J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Molson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00194

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 5:41 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions Inc. The Clerk is directed to ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT in this case in favor of plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc., and against defendants Maria Molson and MTM Services Incorporated in the amount of $ 5,541.50. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 1/9/2018. (lhc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default - form will be generated
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?