Reel v. McFarland
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-21683

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 12:43 AM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Emily Reel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Aaron Backman +1 954 734 1853 +1 954 213 0140 jeffrey.backman@gmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Elizabeth Walker +1 954 491 1120 +1 954 333 4248 Rachel.Walker@gmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Levy & Levy, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Evan Levy +1 954 763 5722 +1 954 763 5723 chad@levylevylaw.com
No Logo Kenneth Reel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Aaron Backman +1 954 734 1853 +1 954 213 0140 jeffrey.backman@gmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Elizabeth Walker +1 954 491 1120 +1 954 333 4248 Rachel.Walker@gmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Levy & Levy, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Evan Levy +1 954 763 5722 +1 954 763 5723 chad@levylevylaw.com
v.
No Logo 42West, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company
TERMINATED: 01/03/2018 Elizabeth Chantel Greene +1 813 864 9301
a Delaware limited liability company
TERMINATED: 01/03/2018 S. Jonathan Vine +1 561 383 9203 +1 561 683 8977 jonathan.vine@csklegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company
TERMINATED: 01/03/2018 Eliot Pedrosa +1 305 579 0743 +5790 579 579 0717 pedrosae@gtlaw.com
No Logo Billy McFarland, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Frye Festival, LLC, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Atkins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and as Co-Founder of Fyre Media, Inc Michael E Zapin +1 561 367 1444 michaelEzapin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and as Co-Founder of Fyre Media, Inc Ryan Hayden Smith +1 919 809 3807 ryan@nclawyernow.com
No Logo Matte Projects, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas and Locicero PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a New York limited liability company
TERMINATED: 01/03/2018 Dana Jane McElroy +1 954 703 3417 +1 954 400 5415 dmcelroy@tlolawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1330
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Final Order of Dismissal and Order Denying All Pending Motions as Moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/5/2018. (koa) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE LOUIS TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION AND APPEAL OPTION. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/21/2018. (koa)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER denying 80 Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Agreed/Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, Etc. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/21/2018. (koa)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Ryan Smith. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/16/2018. (koa)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Clerks Notice to Filer re 80 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time [AGREED MOTION] comply with discovery; comply with court's 9-20-17 scheduling order re 78 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 48 Scheduling Order,,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
              Agreed/Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,etc. pursuant to Local Rule 26.1 and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 29 by Jeffrey Atkins. Responses due by 3/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Certification Certificate of Service)(Zapin, Michael) Modified Relief on 3/7/2018 (ls).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for RYAN SMITH. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10457841 by Jeffrey Atkins. Responses due by 3/19/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Certification Rule 4(b) Certification, # 2 Exhibit Certificates of Admission/Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 4 Certification Certificate of Service)(Zapin, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER of Continuance and Order Revising Pretrial Deadlines. Calendar Call set for 7/17/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Jury Trial set for the two-week period starting 7/23/2018 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/8/2018. (kcg)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice Party Billy McFarland. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/5/2018. (kcg)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendants 42West, LLC and Matte Finish, LLC; denying as moot 17 Defendant Matte Finish, LLC's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 28 Defendant 42West, LLC's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/29/2017. (kcg)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to move for summary judgment (and modify 9/20/17 Scheduling Order to comport with requested extensions) re 48 Scheduling Order,, ( Responses due by 12/22/2017) by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Zapin, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, MATTE PROJECTS, LLC by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, 42WEST, LLC by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Defendant's REPLY to 69 Response in Opposition to Motion by 42West, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Vine, S.) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Missing PDF from the Docket Entry; The document has been attached to this notice. (ra) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Dismissing Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Crossclaim Against Defendant 42West, LLC; denying as moot 54 Defendant 42West, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Crossclaim. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/15/2017. (kcg) (ra). (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. Replies due by 11/21/2017. (Backman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Atkins re 66 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, 67 Response in Opposition to Motion (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Jeffrey Atkins. Replies due by 11/20/2017. (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to crossclaim(s) against defendant 42West, LLC by Jeffrey Atkins (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE by Jeffrey Atkins (of Rule 26a initial disclosures; 1st set of document demands and 1st set of interrogatories on plaintiffs) (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service) (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 63 Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Atkins shall file a response to Defendant 42West, LLC's motion to dismiss crossclaims no later than 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/7/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, 62 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,, by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Zapin, Michael)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 58 Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Motion for Extension of Time; denying 58 Motion to Extend All Deadlines. Defendant Atkins shall file a response to Defendant 42West, LLC's motion to dismiss crossclaims no later than 11/6/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/23/2017. (kcg)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 53 Defendant Matte Finish, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Second Cross Claim as against Defendant Matte Finish, LLC. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/17/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 58 MOTION for Extension of Time 1. respond to defendant 42West, LLC mot to dismiss crossclaims; 2. extend time under court's 9/20/17 Scheduling Order re 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Atkins re 58 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, MOTION for Extension of Time/All Deadlines 45 days under Court's 9/20/2017 Scheduling Order (Zapin, Michael) Modified Text on 10/17/2017 (ls). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 54 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, by Jeffrey Atkins. Responses due by 10/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapin, Michael) Modified Relief on 10/17/2017 (ls). Added MOTION for Extension of Time/All Deadlines 45 days under Court's 9/20/2017 Scheduling Order on 10/17/2017 (ls).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery and Respond to Defendant 42West's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant 42West's motion to dismiss no later than 11/14/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/11/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Backman, Jeffrey)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel, Ted E. Bandstra. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by 42West, LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2017 (Vine, S.)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Matt Projects LLC's Motion to Dismiss The Cross Claim Of Defendant Jeffrey Atkins And Supporting Memorandum Of Law by Matte Projects, LLC. Responses due by 10/13/2017 (McElroy, Dana)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 50 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing, 51 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Herbert Stettin. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 50 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the mediator. (asl) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added 42West, LLC, Jeffrey Atkins, Frye Festival, LLC, Fyre Media, Inc., Matte Projects, LLC, Billy McFarland, Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/20/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period starting 4/30/2018 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 4/24/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/20/2017. (kcg) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel as to Jeffrey Atkins. (ls) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel as to Jeffrey Atkins. (ls) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Atkins re 44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against 42West, LLC, Frye Festival, LLC, Fyre Media, Inc., Matte Projects, LLC, Billy McFarland by Jeffrey Atkins. (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 40 Defendant Jeffrey Atkins' Motion to Vacate Default. Defendant Atkins shall file a response to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/6/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Letter from The Corporation Trust Company as to Jeffrey Atkins. (mc) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey Atkins re 39 Notice of Attorney Appearance, 40 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 20 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default, 21 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default [Granting Leave to Interpose Answer by September 11, 2017] (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 20 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default, 21 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default [Granting Leave to Interpose Answer by September 11, 2017] by Jeffrey Atkins. Responses due by 9/15/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Supporting Law Memo)(Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Zapin on behalf of Jeffrey Atkins. Attorney Michael E. Zapin added to party Jeffrey Atkins(pty:dft). (Zapin, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying 33 Motion for 90-Day Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendant Billy McFarland. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/28/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant 42West, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery regarding 42West's contacts in Florida until 10/9/2017. Plaintiffs shall file a response to 42West's motion to dismiss no later than 10/19/2017. 36 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/25/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 28 Notice (Other) by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to West 42's Motion to Dismiss)(Backman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Letter from The Corporation Trust Company as to Jeffrey Atkins. (mc) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Atkins. (lrz1) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to serve Defendant, Billy McFarland re 30 Order to Show Cause by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. Responses due by 8/31/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levy, Chad) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 31 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery and for extension of time. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant 42West's motion to dismiss is extended to 8/25/2017. The court defers ruling on the jurisdictional discovery and any further extension until a later date. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery re 28 Notice (Other), Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to 42West, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levy, Chad) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs shall file a Show Cause Response no later than 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/8/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING TRANSFER IN RE: MDL 2787 - Fyre Festival Litigation. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (gp)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by 42West, LLC Notice of Joinder, Motion to Dismiss and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Vine, S.) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Defendant 42 West, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant 42 West, LLC shall file an answer to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/20/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/19/2017. (kcg)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by 42West, LLC. (Vine, S.)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by 42West, LLC (Vine, S.) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 17 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Matte Projects LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law / Defendant Matte Projects, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Matte Projects, LLC. (McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Matte Projects LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. Replies due by 6/30/2017. (Backman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Clerks Entry of Default as to Jeffrey Atkins per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: 20 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/15/2017. (yha)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Jeffrey Atkins. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/13/2017. (kcg)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by 42West, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dolphin Digital Media, Inc. for 42West, LLC (Pedrosa, Eliot) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Clerks Entry of Default as to FYRE MEDIA, INC., FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC. - Motions Terminated: 15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, 14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/12/2017. (yha)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Matte Projects LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Matte Projects, LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2017 (McElroy, Dana)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matte Projects, LLC (McElroy, Dana) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Frye Festival, LLC by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Clerks Default against Fyre Festival, LLC)(Backman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Fyre Media, Inc. by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Clerks Default against Fyre Media)(Backman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Defendant 42West, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant 42West, LLC shall file a response to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than 7/19/2017. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/8/2017. (kcg) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 6 Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit Defendants' Communications with Potential Class Members. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/1/2017. (kcg)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Courtesy Copy of MOTION for Transfer of Related Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings sent before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Amended Proof of Service)(gp) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. Jeffrey Atkins served on 5/20/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, 6 MOTION for an Order Limiting Defendants' Communications with Plaintiffs and Potential Class Members and for Other Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) re 1 Complaint, by 42West, LLC. Attorney Eliot Pedrosa added to party 42West, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pedrosa, Eliot)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. Matte Projects, LLC served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. 42West, LLC served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017; Frye Festival, LLC served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017; Fyre Media, Inc. served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017. (Levy, Chad) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an Order Limiting Defendants' Communications with Plaintiffs and Potential Class Members and for Other Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) re 1 Complaint, by Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Levy, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Aaron Backman on behalf of Emily Reel, Kenneth Reel (Backman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to 42West, LLC, Jeffrey Atkins, Does 1-50, Frye Festival, LLC, Fyre Media, Inc., Matte Projects, LLC, Billy McFarland. (lrz1) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lrz1) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno (lrz1) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9710432, filed by EMILY REEL, KENNETH REEL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Summon(s), # 7 Summon(s), # 8 Summon(s), # 9 Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H)(Levy, Chad) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?