J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Sutton
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00264

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 28, 2019 at 6:52 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/4/2017; The Court finds that Judgment in J&J Sports Productions, Inc.'s favor on its claim under 47 U.S.C. 605 is warranted. (See Order for specifics.) The Court will enter an Order and Judgment consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. cc: Counsel; Pro Se Defendants (CDR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Entry of Default
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Case Assignment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?