GAVIN v. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00768

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2019 at 6:24 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICIA GAVIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PATRICIA GAVIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICIA GAVIN
v.
No Logo American Education Services, Inc., Defendant
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONALD GODWIN, Defendant
No Logo ILLINOIS STUDENT LOAN ASSISTANCE COMMISSION, Defendant
No Logo Keller Graduate School of Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Nachowitz Steel +1 202 626 7681 +1 202 628 3606 steell@wemed.com
No Logo MICHAEL GRUBER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Michael Buxton +1 202 461 2205 cmbuxton@buxtonlawoffices.com
No Logo NAVIENT, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMERON/MCEVOY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Patrick Roche +1 703 273 8898 +1 703 273 8897 sroche@cameronmcevoy.com
Space Matthew Harrold Sorensen +1 703 460 9342 +1 703 273 8897 msorensen@cameronmcevoy.com
No Logo Nelnet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Anthony Smith +1 202 296 7353 rsmith@bhfs.com
No Logo PRUDENTIAL OFFICE OF SERVICEMEN'S GROUP LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, Defendant
No Logo Sallie Mae, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMERON/MCEVOY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Patrick Roche +1 703 273 8898 +1 703 273 8897 sroche@cameronmcevoy.com
Space Matthew Harrold Sorensen +1 703 460 9342 +1 703 273 8897 msorensen@cameronmcevoy.com
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Mediation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Continue by PATRICIA GAVIN (td) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Travel by PATRICIA GAVIN (td) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Request for Production of Records (Under Seal) "Leave to file Denied. Discovery requests are not file with the Court. Should be directed to appropriate party." This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/23/17. (td) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Injunctive Relief by PATRICIA GAVIN (td) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMERICAN EDUCATION SERVICES, INC. served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017; DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017; DONALD GODWIN served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; MICHAEL GRUBER served on 5/3/2017, answer due 5/24/2017; ILLINOIS STUDENT LOAN ASSISTANCE COMMISSION served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017; KELLER GRADUATE SCHOOL OF MANAGEMENT served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017; NAVIENT, INC. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017; NELNET, INC. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/1/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2017.) (td) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss , 7 MOTION to Dismiss , 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4994355. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PATRICIA GAVIN (td) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EDUCATION SERVICES, INC., DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DONALD GODWIN, MICHAEL GRUBER, ILLINOIS STUDENT LOAN ASSISTANCE COMMISSION, KELLER GRADUATE SCHOOL OF MANAGEMENT, NAVIENT, INC., NELNET, INC., PRUDENTIAL OFFICE OF SERVICEMEN'S GROUP LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, SALLIE MAE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616084188) with Jury Demand filed by PATRICIA GAVIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?