Brill v. Enron Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:01-cv-03734
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 4, 2017 at 12:51 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Brill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bilek Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Bruce Drubel +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 rdrubel@bsfllp.com
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE and consolidation into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron et al. Case terminated on 01/17/08.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Andrew S Fastow 1/15/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting Kenneth Lay's [9-1] motion for enlargement of time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltfs complaint and mooting [10-1] motion to expedite consideration of Defts motion for enlargment of time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltfs complaint , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (psmith) (Entered: 12/19/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, entered: This Securities case is CONSOLIDATED with 01-3624. Lead Case No. 01-3624. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (psmith) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to expedite consideration of Defts motion for enlargment of time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltfs complaint , by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [10-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for enlargement of time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltfs complaint , by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [9-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to substitute attorney James E Coleman Jr in place of Robin C Gibbs as attorney for Kenneth Lay, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes ) (psmith) (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrew S Fastow , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to substitute attorney James E Coleman Jr in place of Robin C Gibbs by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/16/01 [6-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enron Corp , filed. (mlerma) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth L Lay , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Brill , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER for Conf set inital pretrial conference for 9:00 2/19/02 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes , entered; Parties notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT by James Brill filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 514885 (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 28 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?