Steiner v. Enron Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:01-cv-03717
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 2:15 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dr Thomas Barnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com
No Logo Esther Phillips Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
No Logo Etta K Steiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com
No Logo Individually Henry H Steiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGehee Chang Barnes Landgraf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack E McGehee +1 713 864 4000 +1 713 868 9393 jmcgehee@lawtx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com
No Logo James A Van Burgh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
No Logo Michael G Palmiero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com
No Logo The Eshe Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Bruce Drubel +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 rdrubel@bsfllp.com
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 955 4440 +1 713 766 6542 bshepherd@spmlegal.com
No Logo Charles A LeMaistre, Defendant
No Logo Charls E Walker, Defendant
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Kemet Corporation
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Unknown Role, Citigroup, Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilshire Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacalyn D Scott +1 713 651 1221 +1 713 651 0020
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilshire Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacalyn D Scott +1 713 651 1221 +1 713 651 0020
Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 427 5030 +1 713 427 5099 lawrence.finder@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo C.s. First Boston, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant
No Logo John A Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/28/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hicks Thomas, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor Mayo Hicks +1 713 547 9100 +1 713 547 9150 thicks@hicks-thomas.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Hicks Thomas, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor Mayo Hicks +1 713 547 9100 +1 713 547 9150 thicks@hicks-thomas.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert L Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Smith Barney Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to the information provided in 60 the status report, the Court ORDERS that this case is CLOSED. Case terminated on August 11, 2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STATUS REPORT by Henry H Steiner(and on behalf of all others similarly situated), filed.(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER Because class certification claims and pending motions have been withdrawn, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs' counsel to submit within 10 days a report regarding status of the case.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Dismissing Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Dismissal as to Arthur Andersen LLP by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Arthur Andersen LLP, added .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER withdrawing 29 Motion to Dismiss, withdrawing 29 Motion to Sever, granting 54 Motion to Withdraw .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ckrus, ) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Withdraw 29 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Sever Henry H Steiner(and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Thomas Barnett, Michael G Palmiero, Etta K Steiner, Henry H Steiner(Trustee u/w/o Jakob Hirschberger), The Eshe Fund MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Sever Henry H Steiner(and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Thomas Barnett, Michael G Palmiero, Etta K Steiner, Henry H Steiner(Trustee u/w/o Jakob Hirschberger), The Eshe Fund by Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ledwards, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  WITHDRAWAL of Claim by all plaintiffs, filed.(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Reply to Response to 37 MOTION to Amend, filed by all plaintiffs. (Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUPPLEMENT to 37 MOTION to Amend And 45 Response in Opposition by CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co, filed.(ejuarez, ) (Entered: 04/03/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to 37 MOTION to Amend, filed by Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. (espencer, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BRIEF Preferred Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint [Docket #37] re: 37 MOTION to Amend by all plaintiffs, filed.(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting Preferred Plaintiffs' 46 Motion to Extend Time to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Preferred Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint [Docket #37] by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preferred Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint [Docket #37])(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition to 37 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Financial Institution Defendant's. (chorace, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltfs' Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' 37 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/16/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Financial Institution Defts UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltfs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Docket #37), by CitiGroup Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/16/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(psmith, ) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SECOND AMENDED Complaint against Enron Corp, Kenneth L Lay, Jeffrey K Skilling, Andrew S Fastow, Arthur Andersen LLP filed by all plaintiffs. Related document: 1 Complaint. This entry is a duplicate of 40 and was made for report purposes.(ltien, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Second Amended Complaint by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Second Amended Complaint)(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              BRIEF in support re: 37 MOTION to Amend by all plaintiffs, filed.(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PROPOSED ORDER re: 37 MOTION to Amend, filed.(Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Amend by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2005. (Weintraub, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Reply in Support of 28 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Stay Pltfs' Class Certification and for Expedited Consideration, filed by Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      EXHIBITS Volume II re: 33 Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18# 2 Exhibit 19 (Pages 1-35)# 3 Exhibit 19 (Continued) Pages 36 - end# 4 Exhibits 20-22# 5 Exhibits 23-24# 6 Exhibits 25-26# 7 Exhibits 27-28# 8 Exhibits 29-30# 9 Exhibits 31-32)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        EXHIBITS Volume I re: 33 Declaration, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2# 2 Exhibit 3# 3 Exhibit 4# 4 5# 5 Exhibit 6# 6 Exhibit 7# 7 Exhibit 8-10# 8 Exhibits 11-13# 9 Exhibits 14-15# 10 Exhibits 16-17)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of Robert B. Weintraub in support re: 31 Response in Opposition to Motion and 32 MOTION for Entry of Order Prohibiting the FIDs from Asserting Afffirmative Defenses, filed.(kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Entry of Order Prohibiting the FIDs from Asserting Afffirmative Defenses by Preferred Purchaser Plaintiffs filed. (Part 2 of 31 Motion Docket Date 9/20/2005. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to 28 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Texas Securities Act Claims, and for an Order Prohibiting the Assertion of Affirmative Defenses filed by the Preferred Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MEMORANDUM in support re: 29 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss the Preferrred Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplement to the Consolidated Complaint by Financial Institution Defts filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation) (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3842)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Sever and Dismiss the Preferred Purchaser Pltfs (Henry H Steiner, Thomas Barnett, Michael G Palmiero, Etta K Steiner, Henry H Steiner(Trustee u/w/o Jakob Hirschberger), The Eshe Fund) 25 26 Supplement to the Consolidated Complaint by Financial Instituion Defts. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ref CA H 01-3624 #3841) (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Stay Pltfs' Class Certification and for Expedited Consideration by Financial Instituion Defts -Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3840)(kmurphy, ) Modified on 9/1/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re: 25 MOTION to Certify Class, 26 MOTION to Certify Class by, filed. (Document filed manually and is unsigned)(kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMENDED MOTION for Class Certification with respect to Texas Securities Act by Preferred Purchaser Plaintiffs filed. (Document filed manually and is unsigned) Motion Docket Date 9/6/2005. (kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for class Certification with respect to Texas Securities Act by Preferred Purchaser Pltfs, filed. (Document filed manually and is unsigned.) Motion Docket Date 9/6/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RETURN of Service Executed as to Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc on 11/19/04 , filed.(psmith, ) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RETURN of Service Executed as to Smith Barney Inc on 11/19/04 , filed.(psmith, ) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RETURN of Service Executed as to Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc on 11/19/04 , filed.(psmith, ) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RETURN of Service Executed as to Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc on 11/22/04 , filed.(psmith, ) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; with Texas Securities Act Supplement against Andersen, Robert A Belfer, Norman P Blake, Jr, Ronnie C Chan, Citibank NA, CitiGroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, CS First Boston, John H Duncan, Joe H Foy, Wendy L Gramm, Robert L Jaedicke, Charles A LeMaistre, Merrill Lynch & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Smith Barney Inc, John A Urquhart, John Wakeham, Charls E Walker, Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Enron Corp, Kenneth L Lay, Jeffrey K Skilling, Andrew S Fastow filed by Thomas Barnett, Esther Phillips Jackson, Michael G Palmiero, Etta K Steiner, Henry H Steiner(Trustee u/w/o Jakob Hirschberger), The Eshe Fund, James A Van Burgh. Related document: 11 Amended Complaint filed by Henry H Steiner, 1 Complaint filed by Henry H Steiner,. (Attachments: # 1 Pages 41-80# 2 Pages 81-101)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting (1015-1 in H01-3624) motion for clarification of this Court's order entered 8/7/02 (#983). The court further Orders that leave is granted to Preferred Purchaser Pltf's to add their Supplement, originally proposed for the Newby amended pleading, to their first amended complaint in H01-3717 or to file a second amended complaint in H01-3717 to assert the 1996-97 claims and name new deft's. Deft's may then file responsive pleadings including motions to dismiss based on limitations, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (tward) (Entered: 02/25/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Barbara L. Cooper Re: service as to Arthur Andersen LLP on 11/30/01 , filed (hlerma) Modified on 01/17/2002 (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Enron Corp 11/1/01 Answer due on 12/31/01 for Enron Corp , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION : This case will be consolidated under Civil Action No. 01cv3624, Newby v. Enron Corp., et al., as the lead case. If any party objects to the consolidation, that party must file an objection to consolidation with this court within 10 days of the filing of this Notice of Consolidation , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (hlerma) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER mooting [13-1] motion to expedite consideration of Deft Lay's motion for enlargement of time to answer, move to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (hlerma) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [12-1] motion to extend time to respond to complaint. Deft Lay to file answers, motions to dismiss or other responsive pleading is enlarge until 30 days after the Motion to Consolidate all of the Enron-related litigation is ruled upon, or until such time as the Ct. determines, in a Case Management Order, is appropriate , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (hlerma) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to expedite consideration of Deft Lay's motion for enlargement of time to answer, move to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [13-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to extend time to respond to complaint , and to dismiss or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [12-1] motion, 12/27/01 [12-2] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Henry H Steiner ,(Answer due 12/10/01 for Andrew S Fastow, for Jeffrey K Skilling, for Kenneth L Lay, for Enron Corp ) amending [1-1] complaint , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion to substitute attorney James E. Coleman and Charles F. Richards in place of Robin C. Gibbs Added James E Coleman Jr , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (hlerma) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Andrew S Fastow , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to substitute attorney James E. Coleman and Charles F. Richards in place of Robin C. Gibbs by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/16/01 [8-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth L Lay , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/24/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enron Corp , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/19/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Henry H Steiner , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/14/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Set scheduling conference for 2:45 3/4/02 by telephone before Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (amaly) (Entered: 11/08/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge David Hittner ) Case reassigned to Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt (leddins) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 10:30 3/22/01 before Magistrate Judge Marcia A. Crone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT by Henry H Steiner filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 514834 (bchurchill) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?