USA v. McBean
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00216-RJS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 6:42 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Greenwood +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2527 Jessica.Greenwood@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Jared P Lenow +1 212 637 1068 jared.lenow@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dajahn McBean, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Gilbert Calvin Parris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Gilbert Calvin Parris +1 718 246 5050 +1 718 504 5004

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donald Doboulay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: CJA Appointment Donald Dennis Duboulay +1 212 966 3970 +1 212 941 7106 dondubesq@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Dajahn McBean (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/4/2017
County NewYork
Terminated 9/6/2017
Reopened
Magistrate Case
117-mj-01036-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344A.F BANK FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A.F FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS (AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A.F FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS (AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT)
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT BANK FRAUD
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344A.F BANK FRAUD
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A.F FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS (AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT)
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED,ECF,PRIOR
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/12/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/5/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Dajahn McBean. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dajahn McBean re: Sentence held on 9/6/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Payment of Special Assessment
                                                                                                                            Payment of Special Assessment from Dajahn McBean in the amount of $100.00. Date Received: 9/12/2017. (aa)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Dajahn McBean (1), Count(s) 1, 1s, 2, 3s are dismissed on the motion of the US. Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 2s, Imprisonment for a total term of Twenty-Four (24) Months. Supervised release for a term of Twelve Months. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That Defendant be housed at the Metropolitan Correctional Center until he is assigned a permanent facility. The Court also recommends that Defendant be permanently housed at FCI Fort Dix, so that he may be visited by his family. Special Assessment of $100. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/6/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                    DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Dajahn McBean (1) Count 1,1s,2,3s. (jw)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  sentencing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Sentencing held on 9/6/2017 for Dajahn McBean (1) Count 2. Defendant Dajahn McBean, in custody, present with attorney Gilbert Parris. AUSA Jessica Greenwood present. Court reporter present. The Court sentenced Defendant. Judgment and conviction to follow in a separate order. (bw)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Dajahn McBean. (Greenwood, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Dajahn McBean. (Parris, Gilbert)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Dajahn McBean addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Gilbert C. Parris, Esq dated 8/23/17 re: To respectfully request an extension of time on behalf of DaJahn McBean regarding submission of his sentencing memo until August 28, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/25/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Dajahn McBean. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 6/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dajahn McBean re: Plea held on 6/6/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Dajahn McBean. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dajahn McBean re: Conference held on 5/12/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Plea entered by Dajahn McBean (1) Guilty as to Count 2s. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                      Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Dajahn McBean (1) Count 2s. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report
                                                                                                                                                                        Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Dajahn McBean. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/6/17)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Change of Plea Hearing as to Dajahn McBean held on 6/6/2017. Plea entered by Dajahn McBean (1) Guilty as to Count 2. Defendant Dajahn McBean in custody present with attorney Gilbert Parris. AUSA Jessica Greenwood present. Court reporter present. Defendant withdrew plea of not guilty and entered a plea of guilty to Count 2 of the original indictment. Sentencing scheduled for September 6, 2017. Defendant's sentencing memorandum due two weeks prior to sentencing; government's memorandum due one week prior to sentencing. PSIs ordered. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                            (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Dajahn McBean (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 9/5/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Dajahn McBean. (Greenwood, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 witness list
                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by USA as to Dajahn McBean. (Greenwood, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying [13] LETTER MOTION Scheduling of Conference as to Dajahn McBean (1). ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request for an extension is DENIED. Accordingly, the parties shall abide by the schedule ordered during the May 12, 2017 status conference. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/31/2017) (ft) Modified on 6/1/2017 (ft).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSA Jessica Greenwood dated 05/31/2017 re: Scheduling of Conference and Brief Adjournment of Deadlines . Document filed by USA as to Dajahn McBean. (Greenwood, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Dajahn McBean. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dajahn McBean re: Conference held on 4/7/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Andrew Hartman appearing for USA. (Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: 4/9/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jared P Lenow appearing for USA. (Lenow, Jared)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Dajahn McBean...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/7/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan as to Dajahn McBean Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Plea entered by Dajahn McBean (1) Count 1,2 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Arraignment as to Dajahn McBean (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/7/2017. Defendant in custody present with Attorney Gilbert Parris. U.S. Marshals present. AUSA Jessica Greenwood present. Court reporter present. Defendant was arraigned on the charges. Defendant entered plea of Not Guilty to all charges. Status conference date set for May 12, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. The Court ordered that time be excluded from 4/7/2017 through 5/12/2017. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT FILED as to Dajahn McBean (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Dajahn McBean. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dajahn McBean. Time excluded from 3/13/17 until 4/12/17. Follows oral order of 3/13/17. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/13/17)(jbo)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Affirmation in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION of Jessica Greenwood in Support by USA as to Dajahn McBean, the government is requesting a continuance until 4/12/17. (jbo)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Gilbert Calvin Parris appearing for Dajahn McBean. (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Dajahn McBean. Attorney Gilbert Calvin Parris for Dajahn McBean added. Attorney Donald D. Duboulay terminated. (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Initial Appearance as to Dajahn McBean held on 2/10/2017., Deft Appears with CJA Attorney Donald Duboulay and AUSA Jessica Greenwood for the government. Detention on Consent w/o Prejudice; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 3/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dajahn McBean. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (CJA Attorney Donald Duboulay Appointed) (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Dajahn McBean. In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 1344 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Dajahn McBean. Attorney Donald D. Duboulay for Dajahn McBean added.. (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest of Dajahn McBean. (dif)[1:17-mj-01036-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 8,115 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?