Hinton v. Lay, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:02-cv-00591
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 4, 2017 at 12:48 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth A Hinton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth A Hinton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A Hinton
v.
No Logo Andrew Fastow, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth S. Marks +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 kmarks@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Estate J Clifford Baxter, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Copy of PER CURIAM by USCA, filed. CCA No. 03-20443 (jdavenport) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) of April 29, 2004 issued as mandate on May 21, 2004 affirming the Judgment of the District Court Re: [25-1] appeal , filed. CCA No. 03-20443 (jdavenport) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      USCA LETTER advising the court has granted the appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal Re: 03-20443 , filed. (jdavenport) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [20-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis , entered. Appellant is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $16.42. The appellant shall pay $88.58 in periodic installments. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to TDCJ Office of the Genl Counsel and the Inmate Trust Fund. Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy ) (ljackson) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) August 8, 2003 [19-1] appeal , filed CCA No. 03-20443 The appeal is dismissed as of August 8, 2003 for want of prosectuion. The appellant failed to timely comply with District Court's order dated July 9, 2003. (jdavenport) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE by Kenneth A Hinton to [21-1] order, filed. Copy of inmate trust fund submitted. (ljackson) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER, entered. The clerk shall file the pltf's notice of appeal without prepayment of the appellate filing fee. Within 30 days of th edate this order is entered the pltf must submit either the filing fee of $105.00 or a certified copy of his inmate trust account. Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy ) (ljackson) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth A Hinton, Motion Docket Date 6/12/03 [20-1] motion , filed. (bdaniel) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL of [18-1] order by Kenneth A Hinton , filed. Fee Status: IFP (jdavenport) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL, entered. This case is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 04/09/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying ptlf's [16-1] motion to be enjoined as a class member of the pending MDL, entered. Pltf is ordered to show cause and to file a more definite statement within 12 days of the entry of this order. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to be enjoined as a class member of the pending MDL by Pro Se Pltf Kenneth A Hinton, Motion Docket Date 2/2/03 [16-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/14/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, entered. Pltf is ordered to show cause to this court within 20 days for his failure to fully and accurately respond to the court's order for a more definite statement. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SECOND More Definite Statement by Kenneth A Hinton filed. (sguevara) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER for More Definite Statment as to Kenneth A Hinton denying without prejudice pltf's [11-1] motion for appointment of counsel and denying without prejudice pltf's [8-1] motion to request execution of service of process of summons and complaint by U.S. Marshal entered. Parties ntfd. Definite Statement due 11/16/02. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) Modified on 10/24/2002 (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of bankruptcy filing of deft Enron Corp and imposition of automatic stay by Enron Corp, filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 09/24/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for appointment of counsel by Kenneth A Hinton, Motion Docket Date 8/13/02 [11-1] motion , filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 07/24/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of change of address by Kenneth A Hinton and request for docket sheet and documents sent out within the past 30 days, filed. (ltien) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Per Staff Atty/REQUEST by Kenneth A Hinton for copy of docket sheet and order mailed to same; Marshal's forms not provided as requested, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to request execution of service of process of summons and complaint by U.S. Marshal by Kenneth A Hinton, Motion Docket Date 5/20/02 [8-1] motion , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          More Definite Statement by Kenneth A Hinton filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying pltf's [5-1] motion for entry of order requesting service of process, entered. Pltf is assessed an initial filing fee of $1.00. Pltf shall pay $149.00 in periodic installments. The clerk will send a copy to the Official in Charge of Inmate Trust Fund Accounts, FCI Eckton, PO Box 10, Lisobon, OH 44432. Parties ntfd. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for entry of order requesting service of process by Kenneth A Hinton , Motion Docket Date 4/7/02 [5-1] motion , filed. (ljackson) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER for More Definite Statment as to Kenneth A Hinton entered. Parties ntfd. Definite Statement due 4/10/02 ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (ljackson) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT by Kenneth A Hinton filed; (bchurchill) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [1-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Sim Lake ) (bchurchill) Modified on 03/01/2002 (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth A Hinton , Motion Docket Date 3/5/02 [1-1] motion , filed. (bchurchill) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?