Castelano v. Rice et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 7:08-cv-00057
District Judge Randy Crane, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2017 at 12:39 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Arturo Garcia, Sr, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo David Hernandez, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Elvia Elissetche, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com
No Logo Florencio Gonzalez, Jr, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com
No Logo J.S., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Jessica Gonzalez, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com
No Logo Juan Aranda, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Juan Luis Flores, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Rocio Flores, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
No Logo Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Racial Justice Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanita Gupta +1 212 549 2607

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam K Levin +1 202 637 6846 aklevin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2009 Melissa N. Henke +1 202 637 5546 MNHenke@hhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Wolinsky +1 202 637 8895 +1 202 637 5910 rbwolinsky@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Widor thomas.widor@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Graybill +1 504 486 8982 +1 504 486 8947 lisa.graybill@splcenter.org
v.
No Logo Ann Barrett, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Rodriguez, Jr. +1 956 542 7441 +1 956 541 2170 vi.rodriguez@rcclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Rolbin +1 202 532 4327 jonathan.rolbin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
No Logo Celeste F., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoblit Ferguson Darling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene Carlo Benavides +1 210 224 9991 rbenavides@hfdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Respondent
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoblit Ferguson Darling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene Carlo Benavides +1 210 224 9991 rbenavides@hfdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodriguez, Colvin, Chaney & Saenz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Rodriguez, Jr. +1 956 542 7441 +1 956 541 2170 vi.rodriguez@rcclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Rolbin +1 202 532 4327 jonathan.rolbin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
No Logo Maura Harty, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Rodriguez, Jr. +1 956 542 7441 +1 956 541 2170 vi.rodriguez@rcclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Rolbin +1 202 532 4327 jonathan.rolbin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
No Logo Patrick F. Kennedy, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Rodriguez, Jr. +1 956 542 7441 +1 956 541 2170 vi.rodriguez@rcclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Rolbin +1 202 532 4327 jonathan.rolbin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Rodriguez, Jr. +1 956 542 7441 +1 956 541 2170 vi.rodriguez@rcclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoblit Ferguson Darling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene Carlo Benavides +1 210 224 9991 rbenavides@hfdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Luis +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 lisa.luis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Rolbin +1 202 532 4327 jonathan.rolbin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Joanne Stevens +1 202 616 9752 +1 202 233 0397 elizabeth.stevens@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1105(a)
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Case terminated on 08/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 92 Unopposed Motion to Approve Attorneys' Fees and Expenses.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint RESPONSE to 96 Objections OF JOSE SANTOS ARAUJO, filed by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Rolbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Joint RESPONSE to 95 Sealed Event THE OBJECTION OF CELIA CALDERA, filed by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America. (Rolbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OBJECTION to the Notice of Proposed Settlement Agreement and Hearing in a Class Action, filed by Jose Santos Araujo, pro se. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment / letter)(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Letter (SEALED EVENT), filed. (With attachments) Modified on 8/10/2009 (bgarces, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2009: # 2 Letter, # 3 Sealed Attachments) (bgarces, ). (Entered: 08/03/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed. (Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT granting 89 Motion for Emergency.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 92 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the Terms of the Stipulation and Agreement by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEVER PLAINTIFFS' 8 U.S.C. §1503(a) CLAIMS granting 88 Motion to Sever. Civil Action No. M-09-177 has been opened)(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Setting as to 89 Joint EMERGENCY MOTIONJoint MOTION Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Expedited Fairness Hearing and Motion for Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 07/01/2009 at 03:30 PM before Judge Randy Crane, filed. (lcervantes) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 7/16/2009.), Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement and Expedited Fairness Hearing and Motion for Class Certification for Settlement Purposes Only by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Unopposed MOTION to Sever Individual 1503 Claims by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 73 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 73 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STIPULATION re: Dismissal of Rocio Flores by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Rocio Flores, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 82 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief and Motion to Amend the Rule 16. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2009, Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2009, Pltf Expert Report due by 6/12/2009, Deft Expert Report due by 7/3/2009, Discovery due by 7/17/2009, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/24/2009, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/24/2009, Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2009, Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane, Jury Selection set for 9/9/2009 at 09:30AM before Judge Randy Crane, Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane).(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief and Motion to Amend the Rule 16 Scheduling Order by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint. Defendants shall have until 4/29/09 to file their response and Plaintiffs shall have until 5/6/2009 to file their reply.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Additional Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(bgarces, ) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (UNDER SEAL) by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. (Rolbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended and Supplemental Class Action Complaint and Petition for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief by J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' STIPULATIONS granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal, 67 Stipulation of Dismissal, 70 Stipulation of Dismissal, 68 Stipulation of Dismissal. Miriam Sujee Gonzalez; David Hernandez; Juan Aranda and Juan Luis Flores terminated.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          STIPULATION re: Protective Order by Juan Aranda, Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, David Hernandez, filed.(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff-Petitioner David Hernandez by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed.(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal of Juan Aranda by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed.(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff-Petitioner Juan Luis Flores by Juan Aranda, Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed.(Widor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff-Petitioner Miriam Sujee Gonzalez by Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, filed.(Levin, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 65 Motion for Thomas Widor to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Thomas J. Widor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2009. (Levin, Adam) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 39 Motion for Adam K. Levin, Melissa N. Henke, Robert B. Wolinsky and David Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. (Mr. Levin had been previously been granted leave to appear on 1/06/09 per order DE#63)(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 39 Motion for Adam K. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 38 Motion for Elizabeth J Stevens to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(bgarces, ) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 30 Motion for Lisa Luis to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(bgarces, ) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE to 57 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Sever, filed by Amalia Ramirez Castelano. (Henke, Melissa) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SURREPLY to 42 MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever filed by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez. (mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State Claim and Motion to Sever re: 42 MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Perales v. Casillas)(Rodriguez, Victor) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 41 Motion for Robin L. Goldfaden to Appear Pro Hac Vice for all Plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 44 Motion for Jonathan M. Rolbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for all defendants.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 50 Motion for Vanita Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice for all Plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2009 Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2009 Pltf Expert Report due by 5/8/2009 Deft Expert Report due by 5/29/2009 Discovery due by 6/12/2009 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/19/2009 Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/19/2009 Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/27/2009 Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane Jury Selection set for 8/4/2009 at 09:30AM before Judge Randy Crane Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Motion to Dismiss by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-reply, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Juan Aranda, Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, David Hernandez, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Vanita Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Aranda, J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2008. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever, filed by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America. (Stevens, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until 11/17/2008 in which to file a reply brief.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Luis, Lisa) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Petitioner Arturo Garcia by Arturo Garcia, Sr., filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to 42 MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever, filed by Juan Aranda, J.S., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Jonathan M. Rolbin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, Celeste F., United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2008. (mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed.(Stevens, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, In Part For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) And Motion To Sever by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Robin L. Goldfaden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2008. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/28/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 36 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Adam Levin, and Melissa Henke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Juan Aranda, J.S., Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2008. (Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Elizabeth J. Stevens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2008. (Stevens, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( Initial Conference reset for 12/3/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane).(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Second AMENDED Class Action Complaint against Patrick F. Kennedy, Maura Harty, Ann Barrett, Condoleezza Rice, United States of America filed by Juan Aranda, Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, J.S., Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, David Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER granting 32 Opposed MOTION for leave to Amend Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., granting 34 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer of other response to Second Amended Complaint to be extended to 10/15/2008.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond, Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference( Motion Docket Date 10/6/2008.) by Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Amend 10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Elvia Elissetche, Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Jessica Gonzalez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting 28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer shall be filed on or before 9/25/08. Further, it is Ordered the Initial Pretrial Conference currently sheduled for 08/06/08 is reset to 10/8/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. Finally, it is Ordered that further briefing on any Motion to Intervene filed in this matter be stayed until further order of the Court. Any response will be due no later than twenty (20) days after the entry of an order lifting the stay. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Lisa Luis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Condoleezza Rice, Celeste F., United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2008. (Luis, Lisa) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 27 Motion for Peter Bryce to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(mzamarripa, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Stay Briefing by Condoleezza Rice, Celeste F., United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Benavides, Rene) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Peter Bryce to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Condoleezza Rice, United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2008. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 22 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of The Initial Pretrial Conference and Extension of Answer Date. (Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 8/6/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane; answer due 7/25/08).(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(bgarces, ) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of The Initial Pretrial Conference and Extension of Answer Date. by Condoleezza Rice, Celeste F., United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Benavides, Rene) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Intervene by David Hernandez, Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Elvia Elissetche, Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Jessica Gonzalez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re: 10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Elvia Elissetche, Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Jessica Gonzalez, Amalia Ramirez Castelano, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    First AMENDED Petition for Habeas Corpus against Condoleezza Rice, United States of America filed by Florencio Gonzalez, Jr., Elvia Elissetche, Arturo Garcia, Sr., Sofia Elizabeth Lopez, Jessica Gonzalez, Miriam Sujee Gonzalez, Juan Luis Flores, Rocio Flores, Amalia Ramirez Castelano.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 04/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/7/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. Parties notified.(bgarces, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summonses by Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Event, filed. (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Amalia Ramirez Castelano, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 3453019) filed by Amalia Ramirez Castelano.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?