United States of America v. Wyly et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00384
District Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2017 at 12:31 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David G Adams +1 214 880 9737 +1 214 880 9741 david.g.adams@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jonathan L Blacker +1 214 880 9765 + 214 880 9741 jonathan.blacker2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Holly Michele Church +1 214 880 2432 +1 214 880 9741 holly.m.church@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Cynthia E Messersmith +1 214 880 9721 +1 214 880 9741 cynthia.messersmith@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Moha P Yepuri +1 214 880 9767 +1 214 880 9741 moha.p.yepuri@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Caroline D Wyly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law offices of Judith W. Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Judith Weaver Ross +1 214 377 7879 +1 214 377 9409 judith.ross@judithwross.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Eric A Soderlund +1 214 377 7879 +1 214 377 9409 eric.soderlund@judithwross.com
No Logo Citco Fund Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Donald R Miller, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hallett & Perrin PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Tom M Dees, III +1 214 922 4146 +1 214 922 4141 tdees@hallettperrin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Stewart H Thomas +1 214 922 4114 +1 214 922 4141 sthomas@hallettperrin.com
No Logo Great-West Retirement Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Phil Griffis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John Philip Griffis +1 832 284 4013 +1 713 493 7253 pgriffis@griffislawfirm.com
No Logo John R Ames, Defendant
No Logo City of Dallas, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
No Logo Dallas County Community College District, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
No Logo Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
No Logo Dallas County, TX, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
No Logo Dallas Independent School District, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
No Logo Parkland Hospital District, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Lori Gruver +1 512 447 6675 +1 512 693 0728 LoriG@lgbs.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Great-West Retirement Services. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John Phil Griffis added to party Great-West Retirement Services(pty:dft) (Griffis, John) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Citco Fund Services, Inc., and Great-West Retirement Services. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Documents) (svc) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Great-West Retirement Services filed by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 20 flatten on 3/29/2017) (svc). (Entered: 03/28/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Citco Fund Services, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 19 flatten on 3/29/2017) (svc). (Entered: 03/28/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AMENDED COMPLAINT United States' First Amended Complaint against John R Ames, City of Dallas, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County, TX, Dallas Independent School District, Donald R Miller, Jr, Parkland Hospital District, Caroline D Wyly, Citco Fund Services, Inc., Great-West Retirement Services filed by United States of America. Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: It is ORDERED that the United States' 16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Further, it is ORDERED that the United States is directed to file its First Amended Complaint upon entry of this order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/27/2017) (twd) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Adams, David) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Joint STATUS REPORT filed by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Caroline D Wyly. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Judith Weaver Ross added to party Caroline D Wyly(pty:dft) (Ross, Judith) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Answer to the Verified Claim by Donald R Miller, Jr. (Dees, Tom) Modified text on 3/8/2017 (sss). (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald R Miller, Jr. (Dees, Tom) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, filed by Donald R Miller, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dees, Tom) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 3/21/2017. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2017) (Attachments: # 1 Consent Letter, # 2 Consent Form) (rekc) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Verified Claim of Dallas County, TX et al filed by John R Ames, City of Dallas, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County, TX, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District (Gruver, Lori) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John R Ames, City of Dallas, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County, TX, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District. (Gruver, Lori) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Dallas County, TX, Parkland Hospital District, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas Independent School District, City of Dallas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lori Gruver added to party John R Ames(pty:dft), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Dallas County, TX(pty:clm), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Parkland Hospital District(pty:clm), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Dallas County Community College District(pty:clm), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Dallas County School Equalization Fund(pty:clm), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party Dallas Independent School District(pty:clm), Attorney Lori Gruver added to party City of Dallas(pty:clm) (Gruver, Lori) Modified filer on 2/23/2017 (sss). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Acknowledgement of Service filed by Donald R Miller, Jr (Dees, Tom) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Summons Issued as to John R Ames, Donald R Miller, Jr, Caroline D Wyly. (ykp) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?