City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Arconic Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02840
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 1:54 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeroen Van kwawegen +1 212 554 1400 jeroen@blbglaw.com
v.
No Logo Amy E. Alving, Defendant
No Logo Arconic Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan A. McLeod +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 ramcleod@wlrk.com
Space Theodore N Mirvis +1 212 403 1204 +1 212 402 2000 tnmirvis@wlrk.com
Space Paul Vizcarrondo +1 212 403 1208
Space Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
No Logo Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Defendant
No Logo David P. Hess, Defendant
No Logo E. Stanley O'Neal, Defendant
No Logo John C. Plant, Defendant
No Logo Julie G. Richardson, Defendant
No Logo Katherine H. Ramundo, Defendant
No Logo Klaus Kleinfeld, Defendant
No Logo L. Rafael Reif, Defendant
No Logo Patricia F. Russo, Defendant
No Logo Rajiv L. Gupta, Defendant
No Logo Ratan N. Tata, Defendant
No Logo Sean O. Mahoney, Defendant
No Logo Ulrich R. Schmidt, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/10/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2017 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. On May 10, 2017, the Court held a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (see Dkt. #6; see also Dkt. #7-8, 30-31, 34-35) and, later the same day, delivered an oral decision denying Plaintiff's motion. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Entry 6. As discussed, the parties' shall submit a proposed stipulated order concerning Defendants' deadline to file an Answer. SO ORDERED. Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/10/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeroen van Kwawegen dated 05/03/2017 re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The conference scheduled for May 9, 2017, is hereby ADJOURNED to May 10, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/4/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeroen van Kwawegen dated 05/03/2017 re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Jeroen van Kwawegen in Support re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kelen V. Evans in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, dated May 2, 2017V. Evans, # 2 Exhibit B - Edited Transcript of Arconic Inc. First Quarter 2017 Earnings Conference Call, dated April 25, 2017, # 3 Exhibit C - Elliott May 2, 2017 Press Release Titled Elliott Management Releases Statement on City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund v. Arconic Inc., et al)(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata.(Vizcarrondo, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan A. McLeod on behalf of Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (McLeod, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Bradley R. Wilson in Opposition re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (Vizcarrondo, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Reid Wilson on behalf of Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore N Mirvis on behalf of Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (Mirvis, Theodore) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Vizcarrondo on behalf of Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (Vizcarrondo, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Klaus Kleinfeld served on 4/22/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeroen van Kwawegen dated 04/24/2017 re: Briefing Schedule Agreement. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. L. Rafael Reif served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Katherine H. Ramundo served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Julie G. Richardson served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Amy E. Alving served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Patricia F. Russo served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arthur D. Collins, Jr served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ulrich R. Schmidt served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Rajiv L. Gupta served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ratan N. Tata served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. David P. Hess served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. E. Stanley O'Neal served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. John C. Plant served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Sean O. Mahoney served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arconic Inc. served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service was accepted by Lee Cromer, Authorized Agent. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: granting 6 Motion for hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Application GRANTED. The preliminary injunction hearing is hereby set for May 9, 2017, at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The preliminary injunction motion shall be fully briefed by May 2, 2017; the parties may agree among themselves to internal deadlines within this period for opposition and reply briefing. The parties shall submit to Chambers two courtesy copies of all motions papers in the manner specified in Rule 4.D. of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. Plaintiff will forward this Endorsement to Defendants' identified counsel. (Motions due by 5/2/2017)(Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/21/2017) (ap) Modified on 4/21/2017 (ap). (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeroen van Kwawegen dated 04/20/2017 re: Scheduling Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Jeroen Van Kwawegen in Support re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Arconic Inc. Form 8-K, Dated April 12, 2017, # 2 Exhibit Amendment and Restatement of the Trust Agreement Between Mellon Bank, NA and Alcoa Inc, Dated Sept. 24, 2007, # 3 Exhibit Arconic Press Release, dated Feb. 1, 2016, # 4 Exhibit Elliot Management Definitive Proxy Statement, dated March 9, 2017, # 5 Exhibit Arconic Inc. definitive Proxy Statement, dated March 13, 2017, # 6 Exhibit Arconic Inc, Press Release, dated April 17, 2017, # 7 Exhibit Elliot Management Press Release, dated April 17, 2017, # 8 Exhibit Klaus Kleinfeld Letter to Paul Singer, dated April 11, 2017, # 9 Exhibit Arconic Inc. Letter to Shareholders, dated Feb. 6, 2017, # 10 Exhibit Arconic Inc. Letter to Shareholders, dated March 2, 2017)(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. Return Date set for 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata. (kl) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arconic, Inc., Katherine H. Ramundo, Amy E. Alving, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Fleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tata, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arconic, Inc., Katherine H. Ramundo, Amy E. Alving, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Fleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tat, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) Modified on 4/20/2017 (kl). (Entered: 04/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Amy E. Alving, Arconic Inc., Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Rajiv L. Gupta, David P. Hess, Klaus Kleinfeld, Sean O. Mahoney, E. Stanley O'Neal, John C. Plant, Katherine H. Ramundo, L. Rafael Reif, Julie G. Richardson, Patricia F. Russo, Ulrich R. Schmidt, Ratan N. Tat. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13562561)Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Van Kwawegen, Jeroen) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 79 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?