ENTERPRISE INTEGRATION CORPORATION v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00760

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2021 at 2:29 PM DT (1.8 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENTERPRISE INTEGRATION CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skeen & Kauffman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry L Goddard, Jr. +1 410 625 2272 +1 443 817 0744 tgoddard@skaufflaw.com
Space Stephen P. Kauffman +1 410 625 2228 +1 401 625 2292
No Logo Walter Augustine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skeen & Kauffman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry L Goddard, Jr. +1 410 625 2272 +1 443 817 0744 tgoddard@skaufflaw.com
Space Stephen P. Kauffman +1 410 625 2228 +1 401 625 2292
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen P. Kauffman, :Firm- Skeen & Kauffman LLP, :Address- 911 North Charles Street, Baltimore, MD 21201. Phone No. - 410-625-2228. Fax No. - 401-625-2292 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4927196. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WALTER AUGUSTINE, ENTERPRISE INTEGRATION CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Terry)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENTERPRISE INTEGRATION CORPORATION (Goddard, Terry)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4927124) filed by ENTERPRISE INTEGRATION CORPORATION, WALTER AUGUSTINE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons)(Goddard, Terry)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?