Frenken v. Hunter
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-02667

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2018 at 11:31 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Geerte M. Frenken, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Postbus 7024

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geerte M. Frenken +3 163 152 4956 info@freejasmijn.com
v.
No Logo Amy Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by idellfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , richard.idell@idellfirm.com
Space richard.idell@idellfirm.com
No Logo Christopher Perry Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by idellfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , richard.idell@idellfirm.com
Space richard.idell@idellfirm.com
No Logo David J. Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Jody Dufur Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by idellfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , richard.idell@idellfirm.com
Space richard.idell@idellfirm.com
Twitter, Inc. Twitter, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Julie Erin Schwartz +1 650 838 4300 +1 650 838 4350 jschwartz@perkinscoie.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on August 23, 2018 at 2PM.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/7/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 72 Administrative Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 48 , 49 , 51 )MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 64 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Ms. Frenken shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      Statement of Recent Decision in Support of 49 Twitter, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Twitter, Inc. (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 3/1/2018) Modified on 3/2/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY (re 51 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken; motion for a more definite statement; and motion to strike portions of the second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken ) filed byChristopher Perry Hunter. (Idell, Richard) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jody Dufur Hunter. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Christopher Perry Hunter. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Amy Hunter served on 11/1/2017, answer due 11/22/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Twitter, Inc. served on 11/2/2017, answer due 11/23/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Plaintiff's Partial Opposition (re 51 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken; motion for a more definite statement; and motion to strike portions of the second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken) filed by Geerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 2/13/2018) Modified on 2/14/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY (re 49 MOTION to Dismiss ) Second Amended Complaint filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 51 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken; motion for a more definite statement; and motion to strike portions of the second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken ) Partial Opposition filed byGeerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum/Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Partial Opposition to Defendant C.P. Hunter's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY (re 48 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint ) filed byAmy Hunter, Jody Dufur Hunter. (Idell, Richard) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 48 MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint ) PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS JODY DUFUR HUNTER AND AMY HUNTER FROM PLAINTIFFS SAC filed byGeerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 49 MOTION to Dismiss ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TWITTERS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGeerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum/Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Twitter's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken; motion for a more definite statement; and motion to strike portions of the second amended complaint of Geerte M. Frenken filed by Christopher Perry Hunter. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/13/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Idell, Richard) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitter, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss second amended complaint filed by Amy Hunter, Jody Dufur Hunter. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jody Dufur Hunter in support of motion to dismiss second amended complaint of plaintiff Geerte M. Frenken, # 2 Declaration of Amy Hunter in support of motion to dismiss second amended complaint of plaintiff Geerte M. Frenken, # 3 Proposed Order granting motion to dismiss second amended complaint of plaintiff Geerte M. Frenken)(Idell, Richard) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 46 Administrative Motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's second amended complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Ex Parte ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION extension of time to respond to plaintiff's second amended complaint filed by Christopher Perry Hunter. Responses due by 1/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Idell in support of ex parte administrative motion for extension of time for defendant Christopher Perry Hunter to respond to second amended complaint, # 2 Proposed Order granting ex parte administrative motion for extension of time for defendant Christopher Perry Hunter to respond to second amended complaint)(Idell, Richard) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geerte M. Frenken Proof of Service Amy Hunter (Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geerte M. Frenken Proof of Service Christopher Perry Hunter and Jody Dufur Hunter (Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Geerte M. Frenken Proof of Service Twitter, Inc. (Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                STIPULATION to Set Deadline for Defendant Twitter, Inc. to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Erin Schwartz (Schwartz, Julie) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Time of Response of Defendant Amy Hunter to Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time of Response of Defendant Amy Hunter to Second Amended Complaint filed by Amy Hunter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Idell, Richard) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Receipt of SERVICE by USMS. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Amy Hunter, Christopher Perry Hunter, Jody Dufur Hunter, Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Christopher Hunter USM Form, # 2 Jody Hunter USM Form, # 3 Amy Hunter USM Form, # 4 Twitter, Inc. USM Form)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DENYING 28 Plaintiff's motion. As to Plaintiff's request to modify the case schedule, all case deadlines will be set--following service of Plaintiff's 23 amended complaint--according to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this District. As to Plaintiff's other requests, denial is on grounds of mootness. (This is a text-only entry; there is no document associated with this entry.)(hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                AMENDED 7 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2017. FTR Time 2:37-2:43. Total Time in Court: 6 Minutes. Plaintiff Attorney Geerte Frenken appearing pro se via courtcall. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint; add defendants; and proceed with service (docket no. 24 ) is GRANTED by the Court. Second Amended Complaint has already been e-filed as docket no. 23 . This is a text-only Minute Entry (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for September 5, 2017, is continued to September 12, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by September 5, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Please disregard. Duplicate entry.ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) Modified on 7/24/2017 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/21/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 5, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by August 29, 2017. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2017, Entered: 7/16/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                              MOTION: 1. TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE; 2. FOR LEAVE TO ASSIGN DOCKET # 23 AS THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT; 3. TO PROCEED WITH SERVICE; filed by Geerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum to Motion to Extend Time, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Extend Time)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 7/16/2017) Modified on 7/17/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Geerte M. Frenken.. (Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff Geerte Frenken shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/27/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Court determines that Frenken v. Hunter (case no. 17-cv-3125-JSC) is related to Frenken v. Hunter (case no. 17-cv-02667-EDL). (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Amended Complaint, filed by Geerte M. Frenken. Responses due by 7/13/2017. Replies due by 7/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Leave to Amend, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Leave to Amend, # 4 Summons CHRISTOPHER PERRY HUNTER, # 5 Summons JODY DUFUR HUNTER, # 6 Summons AMY HUNTER, # 7 Summons TWITTER, INC.)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byGeerte M. Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT-C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT-D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT-E)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/29/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted by Geerte M. Frenken as to David J. Hunter. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting leave to strike docket 16 and 17 signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 18 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 8/8/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document and Proceed with Service filed by Geerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike and Motion to Proceed with Service, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Strike and Motion to Proceed with Service, # 3 Proposed Summons New Defendant Christopher Perry Hunter)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017
                                                                                                                                      PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 20 ORDER STRIKING THIS ENTRY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO REPLACE DECEASED DEFENDANT; against All Defendants. Filed byGeerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support to Amend, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Leave to Amend, # 3 Proposed Summons for New Defendant)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/25/2017) Modified on 5/26/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/26/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/2/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 appendix
                                                                                                                                        PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 20 ORDER STRIKING THIS ENTRY [PROPOSED] ORDER LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REPLACE DECEASED DEFEDANT; filed byGeerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons New Defendant)(Related document(s) 10 ) (Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/25/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/2/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION AND DEFAMATION PER SE; 2. FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY; [DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL]; against All Defendants. Filed byGeerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT-C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT-D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT-E)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 12 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION AND DEFAMATION PER SE; 2 FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY [DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] Original Redacted against All Defendants. Filed byGeerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT-A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT-B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT-C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT-D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Original Complaint, May 9, 2017 - Docket Document #1 filed by Geerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum to Motion To Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Remark
                                                                                                                                                  RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the U.S. Marshal Service Regarding Service on Defendant David J. Hunter. Re 7 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Remark
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO REPLACE DECEASED DEFENDANT MEMORANDUM OF POINTIS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT; PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; against All Defendants. Filed byGeerte M Frenken. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Frenken, Geerte) (Filed on 5/23/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/24/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to David J. Hunter. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case FilingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 4 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2017: # 1 certificate of service) (shyS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 3 Application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk issue summons, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the 1 complaint, any amendments, 2 scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's 3 affidavit and this order upon the defendant. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff Geerte M. Frenken shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/23/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES; by Geerte M. Frenken (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; filed by Geerte M. Frenken. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2017: # 1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Geerte M. Frenken. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2017: # 1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/9/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DEFAMATION AND DEFAMATION PER SE; 2. FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY; [DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL]; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against David J. Hunter. Filed byGeerte M. Frenken. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2017. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/25/2017) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?