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: Derek Loeser, Gary Gotto, Amy Williams-Derry, Dean Kawamoto, Tom Shapiro; For Defendant: James Coster, Lauren Moskowitz, Stephen Poss, Jonathan Sablone, Edmund Polubinski, William Brady) (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 604 Motion to Seal Document (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DECLARATION re 569 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses Supplemental Declaration of Edmund Polubinski III in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses [REDACTED] by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit Y (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit Z, # 4 Exhibit AA (Filed Under Seal))(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY to Response to 569 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses [REDACTED] filed by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Assented-To Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Additional Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 602 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Joint MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copies for all submissions relating to the pending motions. The courtesy copies shall be submitted on or before November 28, 2016. The parties should confer and submit one set of courtesy copies. Each motion should be organized in binder(s). The binder should include all documents associated with each motion, including all memoranda, affidavits/declarations, and exhibits in support of and in opposition to the motion. Documents, including exhibits, should be separated by tabs, be clearly marked with the stamp Courtesy Copy on each page, and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. Where materials have been docketed in redacted form and under seal, the parties shall include only the sealed, unredacted documents. If the parties have questions about the document number assigned by CM/ECF to sealed materials, they may contact the Docket Clerk for assistance with identifying the appropriate document numbers. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating 526 Motion to Enlarge Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiffs Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates and the corresponding sealed motion 542 pursuant to the parties 552 Stipulation. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 592 Motion to Seal (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal --Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Claims-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Amy Williams-Derry in Opposition re 592 Assented to MOTION to Seal --Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time--, 569 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses --Redacted Declaration of Amy Williams-Derry in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Cover page for exhibit submitted under seal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Cover page for exhibit submitted under seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Letter dated October 7, 2016 to Scott Wilcox, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Letter dated October 21, 2016, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 5 to 33 Cover page for exhibits submitted under seal, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 34 Defendants Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Plaintiff)(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time re 569 Assented to MOTION to Seal --Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time--, 569 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses --Redacted Opposition of Plaintiff to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) Modified on 11/15/2016 (Halley, Taylor). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal --Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 586 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/14/16 to file opposition to 569 (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 14, 2016 to File --Assented-To Motion to Extend Date for Filing Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 579 Motion to Seal (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 576 Motion to Seal (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Seal --Motion for Leave to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Authorize Discovery, or in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Derek W. Loeser in Support re 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- --Redacted Declaration of Derek W. Loeser in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Letter dated November 3, 2016, from William B. Brady, counsel for the Nomura Defendants, to Benjamin Gould, counsel for Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter dated October 25, 2016, from Lauren A. Moskowitz, counsel for the Credit Suisse Defendants, to Ian Mensher, counsel for Plaintiff, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Letter dated October 26, 2016, from Edmund Polubinski, counsel for the Morgan Stanley Defendants, to Ian Mensher, counsel for Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Exhibit filed under seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Exhibit filed under seal, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Redacted e-mail dated October 26, 2016, from David Ko, counsel for Plaintiff, to Arlen Pyenson and Daniel Zelenko, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - E-mail dated November 1, 2016, from David Ko, counsel for Plaintiff, to Joshua Klein,, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 is a true and correct copy of a Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions, filed on July 3, 2013, in United States ex rel. Banigan v. Organon USA Inc. et al., No. 07-12153-RWZ (D. Mass.).)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY to Response to 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- --Redacted Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Reply Brief Regarding Deposition Limits-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 562 Motion to Seal; granting 564 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 568 Motion to Seal Document (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DECLARATION Of Edmund Polubinski III In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses [REDACTED] by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit B (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit C (Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit D (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit E (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit F (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit G (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit H (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit K (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 569 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses [REDACTED] filed by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time To Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Portfolio Manager Witnesses by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Document In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REDACTION Declaration of Edmund Polubinski III in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Authorize Discovery or, in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order to Facilitate Disclosure of Confidential Non-Party Mortgage Borrower Information to Third Parties byCredit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (under seal), # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (under seal), # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H (under seal), # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J (under seal), # 11 Exhibit K (under seal), # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REDACTION Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Discovery, or in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order to Facilitate Disclosure of Confidential Non-Party Mortgage Borrower Information to Third Parties [Response to Dkt. #542] byCredit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Sablone in Opposition re 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 7, # 2 Exhibit 8 - 82, # 3 Exhibit 83, # 4 Exhibit 84)(Sablone, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Discovery, or in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Sablone, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal of Defendants for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Deposition Limits by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Sablone, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Order entered from the U.S. Supreme Court. The Petition for a Writ of Certiorari is Denied. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Reset Deadlines as to 542 MOTION Enlarge Deposition Time, 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits--. Responses due on or before 10/26/2016. Defendant's reply brief due on or before 11/04/2016. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 558 Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Plaintiff's Discovery Motions. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Plaintiff's Discovery Motions by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  STIPULATION Withdrawing Docket No. 526 by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 546 Motion for Extension of Time to October 17, 2016 to file Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiffs Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 537 Motion to Seal (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 533 Motion to Seal (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the motion hearing date, the status conference set for 10/24/16 is cancelled. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 546 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 17, 2016 to file Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiffs Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates , 526 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates, 537 MOTION to Seal re Motion to Authorize Discovery, or in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order, 542 MOTION Enlarge Deposition Time, 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits--, 533 MOTION to Seal --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits Under Seal--, 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 17, 2016 to file Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiffs Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston re 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer --Notice of Denial of Certiorari-- (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 540 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Ko. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Ko Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6322625 by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Adam) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 531 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Cooper. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 530 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James W. Carlson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal re Motion to Authorize Discovery, or in the Alternative, Amend the Protective Order by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 533 MOTION to Seal --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits Under Seal--, 534 MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- --REDACTED Declaration of Derek W. Loeser in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 September 2, 2016 correspondence from Ian Mensher to Lauren Moskowitz, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 September 2, 2016 correspondence from Ian Mensher to Edmund Polubinski, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 September 2, 2016 correspondence from Dean N. Kawamoto to Michael W. Restey, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 September 2, 2016 correspondence from Dean N. Kawamoto to William B. Brady, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 September 2, 2016 correspondence from David J. Ko to Linton Mann III, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 September 19, 2016 correspondence from Edmund Polubinski to Gary Gotto, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Email string September 25 to September 29, 2016, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 October 4, 2016 correspondence from Edmund Polubinski to Ian Mensher, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 9 through 23 Documents submitted Under Seal)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 533 MOTION to Seal --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits Under Seal-- --REDACTED--Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to take ten depositions of each Defendant group --Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Documents in Support of Plaintiffs Motion regarding Deposition Limits Under Seal-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Brady on behalf of Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Brady, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Cooper Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6321353 by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Sablone, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James W. Carlson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6321304 by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Sablone, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 525 Motion to Seal (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 526 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates [REDACTED] Declaration of Edmund Polubinski III in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 526 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates REDACTED filed by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time to Permit Fair Examination of Plaintiff's Credit Analysts for the Relevant Certificates by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal of Defendants for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Deposition Time by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 522 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter J. Davis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 521 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Ramos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter J. Davis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6261685 by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Ramos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6261654 by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Case Appealed to Supreme Court of the United States, Case Number 16-180. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer --Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Sever Claims against Moodys and to Transfer-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. re 516 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer filed by Moody's Corporation, Moody's Investors Service, Inc.. (Lepore, Ralph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal --Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Barclays Defendants-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      USCA TAXATION OF COSTS as to 435 Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. re 513 Stipulation filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer re Briefing Schedule by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Gould, Benjamin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 511 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sever Claims Against Moody's and to Transfer by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA as to 435 Notice of Appeal filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. Appeal 435 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference held on May 10, 2016, before Judge George A. OToole. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com Redaction Request due 6/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/10/2016. Counsel informs the court that they are confident in meeting the 12/1/16 date for completion of fact discovery. ( Status Conference set for 10/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr..). (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiff: Derek Loeser, Amy Williams-Derry, Thomas Shapiro; For Defendants: Edmund Polubinski, Jonathan Sablone, Lauren Moskowitz) (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered withdrawing 488 Motion to Compel; withdrawing 488 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 505 Motion to Continue. The court notes the motion practice has been resolved. The status conference will proceed as scheduled.(GAO, law1) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Continue May 10, 2016 Status Conference to a date on or after October 14, 2016 by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston.(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered terminating 469 Motion to Compel (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Judgment (14-8046) as to 435 Notice of Appeal filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. In light of the issuance of the Court's May 2, 2016 opinion and judgment in No. 14-2148, the Bank's Motion to Consolidate and its Petition for Permission to Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) are denied as moot. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Judgment as to 435 Notice of Appeal filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. The district court's order dismissing Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston's claims against Moody Corporation and Moody's Investors Services, Inc., is VACATED, and the matter REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Costs to Federal Home Loan bank of Boston. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION of USCA as to 435 Notice of Appeal filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Eric Fierro in Support re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions --Second Declaration of Eric Fierro in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Alison Chase in Support re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions --Second Declaration of Alison Chase in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Exhibit A - letter dated April 26, 2016, from Alison Chase to Turner P. Smith, # 2 Exhibit - Exhibit B - letter dated April 29, 2016, from Turner P. Smith to Alison Chase)(Chase, Alison) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions --Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation (Leave to File Granted 04/29/16, Dkt. 496)-- filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Withdrawing Dkt. No. 469 by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC. (Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 495 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Reply brief is limited to no more than 7 pages. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File --Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order --[Proposed] Order Granting Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation--)(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Wichmann in Opposition re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions filed by IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Exhibit -B, # 3 Exhibit -C)(Smith, Turner) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions filed by IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp.. (Smith, Turner) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Remark: At the upcoming status conference, the Court will hear argument as necessary on the pending discovery motions. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Eric Fierro in Support re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Index Engines quote)(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Alison Chase in Support re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - September 30, 2015 letter from Andrew B. Zinman, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from February 25, 2016 deposition of Jim Malloy, Senior Vice President for Capital Markets at Impac, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from February 25, 2016 deposition of Stephen Wichmann, Vice President and Associate General Counsel at Impac, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - September 19, 2008 letter from Michael J. Quinn, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - July 28, 2008 letter from Megan M. Bergstrom, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - February 16, 2016 e-mail from Turner P. Smith, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - February 19, 2016 e-mail from Turner P. Smith, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Page v. Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., et al., No. SACV07-1447 AG (MLGx) Amended Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA), filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California on May 9, 2008, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Excerpt from Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc. Form 10-Q filed with the SEC on August 10, 2009, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - May 19, 2011 letter from Elizabeth Leland, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - January 13, 2016 letter from Turner P. Smith, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - September 14, 2015 letter from Benjamin Gould, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - October 13, 2015 letter from Benjamin Gould, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - December 10, 2015 letter from Beth Leland, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - January 7, 2016 letter from Alison Chase, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - March 31, 2016 letter from Alison Chase, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Excerpt from Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc. form 10-K filed with the SEC on March 11, 2016, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 April 8, 2016 letter from Turner P. Smith)(Chase, Alison) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 488 MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation-- MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel --Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation--, MOTION for Sanctions ( Responses due by 4/25/2016) by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Impose Sanctions for Spoliation)(Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 486 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, Supplemental Declaration of Edmund Polubinski III In Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AC)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 469 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans Leave to File Granted on March 30, 2016 filed by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 480 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 482 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added ALEXANDER C. ROBINSON. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 481 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ian Mensher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexander C. Robinson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6042663 by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Robinson Certification)(Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ian Mensher Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6042462 by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stewart, Adam) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 477 Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Dean N. Kawamoto in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Kawamoto, Dean) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 477 Opposition to Motion, Declaration of George Collins in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Kawamoto, Dean) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 469 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Kawamoto, Dean) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 469 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans --Stipulation and Proposed Order re Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Kawamoto, Dean) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 468 Motion to Seal (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 469 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans Declaration of Edmund Polubinski III In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit G - 2006 Form 10-K, # 8 Exhibit H - 2007 Form 10-K, # 9 Exhibit I -2008 Form 10-K, # 10 Exhibit J- Defendants Joint Requests, # 11 Exhibit Plaintiff Objections and Responses, # 12 Exhibit L - William Monahan Letter, # 13 Exhibit M- Dean Kawamoto Letter, # 14 Exhibit N - William Monahan Letter, # 15 Exhibit O- Lillian Grossbard Redacted Letter, # 16 Exhibit P - Amy Williams-Derry Letter, # 17 Exhibit Q- Amy Williams-Derry Letter, # 18 Exhibit R- James Carlson Redacted Letter, # 19 Exhibit Elizabeth Leland Redacted Letter, # 20 Exhibit Edmund Polubinski III Redacted Letter, # 21 Exhibit U - Amy Williams-Derry Letter, # 22 Exhibit V - Elizabeth Leland Letter, # 23 Exhibit W - Edmund Polubinski III Letter, # 24 Exhibit X - Edmund Polubinski III Redacted Letter, # 25 Exhibit Y - Amy Williams- Derry Redacted Letter, # 26 Exhibit Z - Edmund Polubinski III Letter, # 27 Exhibit AA - Dean N. Kawamoto Letter, # 28 Exhibit AB - Edmund Polubinski III Letter)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 469 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans [Redacted] filed by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Own Review of Residential Mortgage Loans by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Motion of Defendants For Leave to File Documents in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Under Seal by BCAP LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., IMH Assets Corp., Impac Funding Corporation, Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Impac Secured Assets Corp., Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBS Acceptance Inc., RBS Financial Products Inc., RBS Holdings USA Inc., RBS Securities Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC.(Polubinski, Edmund) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Roeser on behalf of Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Roeser, Daniel) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference held on October 19, 2015, before Judge George A. OToole. COA Case No. 14-2148 and 14-8046. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com Redaction Request due 3/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal --Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Defendants and as to Certain Transactions-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 457 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott Wilcox. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston for proceedings held on October 19, 2015 Judge Judge George A. OToole.. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/19/2015, Production of Documents by 4/29/16, ( Fact Discovery to be completed by 12/1/2016), ( Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr..). (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso at m.patrisso@outlook.com.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiffs: Derek Loeser,Gary Grotto, Amy Williams-Derry; For Defendants: Stephen Poss, Edmund Polubinski, Lauren Moskowitz) (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (Defendants' Status Report and Proposed Case Schedule) by Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. (Queenin, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT --Status Report and Proposed Case Schedule-- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On or before the close of business on October 16, 2015, the plaintiff shall file a status report describing the present status of the case and listing all remaining active defendants.(Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott Wilcox Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5789763 by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.,, Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Wilcox Certification)(Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 455 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William J. O'Brien and Robert A. Fumerton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William J. O'Brien, Robert A. Fumerton Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5767530 by Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Carroll, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 10/19/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher R. Fenton (Fenton, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael C. Moran (Moran, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Julie V. Silva Palmer on behalf of Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC (Silva Palmer, Julie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Aaron Jaroff (Jaroff, Aaron) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION -- Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Transactions and Certain Additional Defendants [Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. and DB U.S. Financial Market Holding Corp. re Certificate JPMMT 2005-ALT1 2A1; Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc. and Morgan Stanley re Certificate LUM 2005-1 A1; UBS Securities LLC and UBS Americas Inc. re Certificate LUM 2006-3 11A1] -- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I LLC, The Bear Stearns Companies LLC (f/k/a The Bear Stearns Companies Inc.), EMC Mortgage LLC (f/k/a EMC Mortgage Corporation), J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (f/k/a Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc. and J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.), JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Securities Holdings LLC, Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II, Inc., and WaMu Capital Corp. only by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Patrick Strawbridge (Strawbridge, Patrick) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Margaret E Wetherald (Wetherald, Margaret) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Heather L. Bennett (Bennett, Heather) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Scott Wilcox on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., and Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC (collectively, the Morgan Stanley Defendants) in this matter. (Wilcox, Scott) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 424 Motion for Clarification. Clarification is unnecessary as the reasons for entering final judgment under Rule 54(b) are set forth in the Court's 422 Opinion and Order. (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mortgage Asset Securitization Transactions, Inc., UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Carroll, James) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Michael C. Moran (Moran, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. re 438 Stipulation filed by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston (Lyness, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brandon L. Bigelow (Bigelow, Brandon) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION --- Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Production and Exchange of Confidential Information from Non-Parties FDIC-Receiver and OneWest Bank N.A. --- by Federal Home Loan Bank of Boston. (Williams-Derry, Amy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/13/2017.] (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/3