Didonato et al v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-08683
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2017 at 12:27 AM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frances Didonato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
No Logo Richard Didonato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 100 Church, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 120 Broadway Holding, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 150 Broadway N.Y. Associates L.P., Defendant
No Logo 160 Water St. Inc., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings LLC., Defendant
No Logo 30 Broad Street Associates, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holding LLC., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holding LLC., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northwest, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Acrow Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo Allcom Electric Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Defendant
No Logo ASG Pest Control, Defendant
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Concrete Corp., Defendant
No Logo Avanti Demolition & Carting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza, Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Bovis International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Branch Services, Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brown Harris Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Caledonian Insurance Comp., Defendant
No Logo Caledonian Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Capital Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carlos Construction, Defendant
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarco Enterprises Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Clarco Enterprises LLC., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Developement, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cooper Square Realty, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank"
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Empire State Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Entertainment Partners Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F&G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equites, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo G & G Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Defendant
No Logo GLO Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HP Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hunter Construction, Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Corporation J.P. Morgan Chase Corporation, Defendant
No Logo JEMB Realty Corp, Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kibel Companies, Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaQuilla Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Lefrak Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company-MA, Defendant
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo LIRO, INC, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo M.G. McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mayore Estates LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo MG McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Milford Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Milstein Properties Corp., Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service, Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering P.C., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, PC, Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Murray Hill Properties, Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Off Road Welding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo One Wall Street Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich-Mark Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockrose Development Corp, Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo RY Management, Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Sakele Brothes, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contractors, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owings & Merrill LLP, Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Summit Structures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Telenet Communication Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Bank of New York, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo The Related Companies, L.p., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Coproration of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction of New York, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Toretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Trammell Crow Company, Defendant
No Logo Trinity Centre LLC, Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Consulting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vanguard Equities Inc., Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Lend, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Technology, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates, LLP., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, LLC., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B. Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi &Sons, Inc, Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Zar Realty Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Zeckendorf Realty, Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Holdings Limited, ADR Provider
No Logo Bovis International, Inc., ADR Provider
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., ADR Provider
City of New York City of New York, ADR Provider
No Logo Evans Environmental, ADR Provider
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company-MA, ADR Provider
No Logo MRA Engineering P.C., ADR Provider
No Logo Phillips And Jordan, Inc., ADR Provider
No Logo Silverite Contractors, ADR Provider
No Logo Taylor Recycling Facility LLC, ADR Provider
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/11) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(jw) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedule A, and the attorneys for defendants BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LP, BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC, BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., LP, WFP Tower B Co., LP and WFP Tower D Co., LP (collectively the "Brookfield Parties") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters listed on the attached Schedule A are hereby discontinued without prejudice as against the above-named Brookfield Parties only, and without costs to any party... and as further set forth. Relates to All cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CERTAIN ENUMERATED CIVIL ACTIONS AS TO TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that whereas no party is an infant or an incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the civil actions referenced in Attachment A, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(ii) as against defendants, TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN only, without prejudice and without cost to any party. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of litigation which determines that TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN are proper parties to this suit, that plaintiffs may reinstitute the action without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance defendants shall not assert Statute of Limitation as a defense. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Relates to All Cases listed on Attachment A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/26/09) (rjm) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Richard Didonato, Frances Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Kate Lendrum. Document filed by Richard Didonato, Frances Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. City of New York served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Jerry Bradshaw. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP, 120 Broadway Holding, LLC, GLO Management, Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., 150 Broadway N.Y. Associates L.P., HP Environmental, Inc., Hunter Construction, J.P. Morgan Chase Corporation, JEMB Realty Corp, JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Kibel Companies, Koch Skanska, Inc., LaQuilla Construction Inc., 160 Water St. Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp., LeFrak Organization Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mayore Estates LLC, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Milford Management Corp., Milstein Properties Corp., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Murray Hill Properties, Musco Sports Lighting, LLC., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., 30 Broad Street Associates, LLC, One Wall Street Corporation, Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Pro Safety Services, LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Rober Silman Associates, Robert C. Stewart, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rockrose Development Corp, Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., RY Management, SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Sakele Brothes, L.L.C., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Silverite Contracting Corporation, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owings & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC, Summit Structures LLC., Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., The Bank of New York, The Related Companies, LP, Tishman Construction Coproration of Manhattan, Tishman Construction of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Tomasetti Group, Inc., Toretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trammell Crow Company, Trinity Centre LLC, Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., ABM, Tully Environmental Inc., Turner Construction Company, Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vanguard Equities Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., Vertical Technology, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates, LLP., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC., ABM Janitorial Northwest, Inc., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co., L.P., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Yannuzzi &Sons, Inc, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC, Zar Realty Management Corp., Zeckendorf Realty, Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., The City of New York, Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company-MA, MRA Engineering P.C., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Silverite Contractors, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Evans Environmental, Phillips and Jordan, Inc., Taylor Recycling Facility LLC, City of New York, Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza, Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Branch Services, Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brown Harris Stevens, Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Caledonian Insurance Comp., Caledonian Insurance Company, Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Capital Properties, Inc., Carlos Construction, Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., 100 Church, L.L.C., Consolidated Edison Developement, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Cooper Square Realty, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Deutsche Bank, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., Empire State Properties, Inc., En-Tech Corp., Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard Didonato, Frances Didonato.(Smith, Debbie) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Nicholson Construction Company served on 1/30/2006, answer due 2/19/2006. Service was accepted by ALXA FLORES. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by J.Salina. Document filed by Richard Didonato, Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against LEFRAK ORGANIZATION, INC., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against -Cushman and Wakefield, Inc.- only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 2/7/2006, answer due 2/27/2006. Service was accepted by Jackie Salina. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Lindsay McGrath. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Silverite Contractors served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sheldrake Organization, Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Leslie Martinez. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SAB Trucking Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Gina Anastasio. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Royal GM, Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert L. Gerosa, Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rober Silman Associates served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. PT & L Contracting Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York & New Jersey served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Crane & Equipment Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nacirema Industries Incorporated served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by John Davis. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MRA Engineering P.C. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Musco Sports Lighting, LLC. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Moody's Investors Service served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company-MA served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. LaQuilla Construction Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc. served on 2/7/2006, answer due 2/27/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Helmsman Management Services, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Grace Industries, Inc. served on 2/7/2006, answer due 2/27/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Kate Lendrum. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato; Frances Didonato. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Debra Ortiz. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; Consolidated Edison Developement, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; Consolidated Edison, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Marc Connor. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. FTI Trucking, Inc. served on 2/7/2006, answer due 2/27/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Kay Arevallo. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. C.B. Contracting Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Canron Construction Corp. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Brer-Four Transportation Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Breeze National Inc. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bovis Holdings Limited served on 2/20/2006, answer due 3/12/2006; Bovis International, Inc. served on 2/20/2006, answer due 3/12/2006; Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc. served on 2/20/2006, answer due 3/12/2006; Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 2/20/2006, answer due 3/12/2006; Bovis Lend Lease Inc. served on 2/20/2006, answer due 3/12/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp. served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BFP Tower C Co. LLC served on 2/8/2006, answer due 2/28/2006. Service was accepted by Gary Anderson. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Gerri Mirando. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ABM Industries, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006; ABM Janitorial Northwest, Inc. served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/26/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Richard Didonato. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equites, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., G & G Contracting Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP, 120 Broadway Holding, LLC, Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., GLO Management, Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., 150 Broadway N.Y. Associates L.P., HP Environmental, Inc., Hunter Construction, J.P. Morgan Chase Corporation, JEMB Realty Corp, JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Kibel Companies, Koch Skanska, Inc., LaQuilla Construction Inc., 160 Water St. Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp., LeFrak Organization Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, 2 World Trade Center LLC., M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mayore Estates LLC, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Milford Management Corp., Milstein Properties Corp., 2 WTC Holdings LLC., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Murray Hill Properties, Musco Sports Lighting, LLC., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., 30 Broad Street Associates, LLC, Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., One Wall Street Corporation, Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, 4 World Trade Center LLC., Pro Safety Services, LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Contracting Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert C. Stewart, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rockrose Development Corp, Rodar Enterprises, Inc., 4 WTC Holding LLC., Royal GM, Inc., RY Management, SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Sakele Brothes, L.L.C., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., 5 World Trade Center LLC., Silverstein Properties Inc, Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC., Silverstein WTC LLC, Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owings & Merrill LLP, 5 WTC Holding LLC., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC, Summit Structures LLC., Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., The Bank of New York, The Related Companies, LP, Tishman Construction Coproration of Manhattan, Tishman Construction of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Tomasetti Group, Inc., Toretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trammell Crow Company, Trinity Centre LLC, Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Consulting Corp., ABM, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International LLC., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vanguard Equities Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., Vertical Technology, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates, LLP., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC., ABM Janitorial Northwest, Inc., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co., L.P., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties LLC, Yannuzzi &Sons, Inc, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC, Zar Realty Management Corp., Acrow Corporation of America, Zeckendorf Realty, Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Allcom Electric Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Avanti Demolition & Carting Inc., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza, Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Inc., Branch Services, Breeze Carting Corp., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brown Harris Stevens, Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Caledonian Insurance Comp., Caledonian Insurance Company, 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Capital Properties, Inc., Carlos Construction, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarco Enterprises Corporation, Clarco Enterprises LLC., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., 100 Church, L.L.C., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Developement, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Cooper Square Realty, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Deutsche Bank, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., Empire State Properties, Inc., En-Tech Corp., Entertainment Partners Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC). (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 557732)Document filed by Richard Didonato and Frances Didonato.(jeh, ) Modified on 10/14/2005 (jeh, ). Modified on 10/14/2005 (jeh, ). (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?