Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Coty Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00385

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 8:55 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Ricketts +1 214 466 1270 +1 214 635 1842 mickey.ricketts@bjciplaw.com
v.
No Logo Coty Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
      Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION Leave to Conduct Venue Discovery by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Appointing Mediator. Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.) is appointed as mediator in the above-referenced case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2017. (slo, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 8/1/2017. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/28/2017. (ch, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Jeff Kaplan, filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. re 11 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Joe, Christopher)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Hsin-Teh Chen on behalf of Coty Inc. (Chen, Emily)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Howard Yu on behalf of Coty Inc. (Yu, Nicholas)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa K Nguyen on behalf of Coty Inc. (Nguyen, Lisa)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard G Frenkel on behalf of Coty Inc. (Frenkel, Richard)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coty Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coty Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Dismiss by Coty Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2017. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Coty Inc..( Soobert, Allan)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Coty Inc..( Soobert, Allan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. Coty Inc. served on 5/8/2017, answer due 5/29/2017. (ch, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Coty Inc.. (ch, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ricketts on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Ricketts, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Buether, Eric)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Coty Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6276552.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?