United States of America (IRS) v. Botello et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01021
District Judge Jane J Boyle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 28, 2017 at 11:38 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United States of America (IRS), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Goud Pradyumna Maragani +1 202 307 6513 +1 202 307 0054 goud.p.maragani@usdoj.gov
Space Goud Pradyumna Maragani +1 202 307 6513 +1 202 307 0054 goud.p.maragani@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Callejo Enterprises Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Dallas County Tax Assessor Collector, Defendant
No Logo Felix C Botello, Defendant
No Logo Transwestern Amberton Tower GP LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dallas County Tax Assessor Collector ; served on 4/17/2017. (Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Transwestern Amberton Tower GP LLC; served on 4/17/2017. (Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation; served on 4/17/2017. (Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued as to Felix C Botello, Callejo Enterprises Ltd, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Dallas County Tax Assessor Collector, Transwestern Amberton Tower GP LLC. (ndt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s), # 2 Additional Page(s), # 3 Additional Page(s), # 4 Additional Page(s)) (Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America (IRS). (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 44 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?