Georgia State Conference of the NAACP v. Brian Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01427

Tags
Last Updated November 13, 2018 at 8:01 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Coley Tyson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Lauretha Celeste Sims, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Lavelle Lemon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Marlon Reid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
No Logo Patricia Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vance Custer, IV +1 404 572 6600 bill.custer@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Burch Dempsey +1 404 572 6985 jennifer.dempsey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA L FENWICK +1 404 572 6600 julia.fenwick@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Clancy +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Thomas.Clancy@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John F Muller +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 john.muller@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Duncan Phillips +1 213 683 9276 +1 213 683 5176 gregory.phillips@mto.com
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office-Atl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgia Department of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josiah Benjamin Heidt +1 404 656 3389 jheidt@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barclay Hendrix +1 678 374 2200 +1 678 347 2210 barclay.hendrix@sbllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo The State of Georgia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office-Atl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgia Department of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josiah Benjamin Heidt +1 404 656 3389 jheidt@law.ga.gov
Citation Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color through voting qualifications
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (186) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER DENYING NAACP Plaintiffs' 165 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and GRANTING Plaintiffs' 171 and 172 Motions to Amend. Parties shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to conduct discovery on t he added political gerrymandering claims, and Kemp shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to file any motion to dismiss in response to the amended complaint. All pending claims in this case shall proceed to one consolidated trial. ORDERED by Judge Beverly B. Martin, Circuit Judge, Judge Michael L. Brown, District Judge and Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr., District Judge on 9/4/18. (jlm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/14/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Motion to Amend
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order from Other Court
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Leave of Absence
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Motion for protective order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                        OPINION and ORDER DENYING 103 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Circuit Judge Beverly B. Martin and District Judges William S. Duffey, Jr. and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/1/18. (jlm)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Request to File Original Discovery
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Leave of Absence
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 142 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 8/9/2018. Plaintiff's expert disclosures are due 6/11/18; Defendant's expert disclosures are due 7/11/18; and other deadlines as set out in the parties' discovery plan. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 4/11/18. (jlm) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1: Plaintiffs' Objections to Declarations Offered by Defendant in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Houk, Julie) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Austin Thompson. (Branch, Aria) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to and including 3/26/18 for Defendant's to respond to the 103 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to and including 4/9/18 for Plaintiff's to reply. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/28/18. (jlm) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                              DEPOSITION of Jowei Chen taken on February 27, 2018 by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 139 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                DEPOSITION of Charles Efstration taken on February 2, 2018 by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                  DEPOSITION of R. Dale Rutledge taken on February 7, 2018 by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Gina Wright, # 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of Howe Taing, # 3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Michael Barnes, # 4 Exhibit D, Declaration of Chris Harvey, # 5 Exhibit E, Declaration of Tina Lunsford, # 6 Exhibit F, Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 103 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                        ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 119 Motion for Order to File Deposition Transcripts UNDER SEAL. Depositions 104, 105, 106, 107, 108, 109, 113, 114 and 115 are permanently filed UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/8/18. (jlm) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Austin Thompson of Corrected Declaration of William S. Cooper (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Branch, Aria) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                              DEPOSITION of Donna McLeod taken on February 6, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                DEPOSITION of Francys Johnson taken on February 14, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION of Carlotta Harrell taken on February 13, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION of Andrew J. Welch, III taken on February 8, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION of Jan Jones taken on January 30, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 127 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION of R. Brian Strickland taken on January 26, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION of Joyce H. Chandler taken on January 24, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION of Donald K. Balfour, II taken on January 23, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 124 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION of Randall O. Nix taken on January 10, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel David-Kinder Weiss Pro Hac Vice by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Count One is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. The defendants motion as to Count Two is denied. Signed by Circuit Judge Beverly B. Martin and District Judges William S. Duffey, Jr. and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/23/2018.(jdb) (Entered: 02/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 101 Consent Motion to modify Scheduling Order. Motion for Extension of Time granted. Discovery ends on 3/9/2018. Georgia State Conference of the NAACP Plaintiffs are granted leave to file the motion for a preliminary injunction on February 20, 2018. Defendant Kemp's brief in opposition to the motion for a preliminary injunction shall be due on March 22, 2018, and any reply brief shall be due on or before April 5, 2018. The briefs in support of and in opposition to the motion for a preliminary injunction shall have a fifty page limit. The page limit for the reply brief will be twenty pages. The discovery deadline shall be extended until March 9, 2018, for the limited purpose of completing the depositions of Mr. Payton, Mr. Cooper, Dr. Chen, Dr. McCrary, Dr. Webster, and Dr. Alford. Any dispositive motions shall be due on April 6, 2018. The response to any dispositive motion shall be due on April 25, 2018, while any reply brief shall be due on or before May 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/21/18. (rsh) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Austin Thompson of Joinder in NAACP Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Branch, Aria) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Directing Deposition Transcripts To Remain Permanently Under Seal by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Dempsey, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jowei Chen filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gerald Webster filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peyton McCrary filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                SEALED DEPOSITION of Donna McLeod taken on February 6, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DEPOSITION of Francys Johnson taken on February 14, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DEPOSITION of Carlotta Harrell taken on February 13, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                      PROVISIONALLY SEALED DEPOSITION of Gina H. Wright taken on November 20, 2017 and January 25, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                        PROVISIONALLY SEALED DEPOSITION of Dan O' Connor taken on December 13, 2017 and January 25, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                          PROVISIONALLY SEALED DEPOSITION of Rob Strangia taken on December 18, 2017 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DEPOSITION of Andrew J. Welch III taken on February 8, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Andrea Snow, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DEPOSITION of Jan Jones taken on January 30, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DEPOSITION of R. Brian Strickland taken on January 26, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DEPOSITION of Joyce H. Chandler taken on January 24, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DEPOSITION of Donald K. Balfour II taken on January 23, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Andrea Snow.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DEPOSITION of Randall O. Nix taken on January 10, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) Modified on 2/21/2018 to seal doc. 104-115 per atty's request, atty directed to file motion to seal (btql). Modified on 3/8/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit 1, Declaration of Jon Greenbaum -- Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit Exhibit 70, # 72 Exhibit Exhibit 71, # 73 Exhibit Exhibit 72, # 74 Exhibit Exhibit 73, # 75 Exhibit Exhibit 74, # 76 Exhibit Exhibit 75, # 77 Exhibit Exhibit 76, # 78 Exhibit Exhibit 77, # 79 Exhibit Exhibit 78, # 80 Exhibit Exhibit 79, # 81 Exhibit Exhibit 80, # 82 Exhibit Exhibit 81, # 83 Exhibit Exhibit 82, # 84 Exhibit Exhibit 83, # 85 Exhibit Exhibit 84, # 86 Exhibit Exhibit 85, # 87 Exhibit Exhibit 86, # 88 Exhibit Exhibit 87, # 89 Exhibit Exhibit 88, # 90 Exhibit Exhibit 89, # 91 Exhibit Exhibit 90, # 92 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 91)(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Alford filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson (Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to take six depositions, MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for filing dispositive motions, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Leave to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction[Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order] by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, John) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel David-Kinder Weiss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7689331)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery Materials Pursuant To Local Rule 26.3 by Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson Of Discovery Materials Pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 (Branch, Aria) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery Materials Pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Custer, William) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Cooper filed by Brian Kemp (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        Expert Report of Dr. Peyton McCrary by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Peyton McCrary)(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                          Expert Report of Dr. Jowei Chen by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Jowei Chen)(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Darryl Payton filed by Brian Kemp (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Cooper filed by Brian Kemp (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Francys Johnson filed by Brian Kemp (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carlotta Harrell filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Wayne Swanson's Claims filed by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson (Branch, Aria) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Darryl Payton filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dale Rutledge filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative Chuck Efstration filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson (Custer, William) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Expert Report of Dr. John Alford by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report of Dr. John Alford)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Thompson) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Kemp,, filed by Wayne Swanson, Darryl Payton, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Coretta Jackson, Lynne Anderson, Andrea Snow, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Austin Thompson, Audra Cunningham. (Filed in Case 1:17-cv-3856-TCB on 10/27/17 and consolidated with Case 1:17-cv-1427 on 11/1/17)(jlm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donna McLeod filed by Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ALLOWING Plaintiff to file a Sur-Reply within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/31/18. (jlm) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 79 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The Expert Disclosure of Dr. John Alford shall be due on or before 1/31/18 and any rebuttal to that Disclosure from Plaintiffs shall be due on or before 2/12/18. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/30/18. (jlm) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Brian Kemp of filing Expert Witness Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HD 105 Population data, # 2 Exhibit HD 111 Population data, # 3 Exhibit HD 105 Political data, # 4 Exhibit HD 111 Political data, # 5 Exhibit Maps of Old and Current District 105 and 111 Boundaries, # 6 Exhibit Map of Current District 105 and 111 Boundaries with Precincts)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strickland, Frank) Modified on 1/31/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jan Jones filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dale Rutledge filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Strickland filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew J. Welch filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE to TAKE DEPOSITION of Representative Joyce Chandler on January 24, 2018 by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP.(Clancy, Thomas) Modified on 1/23/2018 (jlm). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION of Dan O'Connor taken on January 25th by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION of Rule 30(b)(6) Representative of the Georgia Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office taken on January 25th by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Brian Kemp.(Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Admission of Ariel C. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7621808)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joyce Chandler filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson (Clancy, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative Randy Nix filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson (Powers, John) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative Randy Nix filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson (Powers, John) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson of Expert Report of Peyton McCrary, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Peyton McCrary, Ph.D.)(Powers, John) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson (Attachments: # 1 William S. Cooper, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E-1, # 8 Exhibit E-2)(Branch, Aria) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson Expert Report of Jowei Chen, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Jowei Chen, Ph.D.)(Powers, John) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson of Expert Report of Gerald Webster, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Gerald Webster, Ph.D.)(Powers, John) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 59 Initial Disclosures by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson.(Branch, Aria) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Disclosures by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson.(Branch, Aria) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Thompson Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of TAKING DEPOSITION of Dan O' Connor on December 13, 2017 at 9:00 AM and of Robert Strangia on December 18, 2017 at 2:00 PM by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Custer, William) Modified on 12/11/2017 (jlm). (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Modification of 51 Scheduling Order limited to permitting fact witness depositions to occur throught entirety of discovery period. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/28/17. (rsh) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Thompson Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Coretta Jackson, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson. (Branch, Aria) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION modification of scheduling order 51 Scheduling Order, by Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by Brian Kemp.(Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents by Brian Kemp.(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery ends on 2/16/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2018, with response due 3/21/18, reply on 4/6/18. Consolidated pretrial order and Daubert motions due 30 days after resolution of dispositive motions. See Order for further specific directives. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/20/17. (rsh) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order For Expedited Entry of Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order with Brief In Support by Lynne Anderson, Sammy Arrey-Mbi, Audra Cunningham, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Coretta Jackson, Lavelle Lemon, Sabrina McKenzie, Jamida Orange, Darryl Payton, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Andrea Snow, Wayne Swanson, Austin Thompson, Coley Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Resumed Discovery Schedule, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Proposed Discovery Schedule for Kemp)(Custer, William) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order of Defendant. (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Park, Jr on behalf of Brian Kemp (Park, John) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Thompson Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit H.B. 566)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This action is to be consolidated with case 1:17-cv-3856-TCB for all pretrial matters. Docketing shall occur only in case 1:17-cv-1427-TCB-WSD-BBM. Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate all parties into the current case and administratively close case 1:17-cv-3856-TCB. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/1/17. (jlm) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7462535)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER staying Discovery until a ruling is entered on the issue of consolidation 11 in Civil Action File Number 1:17-cv-3856-AT. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 10/18/17. (rsh) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE (Re-docketed in correct case 1:17-cv-1397-TCB) CONSENT DECREE Ordering the following: (1) Dismissing the "State of Georgia" from this action. (2) Defendants are hereby enjoined from enforcing or relying on Ga. Const. Art II, Sec.2, Para II, and O.C.G.A. Sections 21-2-501(a)(10) and 21-2-152(c), or any other state statutory or constitutional provision, for the purpose of establishing the voter registration deadline for any election for federal office, including runoff elections, that is later then the lesser of 30 days, or the period provided by State law, before the date of the election. (3) The voter registration deadline for all elections for federal office, including all run-off elections, shall be the close of business on the 30th day prior to the election, or the time otherwise prescribed by state law, whichever is less. If such deadline should fall on a Saturday, Sunday or legal holiday, the voter-registration deadline shall be the close of business on the following business day. (4) Upon entry of this Consent Order by the Court, Plaintiffs shall be entitled to file a motion for reasonable attorney fees and costs from Defendant as set forth in this order. Defendants shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 10/13/17. (jlm) Modified on 10/17/2017 (jlm). Modified on 10/17/2017 (jlm). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Hendrix on behalf of Brian Kemp (Hendrix, Barclay) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Brian Kemp (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena To Testify At A Deposition In A Civil Action, as to Georgia State Representative Andrew J. Welch. (Custer, William) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena To Testify At A Deposition In A Civil Action, as to Georgia State Representative Brian Strickland. (Custer, William) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena To Testify At A Deposition In A Civil Case, as to Georgia State Representative Dale Rutledge. (Custer, William) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson Of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Georgia State Representative Brian Strickland, # 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Georgia State Representative Andrew J. Welch, # 3 Exhibit C - Subpoena to Georgia State Representative Dan Rutledge)(Custer, William) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service of Subpoena to Georgia Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office. Served on 09/25/17. (aaq) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson Of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Georgia Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office)(Custer, William) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson Serving Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Brian Kemp, in his Official Capacity as Secretary of State (Powers, John) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson Serving Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Brian Kemp, in his Official Capacity as Secretary of State (Powers, John) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Brian Kemp. Discovery ends on 2/12/2018.(Correia, Cristina) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: approving 25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan except as modified therein: Discovery ends on 1/12/2018. See further deadlines and directives in Order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 9/6/17. (rsh) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss. Count One, to the extent it brings a Fourteenth Amendment claim against the State, is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Count One, to the extent it brings a Section 2 claim against the State, is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Counts One and Three against Secretary Kemp are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Circuit Judge Beverly B. Martin and District Judges William S. Duffey, Jr. and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/25/17. (aaq) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Disclosures by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson.(Houk, Julie) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia.(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 7, 2017 - July 18, 2017; July 21, 2017 - July 26, 2017, by Cristina Correia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Designating Three-Judge Court. District Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. and Circuit Judge Beverly B. Martin to serve with Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. Signed by Judge Ed Carnes, Chief Judge, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit on 5/30/2017. (dfb) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Brief brief in support, # 2 Exhibit U.S. census data)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 5 Unopposed Motion for Three-Judge Panel. Court will notify the Chief Judge of the Circuit of Plaintiff's request for a three-judge panel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 5/15/17. (jlm) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Josiah Benjamin Heidt on behalf of Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia (Heidt, Josiah) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint,, Brian Kemp Answer due 5/30/2017; The State of Georgia Answer due 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 5/11/17. (jlm) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Brian Kemp, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to The State of Georgia. (Custer, William) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Brian Kemp, in his capacity as Secretary of State. (Custer, William) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7119114)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas P. Clancy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111346)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of John F. Muller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111338)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory D. Phillips Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111322)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Bradley S. Phillips Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111314)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of John Michael Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111303)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111285)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7111259)by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Three-Judge Court by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (adg) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Lauretha Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, Coley Tyson. (Custer, William) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (eop) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to The State of Georgia. (eop) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, filed by Lauretha Celeste Sims, Lavelle Lemon, Patricia Smith, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Marlon Reid and Coley Tyson; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7104579.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -Notice of 3-Judge Panel, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?