J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Brad's, Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-11314

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 1:05 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Judgment Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/7/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None order on report and recommendationCourt Filing
              ORDER adopting 49 Report and Recommendation, striking defendant's answer and affirmative defenses, dismissing third-party complaint, reinstating defaults, and directing plaintiff to file motion for default judgment. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Appear
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED 43 Bill of Costs, filed by J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING as Unopposed Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (MWil)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Third Party
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Extend Time to - Free
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Appear*
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Show Cause
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Third Party
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Third Party
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?