Vincent v. Sulphur
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00573

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 6:15 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Minute entry
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order - Minaldi
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 62 Report and Recommendations; denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 12/4/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 61 Report and Recommendations; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim that all civil rights claims brought against the City of Sulphur, Don Briscoe, Lewis Coats, Christopher Duncan and Jon Doe Sulphur po lice officer be dismissed with prejudice, and that the plaintiff's excessive force claim be dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff has failed to state a claim for which relief may be granted under Louisiana's tort laws, such all state law claims against the above named defendants are likewise dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 12/4/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 20 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that all claims against the City of Sulpher Police Department are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/19/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 7 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that all claims against the Calcasieu Parish Sheriff's Office are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/19/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Amended Complaint, filed by Carol J Vincent. IT IS RECOMMENDED that all claims against the City of Sulphur Police Department be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted under 28 USC 1915 (e)(2)(B)(ii) and that this party be dismissed from the suit. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/10/2017. (crt,LaCombe, L)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Carol J Vincent. IT IS ORDERED that Vincent amend his complaint within thirty (30) days of this order. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of his case pursuant to this court's inherent authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 5/26/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry/Order Setting Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?