J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Strange Clouds Hookah Lounge, Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-11300

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 1:20 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Judgment*
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT [#12] AND CANCELING HEARING. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/4/2017, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Extend - free
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?