J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Guerrero
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00092

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 3:57 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER Granting 10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Elsa H. Guerrero (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Substitute
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?