Wu v. USCIS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00847

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 2:03 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lulu Wu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Egert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Piston +1 248 524 1936 +1 248 680 0627 michaelpiston4@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Complaint
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 6 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?