Alden v. Eason
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-04704

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 6:09 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND REASONS REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Remand Letter)(clc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Remand to State Court
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?