Landmark Technology, LLC v. Launchpad, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00892
District Judge William Q. Hayes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 1:55 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Banie & Ishimoto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Ishimoto +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 ishimoto@banishlaw.com
Space Jennifer L. Ishimoto +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 ishimoto@banishlaw.com
v.
No Logo Launch Pad, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 0001
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing Regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,289,319 (Re: Doc. No. 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice).(cc: USPTO)(jrd) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Landmark Technology, LLC WITH PREJUDICE (Ishimoto, Jennifer) (mdc.) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,289,319* cc:USPTO (mpl) (jao). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) (jao). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10044700.), filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:17-cv-892-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Ishimoto, Jennifer)(mpl) (jao). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 78 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?