J & J Sports Productions, Incorporated v. Shaba
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-11316

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 1:46 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Set Aside
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Judgment*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFSMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT[#10]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Request for Clerks Entry of Default
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Reassignment/Disqualification
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?