J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Justin and Milad, Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-11309

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 2, 2019 at 11:33 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Appear
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Withdraw Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Appear*
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Alternate Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?