Goffman v. Belfer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:02-cv-01838
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 1:54 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harvey L Young, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Benckenstein Oxford LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hubert Oxford, IV +1 409 833 9182 +1 409 833 8819 hoxfordiv@benoxford.com
No Logo Lynn Goffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Benckenstein Oxford LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hubert Oxford, IV +1 409 833 9182 +1 409 833 8819 hoxfordiv@benoxford.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Watson Cunningham +1 214 978 4003 + 214 978 4044 ccunningham@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Titus LeClair +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Ben Glisan, Jr, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth S. Marks +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 kmarks@susmangodfrey.com
Space Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Jeffrey Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com
No Logo John A Urquhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com
No Logo Linda Lay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan Sommers Jacobs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George R Gibson +1 713 892 4843 +1 713 892 4840 ggibson@nathansommers.com
No Logo M D Charles A LeMaistre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Michael J Kopper, Defendant
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Richard A Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by TEKELL BOOK MATTHEWS & LIMMER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Robert Mace +1 713 222 9542 +1 713 655 7727 bmace@tekellbook.com
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Watson Cunningham +1 214 978 4003 + 214 978 4044 ccunningham@mckoolsmith.com
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 955 4440 +1 713 766 6542 bshepherd@spmlegal.com
Citation Section 88 U.S.C. § 8888
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 159 Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Unopposed MOTION to Reinstate Case by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion for Reinstatement and Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCEMENT. Case terminated on March 4, 2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE from Stephen Susman regarding service list, filed. (dcartmill) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STATUS REPORT by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel shall file a status report within 3 weeks indicating whether any settlements have been reached, and if not, providing potential dates in early 2011 for trial of whatever remains of this litigation..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 150 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate, The 10/12/10 trial setting is VACATED; either side may move to reset this matter for trial.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION to Vacate by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Vacate Trial Setting)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 147 Motion for Continuance Jury Trial set for 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2010. Unopposed Motion for continuance of the May 3 trial is granted, as stated on the record. Jury Trial is RESET to 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon. (Order to Issue) Appearances:See attached for courtroom appearances; Lew LeClair by telephone.(Court Reporter: Gayle Dye), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Setting by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 145 Motion for Conference Status Conference set for 4/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Status Conference by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  AGREED ORDER re: 143 Proposed Order Jury Trial set for 5/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Agreed PROPOSED ORDER re Lay Estate, filed.(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 138 Motion to Dismiss; mooting 139 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Granting Unopposed 140 Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Michael J. Kopper. The dismissal is with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Michael J. Kopper by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Claims Against Richard A. Causey by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 9/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 134 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on August 21, 2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Jeffrey K. Skilling)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 7/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/14/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 128 Motion for Judgment.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Order of Final Judgment by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Final Judgment)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER. Counsel shall file within two weeks of receipt of this order a status report regarding the parties' request for the Court to defer ruling on the pending motions to dismiss by Arthur Andersen, LLP(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Richard A Causey 6/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Letter from attorney Donald Wall requesting removal of himself and Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP from future communications, filed. (ltien, ) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 119 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/30/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Agreed MOTION of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling on Arthur Andersen LLPS Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions to Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 114 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Response due by 3/31/2009.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 107 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice of Claims against Ben Glisan, Jr..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 108 Agreed Motion.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Richard A. Causey is given until February 27, 2009 to file responsive pleadings to the complaints. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time. Mr. Skilling shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaints on or before 2/27/2009. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. And Defendant Arthur Andersen Requesting That the Court Defer Ruling On Arthur Andersen LLPs Pending Motions to Dismiss by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Defer Ruling on Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs Motions To Dismiss)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Dismissal as to Ben Glisan, Jr by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Ben Glisan, Jr. with prejudice)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2009. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corps Motion For Leave to File A SurReply [OCUC Instrument No. 190], filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent To Oppose The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp.s Motion for Leave to File A SurReply In Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersens Motions to Dismiss The Amended Complaint by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 11/2/08.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2008. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 93 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints. Responses due by 8/4/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension)(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 8/4/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 4/6/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 87 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints Responses due by 4/5/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltrevino, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 1/7/2008. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Amended Nts of Partial Withdrawal of (206) Mtn to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. (Attachments: # 1)(Gibson, George) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of No Response Required To The Motion To Dismiss Filed By Defendant Linda P. Lay, Executrix Of Estate Of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased re: 82 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Withdrawal of 67 Motion to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. (Gibson, George) Linked to #67 on 8/21/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 80 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 8/17/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Extend its Response date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda P Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 10/9/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant Linda Lay's Motion to Dismiss.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Linda P. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased, by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Ricahrd Causey's 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints until 08/09/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Deft Skilling's 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 07/11/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/25/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Respond to Defendant Linda K Lay's Motion to Dismiss to on or before 05/29/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due March 29, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal of 67 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda Lay, filed. This document was originally filed electronically at CA H-01-3645 inst #214.(ltien, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER and MOTION to Dismiss 54 Amended Complaint under Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(6) by Linda Lay, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2007. This document was originally filed electronically at CA H-01-3645 inst #206.(ltien, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. to Extend its Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 64 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(dpower, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Response Date to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Linda K. Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 60 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Linda Lay to respond to Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/12/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mace, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Linda Lay to respond to Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Production of Ninth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Production of Eighth Supplemental Documents to Expert Report by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of the Seventh Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Production of Sixth Supplemental Documents to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Certificate of Service for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Amended Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Richard A Causey, Ben Glisan, Jr, Michael J Kopper, Jeffrey Skilling, Linda Lay filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Related document: 1 Complaint.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 44 Second Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Production of Fifth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Certificate of Service re: 49 Notice (Other) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: 44 Second MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Production of Fourth Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Pltfs 46 Motion to Substitute Mrs Linda Lay for Deft Kenneth L Lay .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Production of Third Supplemental Invoices to Expert Reports by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, for Defendant Kenneth L Lay in place of Kenneth L Lay by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp Unopposed Motion to Substitute Mrs. Linda Lay, Executrix of Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, for Defendant Kenneth L Lay)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service re: 44 Second MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. (LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B# 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. Second Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Notice and Motion Relating to Dismissal of Claims Asserted in Derivative Cases Against Certain Defendants)(LeClair, Lewis) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 40 Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, (H 01-3645, H 01-3690, H 01-3892, H 01-3998, H 02-1832, H 02-1838, H 02-1922, and H 02-3427) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004) Modified on 10/20/2004 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE by Unsecured Creditors Committee to [114-1] motion to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases, [114-2] motion Substitute as Real Part Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on Behalf of Bankruptcy Estate by Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Enron Corp and its Affilated Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Motion Docket Date 8/22/04 [40-1] motion, 8/22/04 [40-2] motion , filed. (kmurphy) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certified copy of ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION and administrative closure; this member case is consolidated into lead case H.01-3645 and administratively closed, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSFER ORDER transferring case under MDL to Southern dist of Texas, houston pursuant to MDL order - assigned MDL 1446, entered; Parties notified. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [34-1] motion for Kenneth Marks to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of potential Tag-Along actions submitted to the MDL Panel, filed (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Clinton Krislov to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Kenneth Marks to appear pro hac vice by Enron Corp, Motion Docket Date [34-1] motion , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Bankruptcy filing and imposition of automatic stay by Enron Corp , filed (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Michael rosenblat to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing of motion to transfer and consolidate for pretrial proceedings with the MDL Panel by David Wortham and Duane McEachern, filed (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Anthony Blumberg to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [22-1] motion for michael Karnuth to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Donald Statland to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge John Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to stay by Enron Corp, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [3-1] motion for Robin Gibbs to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge john Hannah) (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Anthony Blumberg to appear pro hac vice by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Donald Statland to appear pro hac vice by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Michael rosenblat to appear pro hac vice by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for michael Karnuth to appear pro hac vice by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Clinton Krislov to appear pro hac vice by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Enron Corp 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Herbert S Winokur Jr 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to John Wakeham 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to John A Urquhart 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Jeffrey Skilling 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Frank Savage 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Paulo V Ferraz Pereira 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to John Mendelsohn 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Charles A LeMaistre 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kenneth L Lay 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert K Jaedicke 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Wendy L Gramm 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Andrew Fastow 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to John H Duncan 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Ronnie C Chan 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Norman P Blake Jr 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert A Blefer 11/20/01 filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Robin Gibbs to appear pro hac vice by Robert A Blefer, Norman P Blake Jr, Ronnie C Chan, John H Duncan, Wendy L Gramm, Robert K Jaedicke, Charles A LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Frank Savage, Jeffrey Skilling, John A Urquhart, John Wakeham, Herbert S Winokur Jr, Motion Docket Date , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to transfer case to Southern Dist of Texas by Kenneth L Lay, , filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT by Lynn Goffman, Harvey L Young, filed. (ckrus) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?