Daniel Jung v. Billy McFarland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03245

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2018 at 1:29 PM EST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DANIEL JUNG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Geragos & Geragos, Apc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Geragos +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 mark@geragos.com
v.
No Logo BILLY MCFARLAND, Defendant
No Logo Doe Investors, Defendant
No Logo Doe Property Owner, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo DOES 1-50, inclusive, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Atkins, Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY ATKINS, Defendant
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Transfer Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None MDL - Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Summons issued
                          21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Fyre Media, Inc. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Summons issued
                            21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Jeffrey Atkins. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Summons issued
                              21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Billy McFarland. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Summons Request
                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Summons Request
                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Summons Request
                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/7/2017, Entered: 5/7/2017 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jeffrey Atkins, Does, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Fyre Media, Inc. (car) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: 4/30/2017 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG, (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: 4/30/2017 Summons Request
                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: 4/30/2017 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                      COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19771386 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG. (Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party DANIEL JUNG(pty:pla))(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?