PETROZZIELLO v. FYRE MEDIA, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2017 at 3:22 PM EST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ANDREW PETROZZIELLO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Andrew Michael Grous +1 212 267 3091 agrous@wilentz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PHILIP A. TORTORETI +1 732 636 8000 +1 732 726 6542 ptortoreti@wilentz.com
v.
No Logo BILLY MCFARLAND, Defendant
No Logo Fyre Festival LLC, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY ATKINS, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Transfer Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Transfer Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEFFREY ATKINS, FYRE FESTIVAL LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., BILLY MCFARLAND Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Shea Smith* (sms) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ATKINS, FYRE FESTIVAL LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., BILLY MCFARLAND ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7810748) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANDREW PETROZZIELLO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sms) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 7 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?