J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Fitzgerald
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00871

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 12:19 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
Memorandum Opinion and Order re 29 Granting J & J Sports Productions, Inc.'s Motion for summary judgment against all Defendants. J & J Sports Productions Inc. awarded statutory damages in the amount of $10,000.00 and enhanced damages in the amount of $40,000.00, plus all attorney's fees and costs. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/19/18. (R,JM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?