Buckner v. Chase Bank, JP Morgan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00302

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 1:12 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Response (non motion)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER that plaintiff's 26 Motion for Reconsideration is Denied as Moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant's 13 MOTION to Dismiss be Granted; and that plaintiff's 24 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint be Denied. ( Objections to R&R due by 1/5/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/22/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting defendant's 22 Motion to Strike. The Clerk if directed to Strike plaintiff's amended complaint 21 from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/6/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                REPORT & RECOMMENDATION denying plaintiff's 2 Motion for TRO and injunctive relief. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/5/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified to correct/reflect correct docket event on 5/5/2017 (art).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?