Becker, et al v. Sullivan, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-01889-JRH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Irving L. Becker, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Louis W. Sullivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Billy S Bradley

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Breckinridge L. Willcox +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette A Plante +1 202 616 6444 +1 202 616 6647 jeanette.plante@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/12/1990
Jury Demand None
Demand $24000
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 6/12/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/12/1991, Entered: 6/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment; "ENTERING" Judgment in favor of Defendant; "CLOSING" the case. ( signed by Judge John R. Hargrove ) (c/m 6/12/91, daf) MICROFILM DATE 6/13/91) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/1991, Entered: 6/13/1991 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION (dated 6/12/91). ( signed by Judge John R. Hargrove ) (c/m 6/12/91, daf) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1991, Entered: 7/5/1991 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/1991, Entered: 4/15/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by Louis W. Sullivan to response of Plaintiff to [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          MOTION by Louis W. Sullivan to Extend Time to file a reply until 4/12/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/1991, Entered: 3/26/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
            MEMORANDUM by Irving L. Becker in opposition to [7-1] motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment, Affidavit in Support, Request for Hearing. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/13/1991, Entered: 3/14/1991, Terminated: 3/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER (dated 3/13/91) granting [8-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to file an Opposition to Motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment., reset Motion Filing deadline to 4/2/91 (c/m 3/14/91, daf) signed by Senior Judge Herbert F. Murray ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/13/1991, Entered: 3/14/1991, Terminated: 3/13/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                MOTION by Irving L. Becker to Extend Time to file an Opposition to Motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1991, Entered: 3/11/1991 Remark
                  Rule 1256 Letter mailed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/4/1991, Entered: 3/4/1991, Terminated: 6/12/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Louis W. Sullivan for Summary Judgment EXHIBITS: List of Materials in the Record Complainants List of Proposed Exhibits, List of Materials in File, Complainants Post Hearing Brief, Respondents Exhibits 1-14, Copy of Transcript of Proceedings dated 2/23/89, Transcript of Proceedings dated 4/26/89 FILED SEPARATELY. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/1991, Entered: 2/6/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Louis W. Sullivan by Jeannette Plante, and "APPROVAL" (Hargrove, J), dated 2/5/91. (c/m 2/6/91, daf) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 12/14/1990 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/11/91 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 3/4/91 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 5/24/91 ; Pretrial conference for 9:15 6/3/91 ; Jury trial set for 10:00 6/10/91 ( signed by Judge John R. Hargrove ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/17/1990, Entered: 12/14/1990 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Louis W. Sullivan (Attorney:Billy S. Bradley ), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 12/14/1990 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Louis W. Sullivan 7/20/90 Answer due on 9/20/90 for Louis W. Sullivan (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/13/1990, Entered: 12/6/1990 Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Louis W. Sullivan (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1990, Entered: 12/6/1990 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT and Attachments A-K filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 74849 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?