Dixon v. General Motors Financial Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-04492

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2019 at 12:28 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 00 U.S.C. § 0000
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Set Aside Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to amend/correct
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to amend/correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set AsideCourt Filing
                              ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Landry Dixon's 63 Motion to Set Aside Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2018. (mmv)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Individual Defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/1/2018. (mmv)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Set Aside
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that GM Financial's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/18/2018. (mmv)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Deadlines
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Terminate Hearings
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants GM Financial and Individual Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS GRANTED IN PART to the extent that it requests dismissal of Plaintiff's claims under TILA and the ADA. IT IS DENIED to the extent that it requests dismissal of all of Plaintiff's claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted fourteen days leave to amend his complaint to allege any additional potential claims and any potential facts regarding claims against Individual Defendants. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/6/2018. (jls)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Witness and Exhibit List
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Request for Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?