Bello v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-09823
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2017 at 11:56 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Bello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Giordano Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carmen S. Giordano +1 212 406 9466 +1 212 406 9410 carmen@csgiordano.com
v.
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Officer Michael Cassesi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Police Officers John Does 1-3, Defendant
No Logo SGT. Lawren Donnelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: action is hereby dismissed against defendants, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or attorneys' fees in excess of the amount specified in paragraph "2" within. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/15/2011) (ab) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: All motions are to be made returnable at 12:00 noon on Wednesday and in compliance with the rules of this Court. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 5/16/2011 and all expert discovery by 5/16/2011, and file all motions other than motions in limine after which no discovery will be conducted and no motion will be entertained without a showing of special circumstances. Plaintiff[s] shall submit a draft of the pretrial order to the defendant[s] on or before the completion of discovery. The parties shall submit to the court trial briefs, a joint proposed pretrial order, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges, voir dire requests and special verdict form in accordance with the annexed form and instructions by 6/8/2011. A final pretrial conference will be held at 4:30 pm on that date and the action shall be added to the trial calendar published in the New York Law Journal. Prior to submission of the final pretrial order, the parties are directed to exchange offers of settlement. The parties are directed to be ready for trial the day after the pretrial order is due and, upon receipt of twenty-four hour telephone notice, on any day thereafter. (Discovery due by 5/16/2011. Motions due by 6/8/2011. Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/18/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Morgan D. Kunz dated 3/11/11 re: Counsel for defendants write to request an extension of time until May 16, 2011 to complete discovery. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered.( Discovery due by 5/16/2011.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/17/2011) (mro) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER All Discovery due by 3/15/2011. Motions due by 3/15/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2011 along with court rial briefs, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges and voir dire requests. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/15/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Morgan D. Kunz dated 11/8/2010 re: Accordingly, defendants respectfully request a four month extension of discovery, from November 15, 2010 until March 15, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/8/2010) (js) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER that: A final pretrial conference will be held at 4:30 pm on that date and the action shall be added to the trial calendar published in the New York Law Journal. Prior to submission of the final pretrial order, the parties are directed to exchange offers of settlement. The parties are directed to be ready for trial the day after the pretrial order is due and, upon receipt of twenty-four hour telephone notice, on any day thereafter. Discovery due by 11/15/2010, Motions due by 11/15/2010, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2010. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/17/2010) (jmi) Modified on 11/29/2010 (jmi). (Entered: 09/20/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Morgan D. Kunz dated 9/15/2010 re: Defendants write to respectfully request a two month extension of discovery, from September 15, 2010 until November 15, 2010. Plaintiffs counsel consents to this request. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 11/15/2010.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/17/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Carmen S. Giordano on behalf of Anthony Bello. New Address: Giordano Law Offices, LLC, 226 Lenox Ave, New York, NY, USA 10027, 2124069466. (Giordano, Carmen) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER: All Discovery due by 9/15/2010. All Motions due by 9/15/2010. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order (and Motions in Limine) due by 10/6/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2010 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/12/10) (db) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Morgan D. Kunz dated 4/26/2010 re: Counsel requests an adjournment of the conference currently scheduled for 4/28/2010 at 4:30 p.m., until a date and time convenient for the Court. The parties are available 5/12/2010. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/27/2010) (tro) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City of New York, Michael Cassesi, Lawren Donnelly. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Bello.(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against The City of New York, Michael Cassesi, Lawren Donnelly, Police Officers John Does 1-3.Document filed by Anthony Bello. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Anthony Bello.(mro) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Morgan Kunz dated 12/18/09 re: counsel for defendant City of New York requests that its time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended for sixty days until 2/19/10. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/26/09) (dle) Modified on 1/6/2010 (dle). (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2010 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet, as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/15/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The City of New York served on 11/30/2009, answer due 12/21/2009. Service was accepted by dimitri araynov. Document filed by Anthony Bello. (Giordano, Carmen) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                COMPLAINT against The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Michael Cassesi, Lawren Donnelly, Police Officers John Does 1-3. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 707234)Document filed by Anthony Bello.(ama) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?