CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS v. OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00763-DLF
District Judge Dabney L. Friedrich, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated June 11, 2018 at 10:13 PM DT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Conference Of State Bank Supervisors, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Ancona Semko +1 202 835 4250 +1 202 416 7055 jennifer.semko@bakermckenzie.com
v.
Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS J. CURRY, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/26/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the [9] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2018.
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting the [9] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See order for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2018.
      LREF
      Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
      MINUTE ORDER denying the [17] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument, which the judge previously assigned to this case ordered held in abeyance pending further consideration of the briefing. See Minute Order of November 28, 2017. Having determined that oral argument is not necessary to resolve the issues addressed in the memorandum opinion and order issued this date, the Court denies the motion for oral argument. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2018.
        LREF
        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
        Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
          LREF
          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
          Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
            LREF
            Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
            MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's [17] Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument. The Court will hold Plaintiff's motion IN ABEYANCE pending further consideration of Defendants' [9] Motion to Dismiss and the related briefing. If the Court, in its discretion, determines that oral argument would aid it in its resolution of Defendants' motion, it will schedule such an argument at a later date. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/28/2017. (lcckk3)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017, Terminated: 4/30/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
              Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Semko, Jennifer)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Jordan, Douglas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                      Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Semko, Jennifer)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017, Terminated: 9/13/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Kluchenek, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 300 East Randolph Drive, Suite 5000; Chicago, Illinois 60601. Phone No. - (312) 861-8803. Fax No. - 312-861-2899 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5114863. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew Kluchenek, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Semko, Jennifer)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017, Terminated: 9/13/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Graham Cronogue, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 815 Connecticut Ave., N.W.; Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - 202-835-6249. Fax No. - 202-416--7249 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5114852. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Graham Cronogue, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Semko, Jennifer)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of MATTHEW KLUCHENK. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/13/2017. (lcjeb3)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [12] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of GRAHAM CRONOGUE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/13/2017. (lcjeb3)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017, Terminated: 9/8/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Motion to Dismiss by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Semko, Jennifer)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint [11] Motion for Leave to File Overlength Briefs. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff may file an opposition brief not to exceed 55 pages and Defendants may file a reply brief not to exceed 32 pages. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/8/2017. (lcjeb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017, Terminated: 8/9/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Semko, Jennifer)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/13/2017. Replies due by 10/4/2017. (nbn)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      MINUTE ORDER GRANTING [10] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before September 13, 2017, and Defendants shall reply on or before October 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/9/2017. (lcjeb3)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 4/30/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Exhibit Ex A, # (4) Exhibit Ex B, # (5) Exhibit Ex C, # (6) Exhibit Ex D, # (7) Exhibit Ex E, # (8) Exhibit Ex F, # (9) Exhibit Ex G, # (10) Exhibit Ex H)(Jordan, Douglas)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017, Terminated: 7/28/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                        STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILER 7/28/2017..... MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K)(Jordan, Douglas) Modified on 7/31/2017 (znmw).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2017. (lsj)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                          MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' [8] Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN. Its excessive footnoting both violates LCvR 5.1(d) and appears to be an effort to circumvent page limitations. The Court ORDERS that Defendants may submit a renewed Motion to Dismiss by August 2, 2017, that contains no more than 10 footnotes containing an aggregate of no more than 50 lines. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2017. (lcjeb3)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Notice of Related Case
                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. Case related to Case No. 17-CV-03574 (S.D.N.Y.2017). (Jordan, Douglas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Bradford Jordan on behalf of OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Jordan, Douglas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/21/2017) (znmw).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 6/2/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Peter)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Chadwell Koch on behalf of All Defendants (Koch, Peter) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/5/2017) (znmw).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/28/2017. (nbn)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [5] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before July 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/2/2017. (lcjeb3)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2017. (Chasin, Steven)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                          SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS J. CURRY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Consent Forms)(jd)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY AND THOMAS J. CURRY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4928392) filed by CONFERENCE OF STATE BANK SUPERVISORS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Civil Cover Sheet, # (9) Summons, # (10) Summons, # (11) Summons, # (12) Summons)(Semko, Jennifer)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                            Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 314 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?