Rowley, et al v. Lawrence, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-01704-MJG
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Carl Mills, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Scott +1 301 776 8400 +1 301 776 7666

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com

Represented by Tydings & Rosenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford Hearn +1 410 752 9700
No Logo Joyce Rowley, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Scott +1 301 776 8400 +1 301 776 7666

Represented by Donohue Patrick, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur M. Krawitz +1 302 998 0100 artkrawitz@dplaw.com
Space Robert Pasquale +1 302 998 0100

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
v.
No Logo Angela Lawrence, Defendant

Represented by charm.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey J Plum +1 410 879 9898 +1 410 879 9897 jplum@charm.net

Represented by Rollins Smalkin Richards and Mackie LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Wharton Whitehead, Jr. +1 410 727 2443 +1 410 727 8390 dwhitehead@rsrm.com
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/25/1990
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 10/15/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/1991, Entered: 10/15/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 10/11/91 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) "DISMISSING" without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs as therein set forth. (c/m by chambers) MICROFILMED 10/15/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1991, Entered: 10/21/1991 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 8/23/1991, Entered: 8/23/1991, Terminated: 10/15/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by Hazel Marshall, Angela Lawrence to amended complaint and Exhibit D. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/26/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER dated 7-23-91 setting Discovery cutoff 9/2/91 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 10/4/91 ; Jury trial set for 10/11/91 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 7/24/91jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 7/5/1991, Entered: 7/8/1991 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 7/5/1991, Entered: 7/8/1991 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills , (Answer due 7/15/91 for Angela Lawrence ) amending [1-1] complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/1991, Entered: 6/19/1991 OrderCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated 6-17-91 granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File amended complaint and defndants shall respond to the Amended complaint by July 10, 1991 granting [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Hazel Marshall and all claims against said defendant are dismissed; granting Motion of Angela Lawrence for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Claims for punitive damages against said defendant are dismissed; denying [8-1] motion for Separate Trials ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 6/18/91jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 5/8/1991, Entered: 5/9/1991 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills, Angela Lawrence (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 5/7/1991, Entered: 5/8/1991 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Angela Lawrence in opposition to [15-1] opposition response, [15-1] motion for Leave to File amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/1991, Entered: 4/22/1991, Terminated: 10/15/1991 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills in opposition to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment; memorandum (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/1991, Entered: 4/22/1991, Terminated: 6/19/1991 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills for Leave to File amended complaint ; proposed amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/1991, Entered: 3/11/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 3/5/91 granting [13-1] joint motion to Extend Time for discovery to 4/2/91 and Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Separate Trial extended until 4/17/91 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis )(c/m 3/6/91 jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/11/1991, Terminated: 3/6/1991 Motion for Extension of Time
JOINT MOTION by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills, Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall to Extend Time for discovery to 4/2/91 and Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Separate Trial be extended until 4/17/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 2/6/1991, Entered: 2/7/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline until March 2, 1991, reset Discovery deadline to 3/2/91 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 2/5/91 jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/1991, Entered: 2/7/1991, Terminated: 2/6/1991 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills, Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall to Extend Discovery Deadline until March 2, 1991 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 1/18/1991, Entered: 2/11/1991, Terminated: 1/18/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 1/16/91 granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Separate Trials to February 5, 1991, Motion Hearing set 2/5/91 for [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment, set for for [8-1] motion for Separate Trials ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 1/17/91 jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 1/18/1991, Entered: 1/24/1991, Terminated: 1/18/1991 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills to Extend Time to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Separate Trials to February 5, 1991 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 12/27/1990, Entered: 1/4/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION with memorandum in support by Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall for Summary Judgment Exhibits A,B (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 12/27/1990, Entered: 1/4/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION with memorandum in support by Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall for Separate Trials (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 12/13/1990, Entered: 12/17/1990, Terminated: 12/13/1990 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 12/14/90 granting [7-1] motion by CLIFFORD HEARN, ROBERT PASQUALE AND ARTHUR M. KRAWITZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiffs ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 12/17/90 dmt) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 12/13/1990, Entered: 12/17/1990, Terminated: 12/13/1990 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION by CLIFFORD HEARN, ROBERT PASQUALE AND ARTHUR M. KRAWITZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiffs (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 11/6/1990, Entered: 11/8/1990, Terminated: 11/6/1990 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery cut-off dated, reset Joint Proposed Discovery deadline to 1/31/91 (c/m 11/7/90 jw)( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 11/6/1990, Entered: 11/8/1990, Terminated: 11/6/1990 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills, Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall to Extend Time for discovery cut-off dated (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 11/30/90 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 12/28/90 ; Additional claims due by 9/14/90 Status conference by 12/28/90 ; ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) dated 7/31/90 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall 7/9/90 Answer due on 7/30/90 for Hazel Marshall, for Angela Lawrence (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall (Attorney Jeffrey J. Plum, Donald Wharton Whitehead), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued (60 days) for Angela Lawrence, Hazel Marshall (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Joyce Rowley, Carl Mills (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: 10/21/1990 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; Exhibit A; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 74485 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 72 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?