Panther LLC
Bankruptcy Case Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-52095
District Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 21, 2017 at 12:05 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of US Trustee"
No Logo Panther LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Co, Roseland Property

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian Schaible +1 212 450 4580 +1 212 450 3580
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/02/2014. (Related Doc # 6) (Admin.) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Final Decree . (rit, m) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Receipt of Transferred Case from Southern District of New York. (Entered: 12/20/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Order Transferring Venue of the Cases to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Missouri signed on 12/19/2012. All Further Motions, Pleadings and Papers Should Be Filed on the Docket of Case Number 12-51502 in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. (Chien, Jason). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2012.] (Entered: 12/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Order signed on 7/10/2012 by the Honorable Allan L. Gropper Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Cases; The Docket in Chapter 11 Case 12-12900 (SCC) Should be Consulted for All Matters Concerning this Case. (Related Doc # 2). (Chien, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2012.] (Entered: 07/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Damian Schaible on behalf of Panther LLC. (Schaible, Damian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2012.] (Entered: 07/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Damian Schaible of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP on behalf of Panther LLC. (Schaible, Damian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2012.] (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Space Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 20 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?