Waschko v. Janssen Research & Development LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-02996

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2021 at 10:42 PM DT (4.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lisa Waschko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jason Hodge +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 phdkh-efiling@pdkhlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
v.
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY +1 973 549 7209 +1 973 360 9831 michael.zogby@dbr.com
No Logo Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY +1 973 549 7209 +1 973 360 9831 michael.zogby@dbr.com
No Logo JOHNSON & JOHNSON CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY +1 973 549 7209 +1 973 360 9831 michael.zogby@dbr.com
No Logo MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP., Defendant
No Logo INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, In Re
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Complaint by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CO., Janssen Research & Development LLC.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lisa Waschko (HELLUMS, CHRISTOPHER)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
        Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (kas, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00377. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of New Jersey for inclusion in MDL No 2750; docket entries sent electronically to Clerk of Court in District of New Jersey. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SUMMONS Returned Executed Johnson & Johnson Co served (no date entered on card) (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served (no date entered on green card)(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Co, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Request for service by certified mail filed by Lisa Waschko. (Mann, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE Regarding CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Lisa Waschko. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Waschko.(MRR, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?