DeGuzman v. Crane Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-02228

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2019 at 5:30 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jaime DeGuzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Simes Kaiser & Gornick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cecil B. Crain , +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 ccrain@levinsimes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mahzad Kazempour Hite +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 mhite@levinsimes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Levin +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 wlevin@levinsimes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Lisa Simes +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 llsimes@levinsimes.com
No Logo Loida DeGuzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Simes Kaiser & Gornick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cecil B. Crain , +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 ccrain@levinsimes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mahzad Kazempour Hite +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 mhite@levinsimes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Levin +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 wlevin@levinsimes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Lisa Simes +1 415 426 3000 +1 415 426 3001 llsimes@levinsimes.com
v.
No Logo Alfa-laval, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arturo E Sandoval +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 asandoval@foleymansfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DENNIS M. YOUNG +1 510 590 9500 dyoung@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Allied Fluid Products Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Imai, Tadlock, Keeney & Cordery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Thomas Cordery +1 415 675 7000 +1 415 675 7008 tcordery@itkc.com
No Logo Armstrong International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonja E. Blomquist +1 415 981 6630 +1 415 982 1634 sblomquist@lowball.com
No Logo Asco Valves, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017 Arturo E Sandoval +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 asandoval@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Automatic Switch Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren McLeod +1 510 590 9500 ltaylor@foleymansfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866
No Logo Baldor Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Thomas Thayer +1 415 489 7700 +1 415 989 0932 jthayer@hptylaw.com
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cleaver Brooks, a Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Livingston Sharp +1 510 590 9581 asharp@foleymansfield.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer M McCormick , +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 jmccormick@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Cleaver-brooks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer M McCormick , +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 jmccormick@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Crane Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2017 Matthew Gordon Ball +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 matthew.ball@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C Barnes +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 michele.barnes@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Edward Soskin +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 peter.soskin@klgates.com
No Logo Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2017 Jane B. Yee +1 650 365 7715 +1 650 364 5297 jyee@hrmrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pond North LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nilufar Kashani Majd +1 415 217 1240 +1 415 644 0578 nmajd@pondnorth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis Dennis Pond +1 213 617 6170 +1 213 623 3594 fpond@pondnorth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Lynn Rivera +1 213 617 6162 +1 213 623 3594 krivera@pondnorth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 280

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2017 Shawn Michael Ridley +1 650 365 7715 +1 650 364 5297 sridley@hrmrlaw.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wfbm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Elizabeth Anselmo +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 eanselmo@wfbm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE PAIGE GARDINER +1 415 781 7072 kgardiner@wfbm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S Johnson +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 djohnson@wfbm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T Sheldon +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 csheldon@wfbm.com
No Logo Goulds Pumps, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Duffy +1 213 612 7378 +1 213 612 2501 jduffy@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr. +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 michael.eagan@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Jo Talarico +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 amy.talarico@morganlewis.com
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ongaro PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirsten McNelly Bibbes +1 415 615 0339 kbibbes@ongaropc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Raymond Ongaro +1 415 433 3900 +1 415 433 3950 dongaro@ongaropc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nevin Christopher Brownfield +1 415 433 3900 nevin.brownfield@tklaw.com
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader & Berkon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobbie Rae Bailey +1 213 234 1750 +1 213 234 1747 bbailey@leaderberkon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick W. Gatt +1 213 234 1750 +1 213 234 1747 fgatt@leaderberkon.com
No Logo JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Kannett +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 648 1151 mkannett@bkscal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul S Lecky +1 510 658 3600 +1 510 658 1151 plecky@bkscal.com
No Logo Kunkle Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren McLeod +1 510 590 9500 ltaylor@foleymansfield.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017 Arturo E Sandoval +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 asandoval@foleymansfield.com
No Logo M.slayen & Associates,inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily D Bergstrom +1 510 658 3600 +1 510 658 1151 ebergstrom@bkscal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bina Ghanaat +1 510 658 3600 +1 510 658 1151 bghanaat@bkscal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Kannett +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 648 1151 mkannett@bkscal.com
No Logo Mcwane, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Beler +1 415 781 7072 mbeler@wfbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wfbm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE PAIGE GARDINER +1 415 781 7072 kgardiner@wfbm.com
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSEPH BLAISE ADAMS +1 415 403 4404 +1 415 397 1339 jadams@bmeblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Reno Cross +1 415 397 9006 +1 415 397 1339 rcross@behblaw.com
No Logo Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2017 Arturo E Sandoval +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 asandoval@foleymansfield.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo Roper Pump Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Glaspy +1 925 947 1300 +1 925 947 1594 CAasbestos@mgmlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynn Prieto +1 415 512 4381 +1 415 512 6791 jprieto@mgmlaw.com
No Logo Ruggles-Klingemann Manufacturing Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K L Gates Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Theonugraha +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 Jonathan.Theonugraha@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C Barnes +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 michele.barnes@klgates.com
No Logo Schneider Electric Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C Barnes +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 michele.barnes@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Theonugraha +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 Jonathan.Theonugraha@klgates.com
Siemens Industry, Inc. Siemens Industry, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly Mckay +1 415 986 5900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Pietrykowski +1 415 986 5900 +1 415 986 8054 mpietrykowski@gordonrees.com
No Logo Tate Andale, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Finn +1 510 444 6800 +1 510 835 6666 rfinn@burnhambrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rohit A. Sabnis +1 510 444 6800 rsabnis@burnhambrown.com
No Logo The William Powell Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arturo E Sandoval +1 510 590 9500 +1 510 590 9595 asandoval@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Tuthill Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean Lynne Bertrand +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 jbertrand@schiffhardin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grayson William Marshall, III +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 tmarshall@schiffhardin.com
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Velan Valve Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton +1 415 267 4000 arlene.barton@dentons.com
TERMINATED: 06/01/2017 Jennifer J. Lee +1 415 267 4000 +1 415 267 4198 jennifer.lee@dentons.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Lurline Oberg +1 415 267 4175 +1 415 267 4198 loberg@mckennalong.com
No Logo Viking Pump, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Jenkins Renstrom, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory E. Ebstein +1 415 982 3600 +1 415 982 3700 gebstein@jjrlaw.com
No Logo Warren Pumps LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by TUCKER ELLIS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES PATRICK CUNNINGHAM +1 415 617 2400 james.cunningham@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Allied Fluid Products Corp., Cross-defendant
No Logo Armstrong International, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Asco Valves, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Automatic Switch Company, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Baldor Electric Company, Cross-defendant
No Logo Cleaver Brooks, a Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Crane Co, Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C Barnes +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 michele.barnes@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Edward Soskin +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 peter.soskin@klgates.com
No Logo Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pond North LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis Dennis Pond +1 213 617 6170 +1 213 623 3594 fpond@pondnorth.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Cross-defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wfbm, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Elizabeth Anselmo +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 eanselmo@wfbm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHERINE PAIGE GARDINER +1 415 781 7072 kgardiner@wfbm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S Johnson +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 djohnson@wfbm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T Sheldon +1 415 781 7072 +1 415 391 6258 csheldon@wfbm.com
No Logo Goulds Pumps, Inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Duffy +1 213 612 7378 +1 213 612 2501 jduffy@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr. +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 michael.eagan@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Jo Talarico +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 amy.talarico@morganlewis.com
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader & Berkon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobbie Rae Bailey +1 213 234 1750 +1 213 234 1747 bbailey@leaderberkon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick W. Gatt +1 213 234 1750 +1 213 234 1747 fgatt@leaderberkon.com
No Logo Kunkle Industries, Inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren McLeod +1 510 590 9500 ltaylor@foleymansfield.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866
No Logo M.slayen & Associates,inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily D Bergstrom +1 510 658 3600 +1 510 658 1151 ebergstrom@bkscal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bina Ghanaat +1 510 658 3600 +1 510 658 1151 bghanaat@bkscal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Kannett +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 648 1151 mkannett@bkscal.com
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Cross-defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Cross-defendant
No Logo Roper Pump Company, Cross-defendant
No Logo Schneider Electric Usa, Inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K L Gates Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Theonugraha +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 Jonathan.Theonugraha@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C Barnes +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 michele.barnes@klgates.com
Siemens Industry, Inc. Siemens Industry, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Tate Andale, Inc., Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Finn +1 510 444 6800 +1 510 835 6666 rfinn@burnhambrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rohit A. Sabnis +1 510 444 6800 rsabnis@burnhambrown.com
No Logo The William Powell Company, Cross-defendant
No Logo Tuthill Corporation, Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean Lynne Bertrand +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 jbertrand@schiffhardin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grayson William Marshall, III +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 tmarshall@schiffhardin.com
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Cross-defendant
No Logo Velan Valve Corp., Cross-defendant
No Logo Viking Pump, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Warren Pumps LLC, Cross-defendant
No Logo Ruggles-Klingemann Manufacturing Co., Cross-claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K L Gates Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Theonugraha +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 Jonathan.Theonugraha@klgates.com
No Logo Schneider Electric Usa, Inc., Cross-claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K L Gates Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Theonugraha +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 Jonathan.Theonugraha@klgates.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit P.I. : Asbestos
  Entries (344) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 346 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 271 Motion to Substitute Party. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., FKA SIEMENS ENERGY AND AUTOMATION, INC. re 240 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Siemens Industry, Inc. terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION re 239 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Parker Hannifin Corporation terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC. re 238 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION re 237 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Honeywell International, Inc. terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT BALDOR ELECTRIC COMPANY re 236 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Baldor Electric Company terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. re 235 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Armstrong International, Inc. terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP. FKA ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. re 234 Proposed Order filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/17. Allied Fluid Products Corp. terminated.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel Lisa Simes for Plaintiff Loida DeGuzman (Simes, Laurel) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel Lisa Simes for Plaintiff Jaime DeGuzman (Simes, Laurel) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel of Record by Automatic Switch Company, Inc. (Sun, Tsun-Chi) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel of Record by Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC. (Sun, Tsun-Chi) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of as Counsel of Record by Kunkle Industries Inc. (Sun, Tsun-Chi) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton: Status Conference held on 8/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Court Reporter - not reported. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2017) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ROPER PUMP COMPANY by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 218 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT ROPER PUMP COMPANY by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 217 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Roper Pump Company filed by Roper Pump Company, Loida Deguzman, Jaime DeGuzman. (Prieto, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2017) Modified on 8/15/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Cross-Claims Against Defendant Roper Pump Company filed by Roper Pump Company, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Ruggles-Klingermann Manufacturing Co., Crane Co. (Prieto, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2017) Modified on 8/15/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 8/11/2017 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ASSOCIATION of Counsel Re: Medical Discovery by The William Powell Company. (Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/14/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ASSOCIATION of Counsel Re: Medical Discovery by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Sandoval, Arturo) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/14/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ASSOCIATION of Counsel Re: Medical Discovery by Automatic Switch Company, Inc. (Sun, Tsun-Chi) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/14/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jaime DeGuzman. Warren Pumps, LLC, Viking Pumps, LLC, Vikng Pump, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., Tuthill Corporation, The William Powell Company, Tate Andale, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Ruggles-Klingemann Manufacturing Co., Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, McWane, Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Kunkle Industries Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics, LLC, Crane Co., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Baldor Electric Company, Automatic Switch Company, Inc., Asco Valves, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc, Allied Fluid Products Corp., Alfa Laval, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hite, Mahzad) (Filed on 8/10/2017) Modified on 8/11/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC. NOW KNOWN AS GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 210 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Armstrong International, Inc. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rivera, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service regarding First Supplemental Disclosure by Jaime DeGuzman. (Hite, Mahzad) (Filed on 8/7/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on August 10, 2017, has been RESCHEDULED to August 11, 2017, at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please use call-in numbers that were previously provided to the parties. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 88 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Remand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Amended Document (Not Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2017. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?